blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2007231 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2007231



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 197
12.10.2012 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
02.04.2012 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
29.02.2012 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 3
10.11.2011 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
27.10.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
27.10.2011 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
24.10.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
24.10.2011 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
19.09.2011 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
13.09.2011 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
13.09.2011 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
13.09.2011 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
05.07.2011 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
22.06.2011 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
07.06.2011 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
17.05.2011 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
17.05.2011 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
17.05.2011 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
17.05.2011 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
11.04.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.12.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
09.12.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.03.2010 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
26.03.2010 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
26.03.2010 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
16.10.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
23.04.2009 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
23.04.2009 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
26.01.2009 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
22.01.2009 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
03.12.2008 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
03.12.2008 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
03.12.2008 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
03.12.2008 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
03.12.2008 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
02.12.2008 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 4
28.11.2008 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
25.11.2008 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
03.11.2008 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
03.11.2008 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
03.11.2008 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
03.11.2008 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
29.10.2008 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
19.09.2008 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
03.12.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 30
03.12.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 25
15.11.2007 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
15.11.2007 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 21
21.05.2007 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
21.05.2007 Claims International Searching Authority 5
21.05.2007 Description International Searching Authority 15
21.05.2007 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1