Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2027429

EP2027429 - CONTACT SENSING PROBE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.05.2016
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.05.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.06.2016  [2016/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Renishaw PLC
New Mills Wotton-Under-Edge
Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB
[2009/09]
Inventor(s)01 / WESTON, Nicholas, John
Monksford 1 Edderston Road
Peebles Peebleshire EH45 9DT / GB
02 / MCFARLAND, Geoffrey
West End Farmhouse West End Wickwar
Wotton-under-edge Gloucestershire GL12 8LD / GB
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Jackson, John Timothy
Renishaw plc
Patent Department
New Mills
Wotton-under-Edge
Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]Jackson, John Timothy
Renishaw plc Patent Department New Mills Wotton-under-Edge
Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB
Application number, filing date07732705.408.05.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007GB01676
Priority number, dateGB2006000899808.05.2006         Original published format: GB 0608998
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007129082
Date:15.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2027429
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2007
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:G01B7/012
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
TitleGerman:KONTAKTPRÜFSONDE[2009/09]
English:CONTACT SENSING PROBE[2009/09]
French:SONDE DE DÉTECTION DE CONTACT[2009/09]
Entry into regional phase04.12.2008National basic fee paid 
04.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
04.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
10.11.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.03.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.09.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.10.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.12.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.04.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.07.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.12.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/23]
19.01.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2016/23]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.11.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
24.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
22.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
27.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
21.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
Cited inInternational search[XA]GB2070249  (RANK ORGANISATION LTD) [X] 1-11 * page 6, lines 42-53 * * page 7, lines 6-17 * * page 7, lines 28-45 * * page 7, lines 86-113 * * abstract * [A] 12,13;
 [XA]US2002005062  (MATSUKI KAORU [JP], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0038] - [0049] * * abstract * [A] 12,13;
 [A]EP0093299  (ZEISS CARL FA [DE]) [A] 1-13 * page 7, paragraphs 2,3 * * figure 8 *
by applicantGB2006435
 US5247751
 US5247551
 GB2070249
 US2002005062
 EP0730210