Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2024041

EP2024041 - TRAINING OR EXERCISE APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.07.2011
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.08.2011  [2011/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Reen, Daniel J.
107 Hampden Road, Harrow
Middlesex, HA3 5PS / GB
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2009/46]
Former [2009/08]Dean, Michael Brian
37 Glanleam Road Stanmore
Middlesex HA7 4NW / GB
Application number, filing date07732438.216.04.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007GB01396
Priority number, dateGB2006000948115.05.2006         Original published format: GB 0609481
GB2007000721316.04.2007         Original published format: GB 0707213
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007132144
Date:22.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2024041
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:A63B69/20
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:TRAINING- ODER ÜBUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2009/08]
English:TRAINING OR EXERCISE APPARATUS[2009/08]
French:APPAREIL D'EXERCICE PHYSIQUE OU D'ENTRAÎNEMENT[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase15.12.2008National basic fee paid 
15.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
15.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
26.02.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
15.05.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
16.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.03.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.09.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.02.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/31]
18.03.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2011/31]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.09.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
13.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201004   M06   Fee paid on   13.10.2010
30.04.201105   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]US6063011  (PELCHAT WILLIAM S [US]) [A] 1-29,32-37,39-58 * column 2, line 6 - line 17 * * column 3, line 13 - line 23; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US4434980  (BABINEAUX BERNARD J [US]) [A] 1-29,32-37,39-58 * abstract *;
 [A]GB2389058  (MAHON-DALY MICHAEL DAVID [GB]) [A] 1,29,32,41,42 * page 2, line 13 - line 15 * * page 2, line 24 - line 26 * * page 3, line 13 - line 15; figures 1,2 *