blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2021450 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2021450



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 510
26.05.2017 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
23.05.2017 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
17.05.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.05.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 25
12.05.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
12.05.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
14.07.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
14.07.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
11.07.2016 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
09.06.2016 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
09.06.2016 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
08.06.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.06.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
03.06.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.05.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 6
17.05.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 6
29.04.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
25.04.2016 General authorisation Appeal 2
25.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
25.04.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Appeal 1
09.02.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
05.02.2016 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
01.02.2016 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
28.01.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.01.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
27.01.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
22.01.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
22.01.2016 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
30.01.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
15.07.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
09.07.2014 Claims Appeal 2
09.07.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
09.07.2014 Reply to appeal Appeal 10
08.07.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Appeal 1
02.04.2014 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
19.03.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Appeal 1
04.03.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
27.02.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 18
13.01.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
13.01.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
03.01.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Appeal 1
19.12.2013 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
17.12.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
17.12.2013 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
17.12.2013 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
08.11.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
28.10.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.10.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.10.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.10.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.10.2013 Annex to a communication Opposition 4
21.10.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
21.10.2013 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
21.10.2013 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
21.10.2013 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 5
21.10.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
21.10.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
21.10.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
21.10.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
21.10.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
21.10.2013 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
25.09.2013 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.07.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.07.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.07.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
04.07.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
04.07.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.05.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
29.04.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.04.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.04.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.04.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.04.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.04.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
18.04.2013 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
18.04.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
18.04.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
18.04.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
30.09.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.09.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
22.09.2011 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
16.05.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.05.2011 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
05.05.2011 Claims Opposition 3
05.05.2011 Claims Opposition 4
05.05.2011 Claims Opposition 2
05.05.2011 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 16
29.04.2011 Claims Opposition 4
29.04.2011 Claims Opposition 2
29.04.2011 Claims Opposition 3
29.04.2011 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 16
02.03.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.03.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
22.02.2011 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
17.02.2011 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
02.11.2010 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
02.11.2010 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
04.10.2010 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
22.09.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
22.09.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
22.09.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
21.09.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
21.09.2010 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Opposition 14
21.09.2010 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Opposition 12
21.09.2010 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
26.11.2009 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
12.11.2009 English translation of the claims Search / examination 5
12.11.2009 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
12.11.2009 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
30.07.2009 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
30.07.2009 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
30.07.2009 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
30.07.2009 Text intended for grant Search / examination 39
14.01.2009 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
16.12.2008 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
11.11.2008 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
01.10.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
01.10.2008 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
12.09.2008 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
28.11.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 47
08.11.2007 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
08.11.2007 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
08.11.2007 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 40
28.06.2007 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 2
16.04.2007 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
16.04.2007 Annex International Searching Authority 4
16.04.2007 Claims International Searching Authority 5
16.04.2007 Description International Searching Authority 34