blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2150740
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2008125740Global Dossier 23.10.2008A1
Priority number Date
WO2007FR00627 13.04.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2010201119Global Dossier 12.08.2010A1
Priority number Date
WO2007FR00627 13.04.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9395028Global Dossier 19.07.2016B2
US2014308455 16.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2007FR00627 13.04.2007
US59555410 14.01.2010
US201414316351 26.06.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5295219BGlobal Dossier 18.09.2013B2
JP2010523920 15.07.2010A
Priority number Date
WO2007FR00627 13.04.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2150740Global Dossier 18.10.2017B2
EP2150740 13.06.2012B1
EP2150740 10.02.2010A1
Priority number Date
WO2007FR00627 13.04.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BRPI0721621 02.01.2019B1
BRPI0721621 01.01.2013A2
Priority number Date
WO2007FR00627 13.04.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2683323 19.08.2014C
CA2683323 23.10.2008A1
Priority number Date
WO2007FR00627 13.04.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN101715524B 11.06.2014B
CN101715524 26.05.2010A
Priority number Date
WO2007FR00627 13.04.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2389808T 31.10.2012T3
Priority number Date
WO2007FR00627 13.04.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX2009011010 30.10.2009A
Priority number Date
WO2007FR00627 13.04.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NO342550B 11.06.2018B1
NO20093128L 04.01.2010L
Priority number Date
WO2007FR00627 13.04.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL2150740T 30.11.2012T3
Priority number Date
WO2007FR00627 13.04.2007