Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2150740

EP2150740 - TUBULAR THREADED MEMBER WITH DRY PROTECTION COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  15.09.2017
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.02.2019Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): PL
published on 06.03.2019  [2019/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VALLOUREC OIL AND GAS FRANCE
54 rue Anatole France
59620 Aulnoye-Aymeries / FR
For all designated states
Nippon Steel & Sumitomo Metal Corporation
6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
[2017/42]
Former [2014/02]For all designated states
VALLOUREC OIL AND GAS FRANCE
54 rue Anatole France
59620 Aulnoye-Aymeries / FR
For all designated states
Nippon Steel & Sumitomo Metal Corporation
6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
Former [2013/04]For all designated states
VALLOUREC MANNESMANN OIL & GAS FRANCE
54 rue Anatole France
59620 Aulnoye-Aymeries / FR
For all designated states
Nippon Steel & Sumitomo Metal Corporation
6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
Former [2010/06]For all designated states
VALLOUREC MANNESMANN OIL & GAS FRANCE
54 rue Anatole France
59620 Aulnoye-Aymeries / FR
For all designated states
SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
5-33 Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-0041 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / BORDET, Laurent
35 impasse de Prague
F-59000 Lille / FR
02 / GILLOT, Laurent
14 boulevard Saly
F-59300 Valenciennes / FR
03 / PINEL, Eliette
385 , Route de Trévoux
Le Clos des Frênes
F-01600 Sainte-Euphémie / FR
04 / GARD, Eric
21 chemin des Eglantines
F-69580 Sathonay Village / FR
 [2012/24]
Former [2010/13]01 / BORDET, Laurent
35 impasse de Prague
F-59000 Lille / FR
02 / GILLOT, Laurent
14 boulevard Saly
F-59300 Valenciennes / FR
03 / PINEL, Eliette
385 , Route de Trévoux Le Clos des Frênes
F-01600 Sainte-Euphémie / FR
04 / GARD, Eric
21 chemin des Eglantines
F-69580 Sathonay Village / FR
Former [2010/06]01 / BORDET, Laurent
35 impasse de Prague
F-59000 Lille / FR
02 / GILLOT, Laurent
14 boulevard Saly
F-59300 Valenciennes / FR
03 / PINEL, Eliette
35 avenue Jean-François Raclet
F-69007 Lyon / FR
04 / GARD, Eric
21 chemin des Eglantines
F-69580 Sathonay Village / FR
Representative(s)Le Roy, Gwennhaël
Casalonga & Associés
8, avenue Percier
75008 Paris / FR
[2017/42]
Former [2012/24]Plaçais, Jean Yves
Cabinet Netter 36, avenue Hoche
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2010/06]Plaçais, Jean Yves
Cabinet Netter, 36, avenue Hoche
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date07731294.013.04.2007
[2010/06]
WO2007FR00627
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008125740
Date:23.10.2008
Language:FR
[2008/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2150740
Date:10.02.2010
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2008
[2010/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2150740
Date:13.06.2012
Language:FR
[2012/24]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP2150740
Date:18.10.2017
Language:FR
[2017/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.10.2008
ClassificationInternational:F16L58/04, F16L15/00, F16L58/18, E21B17/042, C23C4/12, C23C4/02, C23C22/76, C10M169/04
[2015/04]
Former International [2010/06]F16L15/00, F16L58/18
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/42]
Former [2010/06]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:RÖHRENFÖRMIGES GEWINDEGLIED MIT EINEM TROCKENEN SCHUTZÜBERZUG[2010/06]
English:TUBULAR THREADED MEMBER WITH DRY PROTECTION COATING[2010/06]
French:ELEMENT FILETE TUBULAIRE MUNI D'UN REVETEMENT PROTECTEUR SEC[2010/06]
Entry into regional phase09.11.2009National basic fee paid 
09.11.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
09.11.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.11.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.11.2009Examination requested  [2010/06]
17.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.06.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.01.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.04.2012Fee for grant paid
