blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2150740


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
01.02.2019 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  06.03.2019  [2019/10]
09.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
11.05.2018 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  13.06.2018  [2018/24]
02.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.03.2018  [2018/10]
15.09.2017 Patent maintained (B2 publication) published on  18.10.2017  [2017/42]
05.09.2017 New entry: Fee for printing new specification paid
22.05.2017 New entry: Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
04.05.2017 New entry: Legal effect of interlocutory decision
24.10.2016 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
23.10.2016 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
22.07.2016 Change - representative
21.06.2016 Change - representative
03.02.2016 Change: Date of oral proceedings
03.02.2016 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
17.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.08.2015  [2015/34]
03.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
29.05.2015 New entry: Appeal number
29.05.2015 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
29.05.2015 Deletion: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
29.05.2015 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
29.05.2015 Deletion: Appeal number
01.04.2015 Change: Appeal number
26.03.2015 New entry: Appeal number
26.03.2015 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
20.02.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.03.2015  [2015/13]
15.01.2015 New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision
15.01.2015 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
19.12.2014 Change - classification published on  21.01.2015  [2015/04]
19.12.2014 Change - classification published on  21.01.2015  [2015/04]
29.04.2014 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
11.04.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.05.2014  [2014/20]
24.01.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.02.2014  [2014/09]
17.01.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.02.2014  [2014/08]
06.12.2013 Change - applicant published on  08.01.2014  [2014/02]
29.11.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.01.2014  [2014/01]
19.10.2013 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.08.2013 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
19.07.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.08.2013  [2013/34]
19.04.2013 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
15.03.2013 Opposition filed published on  17.04.2013  [2013/16]
22.02.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.03.2013  [2013/13]
01.02.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.03.2013  [2013/10]
25.01.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.02.2013  [2013/09]
21.12.2012 Change - applicant published on  23.01.2013  [2013/04]
16.11.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.12.2012  [2012/51]
09.11.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2012  [2012/50]
02.11.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.12.2012  [2012/49]
26.10.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.11.2012  [2012/48]
19.10.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.11.2012  [2012/47]
11.05.2012 (Expected) grant published on  13.06.2012  [2012/24]
08.05.2012 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
08.05.2012 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
29.03.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.01.2012 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
29.04.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.06.2010 Change - extension states published on  21.07.2010  [2010/29]
08.06.2010 New entry: Reply to examination report
01.04.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.02.2010 Change - inventor published on  31.03.2010  [2010/13]
19.02.2010 First examination report
12.02.2010 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
08.01.2010 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.02.2010  [2010/06]
08.01.2010 Request for examination filed published on  10.02.2010  [2010/06]
07.01.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
16.11.2009 PCT data prior to European publication
16.11.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.11.2009 PCT data prior to European publication
13.11.2009 Amendment by applicant
11.11.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
01.11.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
25.10.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
01.08.2007 PCT data prior to European publication