Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2007231

EP2007231 - PRODUCE TREATMENT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.10.2012
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fotofresh Limited
7 Knockrea Park Douglas
Cork / IE
[2012/18]
Former [2009/01]For all designated states
Scott, Lionel
Dinyan Cottage, 96 High Street, Hinxton, Saffron Walden
Essex CB10 1R / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Scott, Lionel
Dinyan Cottage, 96 High Street
Hinxton, Saffron, Walden Essex CB10 1R / GB
 [2012/18]
Former [2009/01]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Wise, Stephen James , et al
Murgitroyd & Company
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow, G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]Wise, Stephen James , et al
Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow, G5 8PL / GB
Former [2009/01]Wise, Stephen James , et al
Raworth Moss & Cook Raworth House 36 Sydenham Road
Croydon, Surrey CR0 2EF / GB
Application number, filing date07732357.410.04.2007
[2009/01]
WO2007GB01313
Priority number, dateGB2006000729311.04.2006         Original published format: GB 0607293
GB2006000929010.05.2006         Original published format: GB 0609290
[2009/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007128988
Date:15.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2007231
Date:31.12.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2007
[2009/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2007231
Date:07.12.2011
Language:EN
[2011/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:A23L3/26, A23L2/08, A23B7/01
[2009/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/48]
Former [2009/01]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON PRODUKTEN[2009/01]
English:PRODUCE TREATMENT METHOD[2009/01]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE PRODUITS[2009/01]
Entry into regional phase03.11.2008National basic fee paid 
03.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
03.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.11.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/01]
09.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.04.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.05.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.09.2011Fee for grant paid
13.09.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.12.2010
Opposition(s)10.09.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
24.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201105   M06   Fee paid on   24.10.2011
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.04.2007
AT07.12.2011
BE07.12.2011
CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
DK07.12.2011
EE07.12.2011
LT07.12.2011
LV07.12.2011
MT07.12.2011
PL07.12.2011
RO07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
SK07.12.2011
TR07.12.2011
BG07.03.2012
GR08.03.2012
ES18.03.2012
IS07.04.2012
PT09.04.2012
LU10.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT07.12.2011
BE07.12.2011
CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
DK07.12.2011
EE07.12.2011
LT07.12.2011
LV07.12.2011
MT07.12.2011
PL07.12.2011
RO07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
SK07.12.2011
TR07.12.2011
BG07.03.2012
GR08.03.2012
ES18.03.2012
IS07.04.2012
PT09.04.2012
LU10.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
Former [2014/21]AT07.12.2011
BE07.12.2011
CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
DK07.12.2011
EE07.12.2011
LT07.12.2011
LV07.12.2011
MT07.12.2011
PL07.12.2011
RO07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
SK07.12.2011
TR07.12.2011
BG07.03.2012
GR08.03.2012
ES18.03.2012
IS07.04.2012
PT09.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
Former [2013/46]AT07.12.2011
BE07.12.2011
CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
DK07.12.2011
EE07.12.2011
LT07.12.2011
LV07.12.2011
MT07.12.2011
PL07.12.2011
RO07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
SK07.12.2011
BG07.03.2012
GR08.03.2012
ES18.03.2012
IS07.04.2012
PT09.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
Former [2013/35]AT07.12.2011
BE07.12.2011
CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
DK07.12.2011
EE07.12.2011
LT07.12.2011
LV07.12.2011
MT07.12.2011
PL07.12.2011
RO07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
SK07.12.2011
BG07.03.2012
GR08.03.2012
IS07.04.2012
PT09.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
Former [2013/07]AT07.12.2011
BE07.12.2011
CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
DK07.12.2011
EE07.12.2011
LT07.12.2011
LV07.12.2011
PL07.12.2011
RO07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
SK07.12.2011
BG07.03.2012
GR08.03.2012
IS07.04.2012
PT09.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
Former [2012/50]BE07.12.2011
CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
DK07.12.2011
EE07.12.2011
LT07.12.2011
LV07.12.2011
PL07.12.2011
RO07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
SK07.12.2011
BG07.03.2012
GR08.03.2012
IS07.04.2012
PT09.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
Former [2012/49]BE07.12.2011
CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
DK07.12.2011
EE07.12.2011
LT07.12.2011
LV07.12.2011
PL07.12.2011
RO07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
SK07.12.2011
BG07.03.2012
GR08.03.2012
IS07.04.2012
PT09.04.2012
Former [2012/37]BE07.12.2011
CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
EE07.12.2011
LT07.12.2011
LV07.12.2011
PL07.12.2011
RO07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
SK07.12.2011
BG07.03.2012
GR08.03.2012
IS07.04.2012
PT09.04.2012
Former [2012/36]BE07.12.2011
CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
EE07.12.2011
LT07.12.2011
LV07.12.2011
RO07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
SK07.12.2011
BG07.03.2012
GR08.03.2012
IS07.04.2012
Former [2012/35]BE07.12.2011
CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
EE07.12.2011
LT07.12.2011
LV07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
BG07.03.2012
GR08.03.2012
IS07.04.2012
Former [2012/34]BE07.12.2011
CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
LT07.12.2011
LV07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
GR08.03.2012
IS07.04.2012
Former [2012/30]BE07.12.2011
CY07.12.2011
LT07.12.2011
LV07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
GR08.03.2012
Former [2012/28]CY07.12.2011
LT07.12.2011
LV07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
GR08.03.2012
Former [2012/24]LT07.12.2011
LV07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
GR08.03.2012
Former [2012/20]LT07.12.2011
Cited inInternational search[X]WO8910069  (FOODCO CORP [US]) [X] 1-44 * page 2, lines 6-24 * * page 4, line 2 - page 6, line 28; claims 1-5 *;
 [DA]GB2402037  (PHYTELUM LTD [GB]) [DA] * the whole document *;
 [A]US3578464  (MPELKAS CHRISTOS C) [A] * the whole document *;
 [DA]FR2542567  (GTE LABORATORIES INC [US]) [DA] * the whole document *