All documents: EP2150740  


Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1750
09.03.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.03.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.03.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.03.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.03.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 47
01.03.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
01.03.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
24.10.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
24.10.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
24.10.2016 F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) Appeal 5
24.10.2016 F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) Appeal 1
23.08.2016 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
23.08.2016 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
23.08.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.08.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
04.08.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
01.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
01.08.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
27.07.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
18.07.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
11.07.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
11.07.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
11.07.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
04.07.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.07.2016 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 2
28.06.2016 Invitation to give notice of appointment of a professional representative and to file an authorisation Appeal 1
08.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
08.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
08.06.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
16.03.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 26
16.03.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 26
25.02.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
18.02.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
12.02.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.02.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.02.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 1
05.02.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
05.02.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
02.02.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
20.10.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.10.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 11
12.10.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 1
20.08.2015 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
02.06.2015 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
02.06.2015 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
27.05.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 92
26.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
26.05.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
26.05.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
26.05.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
26.05.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
26.05.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
26.05.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
26.05.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
26.05.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
26.05.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
26.05.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
26.05.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
26.05.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
26.05.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
26.05.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
26.05.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
26.05.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
26.05.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
26.05.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
26.05.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
26.05.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
26.05.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
26.05.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
26.05.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
26.05.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
26.05.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
26.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
26.05.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 1
26.05.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 13
22.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
22.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
22.05.2015 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
22.05.2015 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
22.05.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 21
22.05.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 75
02.04.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
02.04.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
26.03.2015 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
26.03.2015 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
25.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
25.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
25.03.2015 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
25.03.2015 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
25.03.2015 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
25.03.2015 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
25.03.2015 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
21.01.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.01.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.01.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.01.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.01.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.01.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.01.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 10
15.01.2015 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
15.01.2015 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
15.01.2015 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 15
15.01.2015 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 21
15.01.2015 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
15.01.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
15.01.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
15.01.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
15.01.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
15.01.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
15.01.2015 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.01.2015 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 13
02.12.2014 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 14
28.11.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.11.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.11.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
26.11.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
21.11.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.11.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
19.11.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
19.11.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
19.11.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
19.11.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 57
19.11.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
19.11.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
07.11.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.11.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.11.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.11.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
04.11.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
04.11.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
04.11.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
04.11.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
04.11.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
04.11.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
04.11.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
04.11.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
04.11.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
04.11.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
04.11.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
04.11.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
04.11.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
04.11.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
04.11.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
04.11.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
04.11.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
04.11.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
04.11.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
04.11.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
04.11.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
04.11.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
04.11.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
04.11.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 8
04.11.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.11.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.11.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.10.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
31.10.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
31.10.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
31.10.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
31.10.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
31.10.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
31.10.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
31.10.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
31.10.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
31.10.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
31.10.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
31.10.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
31.10.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
31.10.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
31.10.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
31.10.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
31.10.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
31.10.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
31.10.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
31.10.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
31.10.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
31.10.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
31.10.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
31.10.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
31.10.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 8
29.10.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.10.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
24.10.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
24.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
24.10.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
01.10.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
26.09.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.09.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.09.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.09.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.05.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.05.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.05.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.05.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.04.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
30.04.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
30.04.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
30.04.2014 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
30.04.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.04.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.04.2014 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.04.2014 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
26.02.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.02.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
24.02.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
24.02.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
24.02.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 52
24.02.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
24.02.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 56
05.12.2013 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 2
25.11.2013 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Opposition 5
22.11.2013 Request for change of name - applicant Opposition 3
29.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.10.2013 Non-scannable object Opposition 2
21.10.2013 Non-scannable object Opposition 16
21.10.2013 Non-scannable object Opposition 2
21.10.2013 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 15
18.10.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
18.10.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
18.10.2013 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 15
09.08.2013 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
08.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.08.2013 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
05.08.2013 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
19.04.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
19.04.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
21.03.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
12.03.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
12.03.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
12.03.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 24
12.03.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
12.03.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 45
12.03.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
12.03.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
12.03.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
12.03.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
12.03.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
12.03.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
12.03.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 42
12.03.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
12.03.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 54
12.03.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
12.03.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
12.03.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
12.03.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
12.03.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
12.03.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 36
19.12.2012 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
11.12.2012 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 31
18.05.2012 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
28.04.2012 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
28.04.2012 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
28.04.2012 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
20.01.2012 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
20.01.2012 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
20.01.2012 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
20.01.2012 Text intended for grant Search / examination 35
08.06.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
04.06.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
11.03.2010 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
01.03.2010 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
17.02.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
17.02.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.02.2010 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
28.01.2010 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
19.01.2010 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
13.01.2010 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
12.01.2010 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
06.01.2010 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
24.11.2009 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
24.11.2009 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
09.11.2009 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
09.11.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.11.2009 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
13.10.2009 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
27.08.2009 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
23.10.2008 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
23.10.2008 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
23.10.2008 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 39