Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2019960

EP2019960 - MEASURING INSTRUMENT FOR DETERMINING THE ACTUAL CONDITION OF WHEEL SETS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.03.2014
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2014No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.04.2014  [2014/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hegenscheidt-MFD GmbH & Co. KG
Hegenscheidt Platz
41812 Erkelenz / DE
[2009/06]
Inventor(s)01 / DE LA RIVA, Camilo
Neubrück 28
41516 Grevenbroich / DE
02 / ROSENLAND, Dieter
Grüner Winkel 40
41844 Wegberg / DE
03 / BRAUN, Norbert
Müllergasse 11 b
52159 Roetgen / DE
04 / NIJSSEN, Theo
Nieuwstraat 19
NL-5954 CJ Beesel / NL
 [2009/06]
Representative(s)Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/20]Cohausz & Florack
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2009/06]Cohausz & Florack
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14
D-40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date07729408.022.05.2007
[2009/06]
WO2007EP54969
Priority number, dateDE2006102404023.05.2006         Original published format: DE102006024040
[2009/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007135159
Date:29.11.2007
Language:DE
[2007/48]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2019960
Date:04.02.2009
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007
[2009/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2019960
Date:15.05.2013
Language:DE
[2013/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.01.2008
ClassificationInternational:G01B11/24, G01B21/20, B61K9/12
[2009/06]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   IT,   PL [2009/25]
Former [2009/06]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:MESSEINRICHTUNG ZUR ERMITTLUNG DES IST-ZUSTANDS VON RADSÄTZEN[2009/06]
English:MEASURING INSTRUMENT FOR DETERMINING THE ACTUAL CONDITION OF WHEEL SETS[2009/06]
French:DISPOSITIF DE MESURE PERMETTANT DE DÉTERMINER L'ÉTAT RÉEL D'ESSIEUX[2009/06]
Entry into regional phase21.11.2008National basic fee paid 
21.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
21.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.11.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/06]
24.12.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
29.01.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
27.11.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.03.2013Fee for grant paid
28.03.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.11.2012
Opposition(s)18.02.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
20.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
17.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
14.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]US5793492  (VANAKI HASSAN [US]) [X] 1-26 * column 4, lines 40-50 * * abstract *;
 [A]WO2004008067  (AEA TECHNOLOGY PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-26 * page 1, line 22 - page 2, line 8 * * page 3, line 31 - page 5, line 7 * * abstract *;
 [A]US2003072001  (MIAN ZAHID F [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * paragraphs [0093] , [0097] * * abstract *;
 [AD]US5636026  (MIAN ZAHID F [US], et al) [AD] 1-26 * column 9, lines 32-37 * * abstract *
by applicantEP0228500
 WO2004085957
 US5793492
 WO2004008067
 US5636026
 US2003072001