EP2026812 - USE OF 1,7-DIMETHYLXANTHINE FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF A NON-ANXIOGENIC PSYCHOANALEPTIC DRUG FOR THE TREATMENT OF A NEUROPSYCHIATRIC DISORDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PIERRE FABRE MEDICAMENT 45, Place Abel Gance 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | For all designated states UNIVERSITE DE ROUEN 1, rue Thomas Becket 76821 Mont-Saint-Aignan Cédex / FR | [2009/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COSTENTIN, Jean 4 Place de la Pomme d'or F-76000 Rouen / FR | 02 /
MANSUY, Lucilla 1 Rue du Lac d'Oo F-31240 L'union / FR | 03 /
SOKOLOFF, Pierre En Jeannot F-81540 Belleserre / FR | [2009/09] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2012/49] |
Former [2009/49] | Ahner, Francis, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | ||
Former [2009/09] | Ahner, Francis, et al Cabinet Régimbeau, 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07730023.4 | 08.06.2007 | [2009/09] | WO2007EP55668 | Priority number, date | FR20060005189 | 12.06.2006 Original published format: FR 0605189 | [2009/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007144315 | Date: | 21.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2026812 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/522, A61P25/00 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
A61K31/522 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/26 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/34 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/09] | Extension states | AL | 17.12.2008 | BA | 17.12.2008 | HR | 17.12.2008 | MK | 17.12.2008 | RS | 17.12.2008 | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON 1,7-DIMETHYLXANTHIN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES NICHT-ANXIOGENEN PSYCHOANALEPTISCHEN ARZNEIMITTELS ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINER NEUROPSYCHIATRISCHEN ERKRANKUNG | [2009/09] | English: | USE OF 1,7-DIMETHYLXANTHINE FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF A NON-ANXIOGENIC PSYCHOANALEPTIC DRUG FOR THE TREATMENT OF A NEUROPSYCHIATRIC DISORDER | [2009/09] | French: | UTILISATION DE 1,7-DIMÉTHYLXANTHINE POUR LA FABRICATION D'UN MÉDICAMENT PSYCHOANALEPTIQUE NON ANXIOGÈNE POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'UN TROUBLE NEUROPSYCHIATRIQUE | [2009/09] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 27.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/24] | 28.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.04.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1510222 (EISAI CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,6 * claim - *; | [X] - SCHWARZSCHILD M A ET AL, "Neuroprotection by caffeine and more specific A2A receptor antagonists in animal models of Parkinson's diseas", NEUROLOGY, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, PHILADELPHIA, US, (2003), vol. 61, ISSN 0028-3878, pages s55 - s61, XP009088132 [X] 1,2,4-6,10 * page 55, column R, line 22 - page 56, column L, line 31 * | [X] - XU K ET AL, "NEUROPROTECTION BY METABOLITES OF CAFFEINE MAY PROLONG ITS NEUROPROTECTIVE EFFECT IN THE MPTP MODEL OF PD", SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE ABSTRACTS, SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE, US, (2002), ISSN 0190-5295, pages 487 - 5, XP009088112 [X] 1,2,6 * abstract * | [A] - BRUNS R F ET AL, "ADENOSINE RECEPTOR INTERACTIONS AND ANXIOLYTICS", NEUROPHARMACOLOGY, & SYMPOSIUM ON ANXIETY AND ANXIOLYTICS HELD AT THE 1982 NEUROSCIENCE MEETING, MINNEAPOLIS, MINN., USA,, (1983), vol. 22, no. 12 PART 2, ISSN 0028-3908, pages 1523 - 1530, XP002414556 [A] 1-10 * figure 3; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0028-3908(83)90121-1 | [A] - SUZUKI F ET AL, "ADENOSINE A1 ANTAGONISTS. 3. STRUCTURE-ACTIVITY RELATIONSHIPS ON AMELIORATION AGAINST SCOPOLAMINE- OR N6-((R)-PHENYLISOPROPYL) ADENOSINE-INDUCED COGNITIVE DISTURBANCE", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (1993), vol. 36, no. 17, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 2508 - 2518, XP002930165 [A] 1-10 * page 2508, column 1, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00069a009 |