Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2027755

EP2027755 - CIRCUIT UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.06.2010
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.06.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.07.2010  [2010/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OSRAM Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung
Hellabrunner Strasse 1
81543 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
Osram Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung
Hellabrunner Strasse 1
81543 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BIEBL, Alois
Mainburgerstr. 12
93358 St. Johann / DE
02 / HIRSCHMANN, Günther
Etzwiesenstr. 34
81735 München / DE
 [2009/09]
Application number, filing date07729882.605.06.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007EP55497
Priority number, dateDE2006102693809.06.2006         Original published format: DE102006026938
[2009/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007141254
Date:13.12.2007
Language:DE
[2007/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2027755
Date:25.02.2009
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:H05B33/08
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHALTUNGSEINHEIT[2009/09]
English:CIRCUIT UNIT[2009/09]
French:UNITE DE COMMUTATION[2009/09]
Entry into regional phase16.10.2008National basic fee paid 
16.10.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
16.10.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.10.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
13.02.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.06.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.12.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/27]
02.02.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]US2003076051  (BOWMAN SCOTT A [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,9,12,14-23 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031]; figures 1,2 *;
 [XY]WO2004057924  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-10,12-22 * page 2, line 26 - page 5, line 9; figures 1,2 * [Y] 11,24;
 [A]US2003234621  (KRIPAROS DANIEL J [US]);
 [A]WO2005039251  (VICIOUS POWER PTY LTD [AU], et al);
 [A]US2003235062  (BURGYAN LAJOS [US], et al)
 [Y]  - LT1615 Micropower Step-up DC/DC Converters in ThinSOT, MILPITAS, CA, USA, LINEAR TECHNOLOGY CORP., XP002451184 [Y] 11 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - DAVE KIM, Design Note 231, Tiny Regulators Drive White LED Backlights, MILPITAS, CA, USA, LINEAR TECHNOLOGY CORP., XP002451185 [Y] 24 * the whole document *