Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2026779

EP2026779 - USE OF A COMPOSITION CONSISTING OF A COMBINATION OF HYDROQUINONE, FLUOCINOLONE ACETONIDE AND TRETINOIN, INTENDED FOR TREATMENT SIGNS OF PHOTOAGING OF THE SKIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2013
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2018Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): MT
published on 24.10.2018  [2018/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Galderma S.A.
Zugerstrasse 8
6330 Cham / CH
[2012/39]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
Galderma S.A.
Zugerstrasse 8
6330 Cham / CH
Inventor(s)01 / HEXSEL, Doris Maria
Plinio Brasil
Milano Ave. 476
90520-000 Porto Alegre / BR
 [2012/39]
Former [2009/09]01 / HEXSEL, Doris Maria
Plinio Brasil Milano Ave. 476
90520-000 Porto Alegre / BR
Representative(s)Tezier Herman, Béatrice , et al
Cabinet Becker & Associés
25, rue Louis le Grand
75002 Paris / FR
[2013/04]
Former [2012/39]Boulard, Denis
L'Oreal
D.I.P.I.
25-29 Quai Aulagnier
92665 Asnieres-sur-Seine Cedex / FR
Former [2009/50]Allab, Myriam
L'Oréal D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier
92600 Asnières / FR
Former [2009/09]Allab, Myriam
L'Oreal - D.I.P.I. River Plaza 25-29 Quai Aulagnier
92665 Asnières-sur-Seine / FR
Application number, filing date07729341.321.05.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007EP54897
Priority number, dateFR2006000450419.05.2006         Original published format: FR 0604504
[2009/09]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007135132
Date:29.11.2007
Language:FR
[2007/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2026779
Date:25.02.2009
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007
[2009/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2026779
Date:26.09.2012
Language:FR
[2012/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/05, A61K31/57, A61K31/203, A61K31/585, A61K8/63, A61K8/67, A61K8/35, A61Q19/02, A61P17/00, A61P17/08
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG EINER ZUSAMMENSETZUNG AUS EINER KOMBINATION VON HYDROCHINON, FLUOCINOLONACETONID UND TRETINOIN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ANZEICHEN VON HAUT-LICHTALTERUNG[2009/09]
English:USE OF A COMPOSITION CONSISTING OF A COMBINATION OF HYDROQUINONE, FLUOCINOLONE ACETONIDE AND TRETINOIN, INTENDED FOR TREATMENT SIGNS OF PHOTOAGING OF THE SKIN[2009/09]
French:UTILISATION D'UNE COMPOSITION COMPRENANT UNE ASSOCIATION D'HYDROQUINONE, D'ACÉTONIDE DE FLUOCINOLONE, ET DE TRÉTINOINE, DESTINÉE AU TRAITEMENT DES SIGNES CUTANÉS DU PHOTOVIEILLISSEMENT[2009/09]
Entry into regional phase19.12.2008National basic fee paid 
19.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
19.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
23.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.11.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
26.11.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.04.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.08.2012Fee for grant paid
17.08.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.10.2009
Opposition(s)27.06.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipMC26.09.2012
RO26.09.2012
TR26.09.2012
AT21.05.2013
CY21.05.2013
CZ21.05.2013
FI21.05.2013
IE21.05.2013
LT21.05.2013
LU21.05.2013
LV21.05.2013
MT21.05.2013
PL21.05.2013
SK21.05.2013
HU22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
BE31.05.2013
BG31.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
DK31.05.2013
EE31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
[2018/43]
Former [2018/17]MC26.09.2012
MT26.09.2012
RO26.09.2012
TR26.09.2012
AT21.05.2013
CY21.05.2013
CZ21.05.2013
FI21.05.2013
IE21.05.2013
LT21.05.2013
LU21.05.2013
LV21.05.2013
PL21.05.2013
SK21.05.2013
HU22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
BE31.05.2013
BG31.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
DK31.05.2013
EE31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
Former [2015/34]MC26.09.2012
MT26.09.2012
RO26.09.2012
TR26.09.2012
AT21.05.2013
CY21.05.2013
CZ21.05.2013
FI21.05.2013
IE21.05.2013
LT21.05.2013
LU21.05.2013
LV21.05.2013
PL21.05.2013
SK21.05.2013
HU22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
BE31.05.2013
BG31.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
DK31.05.2013
EE31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
Former [2015/32]MC26.09.2012
MT26.09.2012
RO26.09.2012
TR26.09.2012
AT21.05.2013
CY21.05.2013
CZ21.05.2013
FI21.05.2013
IE21.05.2013
LT21.05.2013
LV21.05.2013
PL21.05.2013
SK21.05.2013
