Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2024663

EP2024663 - TRANSMISSION FOR TRANSMITTING A DRIVE TORQUE FROM ONE DRIVE SHAFT TO TWO OUTPUT SHAFTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.04.2010
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.04.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.05.2010  [2010/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZF Friedrichshafen AG
Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1
88046 Friedrichshafen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
ZF Friedrichshafen AG
88038 Friedrichshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BÖCK, Alois
Kleeham 6
94116 Hutthurm / DE
02 / BAASCH, Detlef
Pfauenweg 8
88048 Ailingen / DE
03 / PETER, Robert
Schönhoferstr. 4
94439 Rossbach / DE
04 / KNEDLER, Florian
Anrichterstr. 20
94036 Passau / DE
 [2009/12]
Former [2009/08]01 / BÖCK, Alois
Kleeham 6
94116 Hutthurm / DE
02 / BAASCH, Detlef
Pfauenweg 8
88048 Ailingen / DE
03 / PETER, Robert
Schönhoferstr. 4
94439 Rossbach / DE
04 / KNEDLER, Florian
Neustifter Strasse 30f
94036 Passau / DE
Application number, filing date07729509.525.05.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007EP55080
Priority number, dateDE2006102507230.05.2006         Original published format: DE102006025072
[2009/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007138000
Date:06.12.2007
Language:DE
[2007/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2024663
Date:18.02.2009
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:F16H48/20
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:GETRIEBEEINHEIT ZUR FÜHRUNG EINES ANTRIEBSMOMENTS VON EINER ANTRIEBSWELLE AUF ZWEI ABTRIEBSWELLEN[2009/08]
English:TRANSMISSION FOR TRANSMITTING A DRIVE TORQUE FROM ONE DRIVE SHAFT TO TWO OUTPUT SHAFTS[2009/08]
French:UNITÉ DE TRANSMISSION DESTINÉE À TRANSMETTRE UN COUPLE D'ENTRAÎNEMENT D'UN ARBRE D'ENTRÉE À DEUX ARBRES DE SORTIE[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase14.10.2008National basic fee paid 
14.10.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
14.10.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.10.2007Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.10.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
01.12.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/21]
07.01.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2010/21]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200903   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[DY]FR2864190  (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [DY] 1 * pages 8-12; figures 1-3 *;
 [Y]US2003051935  (MORI ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1 * paragraphs [0025] - [0046]; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US2004060175  (IMAMURA MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0057] - [0119]; figure 3 *;
 [A]GB2051266  (CASE CO J I) [A] 1-10 * abstract *;
 [A]DE10307219  (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 7-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR528643  (EDGAR HENRI DEVELAY [FR]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *