blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP2150740

Designated contracting states AT 
 BELapse: 30.04.2013
 BGLapse: 13.09.2012
 CHLapse: 30.04.2013
CYLapse: 13.06.2012
 CZLapse: 13.04.2017
 DE 
 DKLapse: 13.06.2012
 EELapse: 13.06.2012
 ES 
 FILapse: 13.06.2012
 FR 
 GB 
 GRLapse: 14.09.2012
 HULapse: 13.04.2007
 IELapse: 13.04.2013
 ISLapse: 13.10.2012
 IT 
 LILapse: 30.04.2013
 LTLapse: 13.06.2012
 LULapse: 13.04.2013
LV 
 MCLapse: 13.06.2012
 MTLapse: 13.06.2012
 NL 
 PLLapse: 13.06.2012
 PTLapse: 15.10.2012
 RO 
 SELapse: 13.06.2012
 SILapse: 13.06.2012
 SKLapse: 13.06.2012
 TRLapse: 13.06.2012
Examination procedure28.04.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase09.11.2009National basic fee paid 
09.11.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
09.11.2009Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
21.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
23.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
European patent granted13.06.2012
Opposition procedure01.09.2017Fee for printing new specification paid 
Appeal following opposition25.03.2015APPEAL FILED
22.05.2015APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
08.09.2016APPEAL RESULT
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:10.02.2010 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20091109
 
Event date:10.02.2010 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:10.02.2010 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL BA HR MK RS
 
Event date:24.03.2010 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20100217
 
Event date:31.03.2010 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:BORDET, LAURENT
 
Event date:31.03.2010 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:GILLOT, LAURENT
 
Event date:31.03.2010 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:PINEL, ELIETTE
 
Event date:31.03.2010 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:GARD, ERIC
 
Event date:21.07.2010 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)
 
Event date:13.06.2012 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:13.06.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
Free Format Text:NOT ENGLISH
 
Event date:15.06.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT REF 562151 AT T
Code Expl.:+REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)
Effective DATE:20120615
 
Event date:15.06.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:18.07.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
Free Format Text:LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH
 
Event date:09.08.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 602007023349 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
Effective DATE:20120809
 
Event date:03.09.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG RO EPE
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA
 
Event date:03.10.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL T3
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995
 
Event date:31.10.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2389808 ES T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20121031
 
Event date:31.10.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20120613
 
Event date:31.10.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20120613
 
Event date:31.10.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20120613
 
Event date:31.10.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20120613
 
Event date:26.11.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG LT MG4D
Code Expl.:-INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT
Effective DATE:20120613
 
Event date:30.11.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PL T3
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT
 
Event date:30.11.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LV
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20120613
 
Event date:30.11.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20120613
 
Event date:30.11.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20120914
 
Event date:23.01.2013 
Event description:RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:VALLOUREC MANNESMANN OIL & GAS FRANCE
 
Event date:23.01.2013 
Event description:RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
 
Event date:31.01.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:EE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20120613
 
Event date:31.01.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20120613
 
Event date:31.01.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IS
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20121013
 
Event date:28.02.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20121015
 
Event date:17.04.2013 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:TENARIS CONNECTIONS LIMITED
Effective DATE:20130312
 
Event date:30.04.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20120613
 
Event date:06.06.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R026 602007023349 DE
Code Expl.:-OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT
Effective DATE:20130312
 
Event date:31.07.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BG
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20120913
 
Event date:31.10.2013 
Event description:BE: LAPSED
Owner Name:VALLOUREC MANNESMANN OIL & GAS FRANCE
Effective DATE:20130430
 
Event date:31.10.2013 
Event description:BE: LAPSED
Owner Name:SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
Effective DATE:20130430
 
Event date:06.11.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB 732E
Code Expl.: AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)
Free Format Text:REGISTERED BETWEEN 20131010 AND 20131016
 
Event date:29.11.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:29.11.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20120613
 
Event date:08.01.2014 
Event description:RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:VALLOUREC OIL AND GAS FRANCE
 
Event date:08.01.2014 
Event description:RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
 
Event date:29.01.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE MM4A
Code Expl.:-PATENT LAPSED
 
Event date:31.01.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130430
 
Event date:31.01.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130430
 
Event date:31.01.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130430
 
Event date:30.04.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130413
 
Event date:15.05.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 602007023349 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:BEETZ & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE
Effective DATE:20140403
 
Event date:15.05.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 602007023349 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION, JP
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: VALLOUREC MANNESMANN OIL & GAS , SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., , JP
Effective DATE:20140403
 
