blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2007231


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
18.07.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.08.2014  [2014/34]
30.05.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.07.2014  [2014/27]
18.04.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.05.2014  [2014/21]
11.10.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.11.2013  [2013/46]
26.07.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.08.2013  [2013/35]
11.01.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.02.2013  [2013/07]
09.11.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2012  [2012/50]
02.11.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.12.2012  [2012/49]
12.10.2012 No opposition filed within time limit published on  14.11.2012  [2012/46]
10.08.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.09.2012  [2012/37]
03.08.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.09.2012  [2012/36]
27.07.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2012  [2012/35]
20.07.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2012  [2012/34]
22.06.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.07.2012  [2012/30]
08.06.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.07.2012  [2012/28]
18.05.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2012  [2012/25]
11.05.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.06.2012  [2012/24]
13.04.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.05.2012  [2012/20]
30.03.2012 Change - applicant published on  02.05.2012  [2012/18]
30.03.2012 Change - inventor published on  02.05.2012  [2012/18]
04.11.2011 (Expected) grant published on  07.12.2011  [2011/49]
28.10.2011 Change - designated states published on  30.11.2011  [2011/48]
27.10.2011 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
27.10.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.09.2011 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
21.09.2011 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
01.07.2011 Change - designated states published on  03.08.2011  [2011/31]
30.05.2011 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
06.05.2011 Change - extension states published on  08.06.2011  [2011/23]
02.05.2011 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
11.04.2011 New entry: Reply to examination report
10.12.2010 First examination report
03.12.2010 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.04.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.10.2009 Change - representative published on  25.11.2009  [2009/48]
04.05.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.11.2008 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  31.12.2008  [2009/01]
28.11.2008 Request for examination filed published on  31.12.2008  [2009/01]
25.11.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
11.11.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
11.11.2008 Amendment by applicant
08.11.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
08.11.2008 Amendment by applicant
09.02.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
17.11.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
01.08.2007 PCT data prior to European publication