Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2027012

EP2027012 - TAIL STRUCTURE FOR AN AIRCRAFT OR SPACECRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.08.2016
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 19.09.2018  [2018/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Airbus Operations GmbH
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
[2015/48]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
Airbus Deutschland GmbH
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / HAACK, Cord
Lindenstrasse 18b
21643 Beckdorf / DE
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles
Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Postfach 44 01 51
80750 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/41]Isarpatent
Patentanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles
Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Postfach 44 01 51
80750 München / DE
Former [2012/18]Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 44 01 51
80750 München / DE
Former [2009/09]Peckmann, Ralf
Reinhard, Skuhra, Weise & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date07730127.313.06.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007EP55828
Priority number, dateDE2006102770714.06.2006         Original published format: DE102006027707
US20060813497P14.06.2006         Original published format: US 813497 P
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007144377
Date:21.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2027012
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007
[2009/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2027012
Date:07.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/41]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP2027012
Date:09.12.2015
[2015/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:B64C1/06
[2015/27]
Former International [2009/09]B64C1/10, B64C1/26
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/41]
Former [2009/09]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:HECKSTRUKTUR FÜR EIN LUFT- ODER RAUMFAHRZEUG[2009/09]
English:TAIL STRUCTURE FOR AN AIRCRAFT OR SPACECRAFT[2009/09]
French:STRUCTURE DE QUEUE POUR AERONEF OU ASTRONEF[2009/09]
Entry into regional phase17.10.2008National basic fee paid 
17.10.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
17.10.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.10.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
11.06.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.08.2015Fee for grant paid
19.08.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.08.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.06.2015
Opposition(s)08.07.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
22.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
27.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
20.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
25.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
19.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.06.2007
AT07.10.2015
BE07.10.2015
BG07.10.2015
CY07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
ES07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SI07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
TR07.10.2015
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
IE13.06.2016
LU13.06.2016
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
MT30.06.2016
[2018/38]
Former [2018/32]HU13.06.2007
AT07.10.2015
BE07.10.2015
CY07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
ES07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SI07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
TR07.10.2015
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
IE13.06.2016
LU13.06.2016
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
MT30.06.2016
Former [2018/29]HU13.06.2007
AT07.10.2015
BE07.10.2015
CY07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
ES07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SI07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
TR07.10.2015
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
IE13.06.2016
LU13.06.2016
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
Former [2018/28]HU13.06.2007
AT07.10.2015
BE07.10.2015
CY07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
ES07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SI07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
IE13.06.2016
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
Former [2017/24]AT07.10.2015
BE07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
ES07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SI07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
IE13.06.2016
CH30.06.2016
LI30.06.2016
Former [2017/07]AT07.10.2015
BE07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
ES07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SI07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2017/03]AT07.10.2015
BE07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
ES07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SI07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/49]AT07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
ES07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SI07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/39]AT07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
ES07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/36]AT07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
ES07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/34]AT07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
ES07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/25]AT07.10.2015
ES07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/24]AT07.10.2015
ES07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/23]ES07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
SE07.10.2015
IS07.02.2016
Former [2016/22]ES07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
NL07.10.2015
IS07.02.2016
Former [2016/21]ES07.10.2015
IT07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
Former [2016/20]ES07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
Cited inInternational search[X]US4448372  (LARSON ROBERT J [US]) [X] 1-8,11,12,14,16,17 * column 1, line 64 - line 67 * * column 2, line 10 - line 14 * * column 3, line 29 - line 35 * * column 5, line 37 - line 43 *;
 [I]US3666211  (CATHERS RICHARD T, et al) [I] 1-3,9,10,12-16 * column 1, line 63 - line 67; figure 6 * * column 4, line 6 - line 9 * * column 4, line 14 - line 16 *