28.04.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.02.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.03.2013   
Tenaris Connections Limited
112 Bonadie Street
Kingstown / VC
Opponent's representative
August Debouzy
6-8, avenue de Messine
75008 Paris / FR
 [N/P]
Former [2013/16]
Opponent(s)01  12.03.2013   
Tenaris Connections Limited
112 Bonadie Street
Kingstown / VC
Opponent's representative
August & Debouzy avocats
6-8 avenue de Messine
75008 Paris / FR
19.04.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.10.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
02.12.2014Date of oral proceedings
15.01.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
15.01.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.09.2016Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
23.05.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
01.09.2017Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition25.03.2015Appeal received No.  T0647/15
22.05.2015Statement of grounds filed
08.09.2016Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
08.09.2016Date of oral proceedings
24.10.2016Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
21.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
23.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.04.2007
CY13.06.2012
DK13.06.2012
EE13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
MC13.06.2012
MT13.06.2012
PL13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
SI13.06.2012
SK13.06.2012
TR13.06.2012
BG13.09.2012
GR14.09.2012
IS13.10.2012
PT15.10.2012
IE13.04.2013
LU13.04.2013
BE30.04.2013
CH30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
CZ13.04.2017
[2019/10]
Former [2018/50]HU13.04.2007
CY13.06.2012
DK13.06.2012
EE13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
MC13.06.2012
MT13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
SI13.06.2012
SK13.06.2012
TR13.06.2012
BG13.09.2012
GR14.09.2012
IS13.10.2012
PT15.10.2012
IE13.04.2013
LU13.04.2013
BE30.04.2013
CH30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
CZ13.04.2017
PL13.04.2017
Former [2018/24]HU13.04.2007
CY13.06.2012
DK13.06.2012
EE13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
MC13.06.2012
MT13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
SI13.06.2012
SK13.06.2012
TR13.06.2012
BG13.09.2012
GR14.09.2012
IS13.10.2012
PT15.10.2012
IE13.04.2013
LU13.04.2013
BE30.04.2013
CH30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
CZ13.04.2017
Former [2018/10]HU13.04.2007
CY13.06.2012
DK13.06.2012
EE13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
LV13.06.2012
MC13.06.2012
MT13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
SI13.06.2012
SK13.06.2012
TR13.06.2012
BG13.09.2012
GR14.09.2012
IS13.10.2012
PT15.10.2012
IE13.04.2013
LU13.04.2013
BE30.04.2013
CH30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
CZ13.04.2017
Former [2015/34]HU13.04.2007
CY13.06.2012
DK13.06.2012
EE13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
LV13.06.2012
MC13.06.2012
MT13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
SI13.06.2012
SK13.06.2012
TR13.06.2012
BG13.09.2012
GR14.09.2012
IS13.10.2012
PT15.10.2012
IE13.04.2013
LU13.04.2013
BE30.04.2013
CH30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
Former [2015/32]CY13.06.2012
DK13.06.2012
EE13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
LV13.06.2012
MC13.06.2012
MT13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
SI13.06.2012
SK13.06.2012
TR13.06.2012
BG13.09.2012
GR14.09.2012
IS13.10.2012
PT15.10.2012
IE13.04.2013
BE30.04.2013
CH30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
Former [2015/13]CY13.06.2012
DK13.06.2012
EE13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
LV13.06.2012
MC13.06.2012
MT13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
SI13.06.2012
SK13.06.2012
BG13.09.2012
GR14.09.2012
IS13.10.2012
PT15.10.2012
IE13.04.2013
BE30.04.2013
CH30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
Former [2014/20]CY13.06.2012
DK13.06.2012
EE13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
LV13.06.2012
