Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2021893

EP2021893 - AUTOMATIC BATHTUB FILLER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.08.2010
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vassilev, Plamen Spassov
12 Orion Business Centre Surrey Canal Road London
SE14 5RT / GB
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Hammler, Martin Franz
Phillips & Leigh
5 Pemberton Row
London EC4A 3BA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Hammler, Martin Franz
Phillips & Leigh 5 Pemberton Row
London EC4A 3BA / GB
Application number, filing date07732352.510.04.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007GB01308
Priority number, dateGB2006000978817.05.2006         Original published format: GB 0609788
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007132143
Date:22.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/47]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2021893
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007
[2009/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2021893
Date:14.10.2009
Language:EN
[2009/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.03.2008
ClassificationInternational:G05D23/13, E03C1/04
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUTOMATISCHE BADEWANNENFÜLLVORRICHTUNG[2009/07]
English:AUTOMATIC BATHTUB FILLER[2009/07]
French:REMPLISSEUSE DE BAIGNOIRE AUTOMATIQUE[2009/22]
Former [2009/07]REMPLISSAGE DE BAIGNOIRE AUTOMATIQUE
Entry into regional phase16.12.2008National basic fee paid 
16.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
16.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.12.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
15.06.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.08.2009Fee for grant paid
28.08.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.07.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.10.2009
BE14.10.2009
CY14.10.2009
CZ14.10.2009
DK14.10.2009
EE14.10.2009
FI14.10.2009
LT14.10.2009
LV14.10.2009
MT14.10.2009
NL14.10.2009
PL14.10.2009
RO14.10.2009
SE14.10.2009
SI14.10.2009
SK14.10.2009
TR14.10.2009
GR15.01.2010
ES25.01.2010
IS14.02.2010
PT15.02.2010
IE10.04.2010
LU10.04.2010
HU15.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2012/44]AT14.10.2009
BE14.10.2009
CY14.10.2009
CZ14.10.2009
DK14.10.2009
EE14.10.2009
FI14.10.2009
LT14.10.2009
LV14.10.2009
MT14.10.2009
NL14.10.2009
PL14.10.2009
RO14.10.2009
SE14.10.2009
SI14.10.2009
SK14.10.2009
GR15.01.2010
ES25.01.2010
IS14.02.2010
PT15.02.2010
IE10.04.2010
LU10.04.2010
HU15.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
Former [2012/43]AT14.10.2009
BE14.10.2009
CY14.10.2009
CZ14.10.2009
DK14.10.2009
EE14.10.2009
FI14.10.2009
LT14.10.2009
LV14.10.2009
MT14.10.2009
PL14.10.2009
RO14.10.2009
SE14.10.2009
SI14.10.2009
SK14.10.2009
GR15.01.2010
ES25.01.2010
IS14.02.2010
PT15.02.2010
IE10.04.2010
LU10.04.2010
HU15.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
Former [2012/42]AT14.10.2009
BE14.10.2009
CY14.10.2009
CZ14.10.2009
DK14.10.2009
EE14.10.2009
FI14.10.2009
LT14.10.2009
LV14.10.2009
MT14.10.2009
PL14.10.2009
RO14.10.2009
SE14.10.2009
SI14.10.2009
SK14.10.2009
GR15.01.2010
ES25.01.2010
IS14.02.2010
PT15.02.2010
IE10.04.2010
HU15.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
Former [2012/37]AT14.10.2009
BE14.10.2009
CY14.10.2009
CZ14.10.2009
DK14.10.2009
EE14.10.2009
FI14.10.2009
LT14.10.2009
LV14.10.2009
MT14.10.2009
PL14.10.2009
RO14.10.2009
SE14.10.2009
SI14.10.2009
SK14.10.2009
GR15.01.2010
ES25.01.2010
IS14.02.2010
PT15.02.2010
IE10.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
Former [2011/41]AT14.10.2009
BE14.10.2009
CZ14.10.2009
DK14.10.2009
EE14.10.2009
FI14.10.2009
LT14.10.2009
LV14.10.2009
MT14.10.2009
PL14.10.2009
RO14.10.2009
SE14.10.2009
SI14.10.2009
SK14.10.2009
GR15.01.2010
ES25.01.2010
IS14.02.2010
PT15.02.2010
IE10.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
Former [2011/25]AT14.10.2009
BE14.10.2009
CZ14.10.2009
DK14.10.2009
EE14.10.2009
FI14.10.2009
LT14.10.2009
LV14.10.2009
MT14.10.2009
PL14.10.2009
RO14.10.2009
SE14.10.2009
SI14.10.2009
SK14.10.2009
GR15.01.2010
ES25.01.2010
IS14.02.2010
PT15.02.2010
IE10.04.2010
IT10.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
Former [2010/43]AT14.10.2009
BE14.10.2009
CZ14.10.2009
DK14.10.2009
EE14.10.2009
FI14.10.2009
LT14.10.2009
LV14.10.2009
PL14.10.2009
RO14.10.2009
SE14.10.2009
SI14.10.2009
SK14.10.2009
ES25.01.2010
IS14.02.2010
PT15.02.2010
Former [2010/29]AT14.10.2009
BE14.10.2009
FI14.10.2009
LT14.10.2009
LV14.10.2009
PL14.10.2009
SE14.10.2009
SI14.10.2009
ES25.01.2010
IS14.02.2010
PT15.02.2010
Former [2010/27]FI14.10.2009
LT14.10.2009
LV14.10.2009
PL14.10.2009
SE14.10.2009
SI14.10.2009
ES25.01.2010
IS14.02.2010
PT15.02.2010
Former [2010/19]ES25.01.2010
Cited inInternational search[YX]US3391411  (MILLER JR ANTHONY S) [Y] 1,4,8,9 * abstract * * column 3, lines 53-61 * * figures 1,8 * [X] 16;
 [DY]GB2174219  (GILFILLAN JAMES IAIN MCGREGOR) [DY] 1,4,8,9 * page 3, lines 92-110 *;
 [Y]WO9502737  (KOHLER CO [US], et al) [Y] 1 * abstract * * claim 1 * * figure 7 *;
 [A]US6823539  (BANTZ SHANNON R [US])
by applicantDE10031665
 GB2174219
 JP2002206802
 GB2424367
 US5121509
 US6823539