Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2021127

EP2021127 - METHOD FOR TREATING DROPS IN A MICROFLUID CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.04.2014
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.04.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.05.2014  [2014/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique
3, rue Michel Ange
75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR
For all designated states
Ecole Polytechnique
9, Route de Saclay
91128 Palaiseau Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique
3, rue Michel-Ange
75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR
For all designated states
Ecole Polytechnique
9, Route de Saclay
91128 Palaiseau Cedex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / BAROUD, Charles
71, boulevard du Montparnasse
F-75006 Paris / FR
02 / DELVILLE, Jean-Pierre
16, avenue de la Marne
F-33400 Talence / FR
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Ramey, Daniel , et al
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S.
3, rue Auber
75009 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Ramey, Daniel , et al
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 3, rue Auber
75009 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date07731474.816.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007FR00838
Priority number, dateFR2006000481930.05.2006         Original published format: FR 0604819
[2009/07]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007138178
Date:06.12.2007
Language:FR
[2007/49]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2021127
Date:11.02.2009
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.07.2008
ClassificationInternational:B01L3/00, F04B19/24, G21K1/00, H05H3/04
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON TROPFEN IN EINEM MIKROFLUIDKREISLAUF[2009/07]
English:METHOD FOR TREATING DROPS IN A MICROFLUID CIRCUIT[2009/07]
French:PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE GOUTTES DANS UN CIRCUIT MICROFLUIDIQUE[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase30.10.2008National basic fee paid 
30.10.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
30.10.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.10.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
30.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.06.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.11.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/21]
09.01.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2014/21]
Divisional application(s)EP12199690.4  / EP2574401
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.12.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
16.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
14.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
17.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201307   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XD]FR2873171  (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR], et al) [XD] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2002181837  (WANG MARK [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0011] - [0017] - [0057] , [0064] , [0107] , [0109] , [0119]; figures 6,7 *;
 [A]EP1533605  (AISIN SEIKI [JP]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0018] , [0019] , [0025] , [0026] , [0035] - [0039]; figures 1,3,5 *;
 [A]WO2004071638  (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0071] - [0073] *;
 [A]WO2005022147  (GENOPTIX INC [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0033] , [0034]; figures 4,6,7,9-11 *;
 [A]  - MACDONALD ET AL, "MICROFLUIDIC SORTING IN AN OPTICAL LATTICE", NATURE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, LONDON, GB, (20031127), vol. 426, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 421 - 424, XP002289740 [A] 1-5 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature02144
by applicantFR2873171