MC13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
SI13.06.2012
SK13.06.2012
BG13.09.2012
GR14.09.2012
IS13.10.2012
PT15.10.2012
IE13.04.2013
BE30.04.2013
CH30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
Former [2014/09]CY13.06.2012
DK13.06.2012
EE13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
LV13.06.2012
MC13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
SI13.06.2012
SK13.06.2012
BG13.09.2012
GR14.09.2012
IS13.10.2012
PT15.10.2012
BE30.04.2013
CH30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
Former [2014/08]CY13.06.2012
DK13.06.2012
EE13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
LV13.06.2012
MC13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
SI13.06.2012
SK13.06.2012
BG13.09.2012
GR14.09.2012
IS13.10.2012
PT15.10.2012
CH30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
Former [2014/01]CY13.06.2012
DK13.06.2012
EE13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
LV13.06.2012
MC13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
SI13.06.2012
SK13.06.2012
BG13.09.2012
GR14.09.2012
IS13.10.2012
PT15.10.2012
Former [2013/34]CY13.06.2012
DK13.06.2012
EE13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
LV13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
SI13.06.2012
SK13.06.2012
BG13.09.2012
GR14.09.2012
IS13.10.2012
PT15.10.2012
Former [2013/13]CY13.06.2012
EE13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
LV13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
SI13.06.2012
SK13.06.2012
GR14.09.2012
IS13.10.2012
PT15.10.2012
Former [2013/10]CY13.06.2012
EE13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
LV13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
SI13.06.2012
SK13.06.2012
GR14.09.2012
IS13.10.2012
Former [2013/09]CY13.06.2012
EE13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
LV13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
SI13.06.2012
GR14.09.2012
Former [2012/51]CY13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
LV13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
SI13.06.2012
GR14.09.2012
Former [2012/50]CY13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
LV13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
GR14.09.2012
Former [2012/49]CY13.06.2012
FI13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
Former [2012/48]FI13.06.2012
LT13.06.2012
SE13.06.2012
Former [2012/47]LT13.06.2012
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP1411288  (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP]) [X] 1,2,9,10,16,18-23,26-28,30-32,37,38 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0011] , [0013] , [0031] , [0045]; table 2 * [Y] 5,6,11-15,17,24,25,29,36;
 [XY]EP1211451  (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP]) [X] 1,7-10,18,26,29,31-33,37-43 * abstract * * paragraphs [0063] , [0069] , [0073] , [0088] , [0107] - [0120]; tables 2,3,8,9,12,13,15,16,18 * [Y] 34;
 [XY]WO9620083  (SALVIA VINCENT FELICE [US]) [X] 1,2,31,35 * abstract * * page 5 - page 8 * [Y] 34;
 [XY]US6695012  (RING LEV [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6 * abstract * * page 6, line 37 - line 44 * [Y] 5,6,11,24,25;
 [Y]US2003094810  (GOTO KUNIO [JP], et al) [Y] 12-14,17 * abstract * * paragraph [0089] *;
 [X]EP1258513  (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [X] 1,18 * abstract *;
 [Y]US6635341  (BARANCYK STEVEN V [US], et al) [Y] 15,36,29 * column 36, line 62 - column 51, line 12 *
by applicantUS4414247
 US4630849
 US6027145
 US6679526
 US2004166341
 WO2004033951
OppositionWO2007042231
 WO2008139058
 EP1378698
 EP1378699
 EP1548346
 EP1736697
 US2006197343
 US2006228505
    - Wikipedia webpage for "thermoplastics"
    - Extrait du rapport CaseStudy Dopless and Wedge Series 500TM
    - Extrait du rapport Dopless Report
    - OLABISI O., Handbook of Thermoplastics, NEW YORK, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., (1997), pages 641-663 - 1017-1034
    - MANG T. ET AL, Lubricants and Lubrication, WEINHEIM, WILEY-VCH VERLAG GMBH & CO.KGAA, (2007), vol. 2ND EDIT, pages 88-118 - 694-714
    - Lubricants and Lubrication, 2nd, completely revised and extended edition, from editor's website