Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2021056

EP2021056 - INJECTION DEVICE WITH A SHUTTER ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.10.2018
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.06.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 28.08.2019 [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OWEN MUMFORD LIMITED
Brook Hill
Woodstock, Oxford OX20 ITU / GB
[2018/46]
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
OWEN MUMFORD LIMITED
Brook Hill
Woodstock, Oxford OX20 1TU / GB
Inventor(s)01 / EVANS, Timothy Simon
7 Pococks Close
Bampton
Oxfordshire OX18 2JY / GB
 [2018/46]
Former [2009/07]01 / EVANS, Timothy Simon
7 Pococks Close Bampton
Oxfordshire OX18 2JY / GB
Representative(s)Wynne-Jones IP Limited
2nd Floor, 5210 Valiant Court
Gloucester Business Park
Gloucester
Gloucestershire GL3 4FE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/46]Wynne-Jones IP Limited
Essex Place
22 Rodney Road
Cheltenham
Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB
Former [2009/07]Newell, William Joseph , et al
Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James LLP Essex Place 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham
Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB
Application number, filing date07732750.010.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007GB01724
Priority number, dateGB2006000922910.05.2006         Original published format: GB 0609229
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007129106
Date:15.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/46]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2021056
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2007
[2009/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2021056
Date:14.11.2018
Language:EN
[2018/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/20, A61M5/31, A61M5/32
[2018/25]
Former International [2009/07]A61M5/24
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   PL [2018/46]
Former [2009/23]DE,  FR,  GB,  PL 
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:INJEKTIONSGERÄT MIT VERSCHLUSSELEMENT[2009/07]
English:INJECTION DEVICE WITH A SHUTTER ELEMENT[2009/07]
French:DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION AVEC ELEMENT DE FERMETURE[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase26.11.2008National basic fee paid 
26.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
26.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.03.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.11.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
12.11.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
20.01.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
01.09.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.03.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.07.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.01.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.02.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.02.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.10.2018Fee for grant paid
03.10.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.10.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP13178016.5  / EP2674182
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.09.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
25.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
25.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
28.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
29.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
29.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
03.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
10.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
24.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipPL14.11.2018
[2019/35]
Cited inInternational search[X]US3702609  (STEINER MAURICE) [X] 1-5 * figures 1-6 * * column 2, line 46 - column 4, line 45 *;
 [X]US2005124933  (SEGAL ALAN J [GB]) [X] 1,2 * figures 1-8 * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0094] *;
 [X]US2002050462  (PENNEY MELINDA [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * figures 1-15 * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0063] *;
 [PX]WO2006061170  (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [PX] 1,2 * figures 1-5 * * page 5, line 5 - page 7, line 27; claim 1 *;
 [A]US2005148933  (RAVEN SOPHIE R [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-17 * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0079] *;
 [A]US6530904  (EDWARDS EVAN T [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 51 - column 6, line 29; figures 1-7 *;
 [X]GB2414398  (CILAG AG INT [CH]) [X] 16-19 * figures 1-8 * * page 5, line 13 - page 12, line 19 *;
 [X]WO03013632  (OWEN MUMFORD LTD [GB], et al) [X] 16-19 * figures 1-10 * * page 8, line 9 - page 6, line 15 *;
 [X]WO2005070481  (MEDICAL HOUSE PLC [GB], et al) [X] 16-19 * figures 1-27 * * page 23, line 15 - line 28 * * page 17, line 6 - line 14 *
by applicantGB2414398
 WO03013632
 WO2005070481