Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2027690

EP2027690 - METHOD FOR GENERATION OF A USER-SPECIFIC TRANSMISSION EXCLUSION LIST AND METHOD FOR FORWARDING MESSAGES IN A DECENTRALISED COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.01.2016
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.01.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.03.2016  [2016/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Solutions and Networks GmbH & Co. KG
St.-Martin-Strasse 76
81541 Munich / DE
[2013/46]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG
St. Martin Strasse 76
81541 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BUSSER, Jens-Uwe
Gustav-Heinemann-Ring 98
81739 München / DE
02 / KISS, Adam
Halasi 19
H-6000 Keczkemet / HU
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Weidel, Gottfried , et al
Nokia Solutions and Networks GmbH & Co. KG
CEF T&I IPR Patent Administration
80240 Munich / DE
[2013/46]
Application number, filing date07729373.622.05.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007EP54934
Priority number, dateDE2006102400822.05.2006         Original published format: DE102006024008
[2009/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007135145
Date:29.11.2007
Language:DE
[2007/48]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2027690
Date:25.02.2009
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, H04L12/56
[2009/10]
Former International [2009/09]H04L29/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM ERSTELLEN EINER TEILNEHMERSPEZIFISCHEN SENDERAUSSCHLUSSLISTE UND VERFAHREN ZUM WEITERLEITEN VON NACHRICHTEN IN EINEM DEZENTRALEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2009/09]
English:METHOD FOR GENERATION OF A USER-SPECIFIC TRANSMISSION EXCLUSION LIST AND METHOD FOR FORWARDING MESSAGES IN A DECENTRALISED COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2009/09]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR ÉTABLIR UNE LISTE D'EXCLUSION D'EXPÉDITEUR(S) SPÉCIFIQUE À UN ABONNÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE MESSAGES DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION DÉCENTRALISÉ[2009/09]
Entry into regional phase22.12.2008National basic fee paid 
22.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
22.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
06.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.10.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/09]
27.10.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/09]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.04.2009
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
29.01.2010Request for further processing filed
29.01.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
24.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
22.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
27.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201509   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US2005076240  (APPLEMAN BARRY [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0010] - [0062]; figures 1,3 *;
 [A]US2004148506  (PRINCE MATTHEW B [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0008] - [0055]; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US2005005164  (SYIEK BRONWYN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0005] - [0042]; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]  - SPAM FILTER PROJECT, "Spam Filter From Meta", INTERNET CITATION, (20060308), pages 1 - 12, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20060308170343/http://meta.wikimedia.org/wiki/Spam_Filter, (20071121), XP002459654 [A] 1-15 * page 1, line 1 - page 4, line 10 *