HU22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
BE31.05.2013
BG31.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
DK31.05.2013
EE31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
Former [2015/13]MC26.09.2012
MT26.09.2012
RO26.09.2012
AT21.05.2013
CY21.05.2013
CZ21.05.2013
FI21.05.2013
IE21.05.2013
LT21.05.2013
LV21.05.2013
PL21.05.2013
SK21.05.2013
HU22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
BE31.05.2013
BG31.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
DK31.05.2013
EE31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
Former [2014/44]MC26.09.2012
RO26.09.2012
AT21.05.2013
CY21.05.2013
CZ21.05.2013
FI21.05.2013
IE21.05.2013
LT21.05.2013
LV21.05.2013
PL21.05.2013
SK21.05.2013
HU22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
BE31.05.2013
BG31.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
DK31.05.2013
EE31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
Former [2014/37]MC26.09.2012
RO26.09.2012
AT21.05.2013
CY21.05.2013
CZ21.05.2013
FI21.05.2013
IE21.05.2013
LT21.05.2013
LV21.05.2013
PL21.05.2013
SK21.05.2013
HU22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
BE31.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
DK31.05.2013
EE31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
Former [2014/24]MC26.09.2012
RO26.09.2012
CY21.05.2013
CZ21.05.2013
FI21.05.2013
IE21.05.2013
LT21.05.2013
LV21.05.2013
SK21.05.2013
HU22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
BE31.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
DK31.05.2013
EE31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
Former [2014/21]MC26.09.2012
RO26.09.2012
CY21.05.2013
CZ21.05.2013
FI21.05.2013
IE21.05.2013
LT21.05.2013
LV21.05.2013
SK21.05.2013
HU22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
BE31.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
DK31.05.2013
EE31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
Former [2014/20]MC26.09.2012
RO26.09.2012
CY21.05.2013
CZ21.05.2013
FI21.05.2013
IE21.05.2013
LT21.05.2013
LV21.05.2013
SK21.05.2013
HU22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
BE31.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
EE31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
Former [2014/14]MC26.09.2012
RO26.09.2012
CZ21.05.2013
FI21.05.2013
LT21.05.2013
LV21.05.2013
SK21.05.2013
HU22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
BE31.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
EE31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
Former [2014/12]MC26.09.2012
RO26.09.2012
CZ21.05.2013
FI21.05.2013
LT21.05.2013
LV21.05.2013
SK21.05.2013
HU22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
EE31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
Former [2014/11]MC26.09.2012
RO26.09.2012
CZ21.05.2013
FI21.05.2013
LT21.05.2013
SK21.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
EE31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
Former [2014/10]MC26.09.2012
CZ21.05.2013
LT21.05.2013
SK21.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
EE31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
Former [2014/09]MC26.09.2012
LT21.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
EE31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
Former [2014/08]CY26.09.2012
MC26.09.2012
LT21.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
Former [2014/03]CY26.09.2012
MC26.09.2012
Former [2013/52]CY26.09.2012
Cited inInternational search[X]US2004081668  (PUGLIA NANCY [US]) [X] 1-15 * tables 2,3 *;
 [X]US3856934  (KLIGMAN A) [X] 1-15 * column 2 *;
 [X]WO0040217  (YUGENIC LIMITED PARTNERSHIP [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 2, line 20 - line 27 *
 [XT]  - TOROK H M ET AL, "HYDROQUINONE 4%, TRETINOIN 0.05%, FLUOCINOLONE ACETONIDE 0.01%: A SAFE AND EFFICACIOUS 12-MONTH TREATMENT FOR MELASMA", CUTIS, EXCERPTA MEDICA, BELLE MEAD,NJ, US, (200501), vol. 75, no. 1, ISSN 0011-4162, pages 57 - 62, XP009067213 [X] 1-15 * page 57 * [T] 1-15
 [X]  - COOK-BOLDEN F ET AL, "THE USE OF A TRIPLE-DRUG COMBINATION PRODUCT AND PROCEDURES FOR THE TREATMENT OF HYPERPIGMENTARY DISORDERS", COSMETIC DERMATOLOGY, KNOLLS PUB. GROUP, CEDAR KNOLLS, NJ, US, (200508), vol. 18, no. 8, ISSN 1041-3766, pages 589 - 594, XP009066078 [X] 1-15 * page 589, column R - page 590, column L *
 [X]  - ROLLMAN O ET AL, "CUTANEOUS VITAMIN A LEVELS IN SEBORRHEIC KERATOSIS ACTINIC KERATOSIS AND BASAL CELL CARCINOMA", ARCHIVES OF DERMATOLOGICAL RESEARCH, (1981), vol. 270, no. 2, ISSN 0340-3696, pages 193 - 196, XP009077650 [X] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00408234