Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2027631

EP2027631 - CONNECTOR, CONNECTOR ASSEMBLING SYSTEM AND METHOD OF ASSEMBLING A CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.11.2010
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.12.2010  [2010/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FCI
145/147 Rue Yves Le Coz
78000 Versailles / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
FCI
145-147 Rue Yves Le Coz
78000 Versailles / FR
Inventor(s)01 / DERKS, Erik Geert Henricus Egbertus
Elschotseweg 4
NL-5482 LK Schijndel / NL
02 / DIEDUKSMAN, Andreas Winandus
Nederkwartier 4
NL-5235 JJ'S Hertogenbosch / NL
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Regi, François-Xavier
FCI
Département Propriété Industrielle
145/147, rue Yves Le Coz
78035 Versailles / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/49]Regi, François-Xavier
FCI Département Propriété Industrielle 145/147, rue Yves Le Coz
78035 Versailles / FR
Former [2009/09]Regi, François-Xavier
FCI Département Propriété Industrielle 145, rue Yves Le Coz
78035 Versailles Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date07729460.123.05.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007EP55027
Priority number, dateUS20060808073P23.05.2006         Original published format: US 808073 P
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007135180
Date:29.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2027631
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/514, H01R13/518, H01R13/645
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBINDER, VERBINDER-ZUSAMMENBAUSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM ZUSAMMENBAUEN EINES VERBINDERS[2009/09]
English:CONNECTOR, CONNECTOR ASSEMBLING SYSTEM AND METHOD OF ASSEMBLING A CONNECTOR[2009/09]
French:CONNECTEUR, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'ASSEMBLAGE DE CONNECTEUR[2009/09]
Entry into regional phase23.12.2008National basic fee paid 
23.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
23.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.12.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
31.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.06.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/51]
04.08.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[DX]WO2006002793  (FRAMATOME CONNECTORS INT [FR], et al) [DX] 1,12-14 * page 4, line 16 - page 8, line 12; figures 1A,6C,9A *;
 [A]WO2004001907  (MOLEX INC [US]) [A] 1-3,10,11,15 * page 16, paragraph 2 - page 17, paragraph 2; figures 18-20 *