Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2021858

EP2021858 - ACCESSORY FOR ATTENUATED TOTAL INTERNAL REFLECTANCE (ATR) SPECTROSCOPY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.10.2018New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Perkinelmer Singapore PTE Ltd.
47 Ayer Rajah Crescent, 06-12
Singapore 139947 / SG
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / HOULT, Robert, Alan
Stable Cottage Finch Lane Knotty Green Beaconsfield
Buckinghamshire HP9 2TL / GB
02 / CARTER, Ralph, Lance
Corner Lodge Chinnor Road Towersey Nr Thame
Oxon OX9 3QY / GB
03 / CANAS WILKINSON, Antonio
32 Thetford Road
New Malden, Surrey KT3 5DT / GB
04 / STYLES, Paul
34 Beaconsfield Road Aylesbury
Buckinghamshire HP21 7SA / GB
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Faulkner, Thomas John , et al
Cleveland
10 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Faulkner, Thomas John , et al
fJ Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1JQ / GB
Application number, filing date07732568.626.04.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007GB01531
Priority number, dateGB2006000825826.04.2006         Original published format: GB 0608258
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007125329
Date:08.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/45]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2021858
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2007
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.01.2008
ClassificationInternational:G02B21/26, G02B21/32, G01N21/55
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:HILFSEINRICHTUNG FÜR DIE SPEKTROSKOPIE MIT GEDÄMPFTER GESAMTINTERNREFLEXION (ATR)[2009/07]
English:ACCESSORY FOR ATTENUATED TOTAL INTERNAL REFLECTANCE (ATR) SPECTROSCOPY[2009/07]
French:ACCESSOIRE POUR LA SPECTROSCOPIE À RÉFLEXION INTERNE TOTALE ATTÉNUÉE (ATR)[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase20.11.2008National basic fee paid 
20.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
20.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
05.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.09.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.09.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.11.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.11.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)EP09009908.6  / EP2113766
EP11156870.5  / EP2322968
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.03.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
26.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
25.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
25.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
29.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
28.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
27.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
27.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
27.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
27.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
Cited inInternational search[X]US5278413  (YAMAGUCHI TETSUJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-7,11 * column 3, line 45 - column 5, line 60; figures 3-5 *;
 [DA]EP0730145  (PERKIN ELMER LTD [GB]) [DA] 1 * abstract *;
 [DA]EP0819932  (PERKIN ELMER LTD [GB]) [DA] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0489588  (SPECTRA TECH INC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH11166889  (ST JAPAN KK) [A] 1 * abstract *