Event date:15.05.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 602007023349 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:VALLOUREC MANNESMANN OIL & GAS FRANCE, FR
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: VALLOUREC MANNESMANN OIL & GAS , SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., , JP
Effective DATE:20140403
 
Event date:15.05.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 602007023349 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:BEETZ & PARTNER MBB, DE
Effective DATE:20140403
 
Event date:15.05.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 602007023349 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:VALLOUREC MANNESMANN OIL & GAS FRANCE, FR
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNERS: VALLOUREC MANNESMANN OIL & GAS FRANCE, AULNOYE-AYMERIES, FR; SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., OSAKA, JP
Effective DATE:20140403
 
Event date:15.05.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 602007023349 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION, JP
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNERS: VALLOUREC MANNESMANN OIL & GAS FRANCE, AULNOYE-AYMERIES, FR; SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., OSAKA, JP
Effective DATE:20140403
 
Event date:15.05.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 602007023349 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:BEETZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE, DE
Effective DATE:20140403
 
Event date:15.05.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 602007023349 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:BEETZ & PARTNER MBB PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE
Effective DATE:20140403
 
Event date:21.01.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED AFTER GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:F16L 58/18 20060101ALI20141217BHEP
 
Event date:21.01.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED AFTER GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C23C 4/02 20060101ALI20141217BHEP
 
Event date:21.01.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED AFTER GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:E21B 17/042 20060101ALI20141217BHEP
 
Event date:21.01.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED AFTER GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:F16L 15/00 20060101ALI20141217BHEP
 
Event date:21.01.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED AFTER GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C10M 169/04 20060101ALI20141217BHEP
 
Event date:21.01.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED AFTER GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:F16L 58/04 20060101AFI20141217BHEP
 
Event date:21.01.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED AFTER GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C23C 4/12 20060101ALI20141217BHEP
 
Event date:21.01.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED AFTER GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C23C 22/76 20060101ALI20141217BHEP
 
Event date:27.02.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20120613
 
Event date:13.03.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CD
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME
Owner Name:NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION, JP
Effective DATE:20150206
 
Event date:13.03.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CD
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME
Owner Name:VALLOUREC OIL AND GAS FRANCE, FR
Effective DATE:20150206
 
Event date:30.06.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:TR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20120613
 
Event date:31.07.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT; INVALID AB INITIO
Effective DATE:20070413
 
Event date:31.07.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130413
 
Event date:21.04.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:29.07.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20160414
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:29.07.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CZ
Payment DATE:20160412
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:31.08.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PL
Payment DATE:20160406
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:22.03.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:18.10.2017 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B2
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:18.10.2017 
Event description:PATENT MAINTAINED IN AMENDED FORM
Effective DATE:20171018
 
Event date:18.10.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R102 602007023349 DE
Code Expl.: EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL
 
Event date:31.01.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CZ
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170413
 
Event date:31.01.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL FP
Code Expl.: TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY)
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL HC
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF NAME(S) OF PROPRIETOR(S)
Owner Name:NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION; JP
Free Format Text:DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: CHANGE OF OWNER(S), CHANGE OF OWNER(S) NAME; FORMER OWNER NAME: VALLOUREC MANNESMANN OIL & GAS FRANCE
Effective DATE:20180220
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL PD
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP
Owner Name:NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION; JP
Free Format Text:DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: CHANGE OF OWNER(S), MERGE; FORMER OWNER NAME: VALLOUREC MANNESMANN OIL & GAS FRANCE
Effective DATE:20180220
 
Event date:22.03.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:30.04.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20171018
 
Event date:31.05.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LV
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20171018
 
Event date:31.08.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20180322
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170413
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20120613
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20190325
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20190321
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20190325
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:31.05.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20190327
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:18.06.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 602007023349 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:BEETZ & PARTNER MBB PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE
 
Event date:18.06.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 602007023349 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:VALLOUREC MANNESMANN OIL & GAS FRANCE, FR
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNERS: NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION, TOKYO, JP; VALLOUREC MANNESMANN OIL & GAS FRANCE, AULNOYE-AYMERIES, FR
 
Event date:18.06.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 602007023349 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION, JP
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNERS: NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION, TOKYO, JP; VALLOUREC MANNESMANN OIL & GAS FRANCE, AULNOYE-AYMERIES, FR
 
Event date:18.06.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 602007023349 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:BEETZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE, DE
 
Event date:31.07.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20190220
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:30.08.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RO
Payment DATE:20190401
Year of Fee Payment:13