Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2024738

EP2024738 - PROCEDURE AND DEVICE OF EDDY CURRENT IMAGING DEVICE FOR THE DETECTION AND THE CHARACTERISATION OF DEFECTS HIDDEN IN COMPLEX STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.04.2019
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.05.2019 [2019/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE -CNRS-
3, rue Michel-Ange
75016 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS)
3, rue Michel Ange
75016 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / JOUBERT, Pierre-Yves
10, rue Lamblardie
75012 Paris / FR
02 / LE DIRAISON, Yohan
74, rue Camille Desmoulin App. H317
94230 Cachan / FR
03 / PINASSAUD, Jean
22, rue des Tournelles
78000 Versailles / FR
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Lavoix
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]Jacobson, Claude
Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date07731432.610.05.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007FR00791
Priority number, dateFR2006000425512.05.2006         Original published format: FR 0604255
[2009/08]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007135265
Date:29.11.2007
Language:FR
[2007/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2024738
Date:18.02.2009
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:G01N27/90, G01R33/032
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG MIT WIRBELSTROM-ABBILDUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUM NACHWEIS UND ZUR CHARAKTERISIERUNG VON IN KOMPLEXEN STRUKTUREN VERBORGENEN DEFEKTEN[2009/08]
English:PROCEDURE AND DEVICE OF EDDY CURRENT IMAGING DEVICE FOR THE DETECTION AND THE CHARACTERISATION OF DEFECTS HIDDEN IN COMPLEX STRUCTURES[2009/08]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE À COURANT DE FOUCAULT POUR LA DÉTECTION ET LA CARACTÉRISATION DE DÉFAUTS ENFOUIS DANS DES STRUCTURES COMPLEXES[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase10.11.2008National basic fee paid 
10.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
10.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
25.02.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.08.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.02.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.07.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.12.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/21]
17.01.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2019/21]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.02.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
30.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
28.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
29.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
26.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
28.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
26.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
24.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201812   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[YDA]FR2856791  (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR], et al) [YD] 1,3,5,7,10,18-20 * the whole document * [A] 2,4,6,8,9,11-17;
 [Y]US2003164700  (GOLDFINE NEIL J [US], et al) [Y] 1,3,5,7,10,18-20 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0062] , [0065] , [0069] - [0076] - [0097] , [0102] , [0109] , [0110] , [0112] , [0113] *;
 [AD]US5053704  (FITZPATRICK GERALD L [US]) [AD] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO0225266  (LOS ALAMOS NAT LAB [US], et al) [A] 1,3,5,7,18,19 * page 3, lines 5-11 * * page 4, line 28 - page 10, line 9 * * page 13, lines 19-33 *;
 [A]US4755752  (FITZPATRICK GERALD L [US]) [A] 1,3,18,20 * abstract * * column 6, lines 63-68 *;
 [A]US5610517  (MA YU P [US], et al) [A] 1-5,18 * abstract * * column 2, lines 42-58 * * column 3, lines 6-20 * * column 9, lines 19-23 * * column 10, lines 13-21 * * column 11, lines 11-28 *
 [XA]  - SOTOSHI YAMADA ET AL, "DEFECT IMAGES BY PLANAR ECT PROBE OF MEANDER-MESH COILS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MAGNETICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199609), vol. 32, no. 5, ISSN 0018-9464, pages 4956 - 4958, XP011031060 [X] 1,2,4,8,9,18-20 * the whole document * [A] 3,5-7,10-17

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/20.539300
 [A]  - PINASSAUD J ET AL, "Quantitative magneto-optic imager for nondestructive evaluation", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING SPIE-INT. SOC. OPT. ENG USA, (2005), vol. 5768, no. 1, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 196 - 203, XP002413519 [A] 1-20 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.598667