Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2021775

EP2021775 - METHOD FOR OBTAINING SPECTRAL INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/07]APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR OBTAINING SPECTRAL INFORMATION
[2010/18]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.09.2011
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Imperial Innovations Limited
Electrical and Electronic Engineering Building, Level 12, Imperial College Exhibition Road
London SW7 2AZ / GB
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / KLUG, David, Robert
10A Belsize Park Gardens
London NW3 4LD / GB
02 / DONALDSON, Paul, Murray
25 Farleigh Road
London N16 7TB / GB
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Bollinghaus, Emer , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Clifford, Emer , et al
Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street
GB-London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date07732924.123.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007GB01903
Priority number, dateGB2006001046225.05.2006         Original published format: GB 0610462
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007138267
Date:06.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2021775
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007
[2009/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2021775
Date:24.11.2010
Language:EN
[2010/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/65
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR GEWINNUNG SPEKTRALER INFORMATIONEN[2010/18]
English:METHOD FOR OBTAINING SPECTRAL INFORMATION[2010/18]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'ACQUISITION D'INFORMATIONS SPECTRALES[2010/18]
Former [2009/07]VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR GEWINNUNG SPEKTRALER INFORMATIONEN
Former [2009/07]APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR OBTAINING SPECTRAL INFORMATION
Former [2009/07]APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ D'ACQUISITION D'INFORMATIONS SPECTRALES
Entry into regional phase01.12.2008National basic fee paid 
01.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
01.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
25.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.04.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.07.2010Fee for grant paid
21.07.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.08.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
08.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200903   M06   Fee paid on   25.11.2009
31.05.201004   M06   Fee paid on   08.10.2010
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT24.11.2010
BE24.11.2010
CY24.11.2010
CZ24.11.2010
DK24.11.2010
EE24.11.2010
FI24.11.2010
HU24.11.2010
IT24.11.2010
LT24.11.2010
LV24.11.2010
MT24.11.2010
NL24.11.2010
PL24.11.2010
RO24.11.2010
SE24.11.2010
SI24.11.2010
SK24.11.2010
TR24.11.2010
BG24.02.2011
GR25.02.2011
ES07.03.2011
IS24.03.2011
PT24.03.2011
IE23.05.2011
LU23.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT24.11.2010
BE24.11.2010
CY24.11.2010
CZ24.11.2010
DK24.11.2010
EE24.11.2010
FI24.11.2010
IT24.11.2010
LT24.11.2010
LV24.11.2010
MT24.11.2010
NL24.11.2010
PL24.11.2010
RO24.11.2010
SE24.11.2010
SI24.11.2010
SK24.11.2010
TR24.11.2010
BG24.02.2011
GR25.02.2011
ES07.03.2011
IS24.03.2011
PT24.03.2011
IE23.05.2011
LU23.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
Former [2013/25]AT24.11.2010
BE24.11.2010
CY24.11.2010
CZ24.11.2010
DK24.11.2010
EE24.11.2010
FI24.11.2010
IT24.11.2010
LT24.11.2010
LV24.11.2010
MT24.11.2010
NL24.11.2010
PL24.11.2010
RO24.11.2010
SE24.11.2010
SI24.11.2010
SK24.11.2010
BG24.02.2011
GR25.02.2011
ES07.03.2011
IS24.03.2011
PT24.03.2011
IE23.05.2011
LU23.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
Former [2012/20]AT24.11.2010
BE24.11.2010
CY24.11.2010
CZ24.11.2010
DK24.11.2010
EE24.11.2010
FI24.11.2010
IT24.11.2010
LT24.11.2010
LV24.11.2010
MT24.11.2010
NL24.11.2010
PL24.11.2010
RO24.11.2010
SE24.11.2010
SI24.11.2010
SK24.11.2010
BG24.02.2011
GR25.02.2011
ES07.03.2011
IS24.03.2011
PT24.03.2011
IE23.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
Former [2012/05]AT24.11.2010
BE24.11.2010
CY24.11.2010
CZ24.11.2010
DK24.11.2010
EE24.11.2010
FI24.11.2010
IT24.11.2010
LT24.11.2010
LV24.11.2010
MT24.11.2010
NL24.11.2010
PL24.11.2010
RO24.11.2010
SE24.11.2010
SI24.11.2010
SK24.11.2010
BG24.02.2011
GR25.02.2011
ES07.03.2011
IS24.03.2011
PT24.03.2011
MC31.05.2011
Former [2012/03]AT24.11.2010
BE24.11.2010
CY24.11.2010
CZ24.11.2010
DK24.11.2010
EE24.11.2010
FI24.11.2010
IT24.11.2010
LT24.11.2010
LV24.11.2010
NL24.11.2010
PL24.11.2010
RO24.11.2010
SE24.11.2010
SI24.11.2010
SK24.11.2010
BG24.02.2011
GR25.02.2011
ES07.03.2011
IS24.03.2011
PT24.03.2011
Former [2011/38]AT24.11.2010
BE24.11.2010
CY24.11.2010
CZ24.11.2010
DK24.11.2010
EE24.11.2010
FI24.11.2010
LT24.11.2010
LV24.11.2010
NL24.11.2010
PL24.11.2010
RO24.11.2010
SE24.11.2010
SI24.11.2010
SK24.11.2010
BG24.02.2011
GR25.02.2011
ES07.03.2011
IS24.03.2011
PT24.03.2011
Former [2011/35]AT24.11.2010
BE24.11.2010
CY24.11.2010
CZ24.11.2010
EE24.11.2010
FI24.11.2010
LT24.11.2010
LV24.11.2010
NL24.11.2010
SE24.11.2010
SI24.11.2010
BG24.02.2011
GR25.02.2011
ES07.03.2011
IS24.03.2011
PT24.03.2011
Former [2011/34]AT24.11.2010
BE24.11.2010
CY24.11.2010
FI24.11.2010
LT24.11.2010
LV24.11.2010
NL24.11.2010
SE24.11.2010
SI24.11.2010
BG24.02.2011
GR25.02.2011
ES07.03.2011
IS24.03.2011
PT24.03.2011
Former [2011/29]AT24.11.2010
CY24.11.2010
FI24.11.2010
LT24.11.2010
LV24.11.2010
NL24.11.2010
SE24.11.2010
SI24.11.2010
BG24.02.2011
GR25.02.2011
IS24.03.2011
PT24.03.2011
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2004031749  (INTEL CORP [US]) [Y] 1,8,13 * page 25, line 3 - page 28, line 18 *
 [XA]  - WEI ZHAO ET AL, "Doubly vibrationally enhanced four wave mixing: the optical analog to 2D NMR", PHYSICAL REVIEW LETTERS, NEW YORK,NY, US, (20000214), vol. 84, no. 7, ISSN 0031-9007, pages 1411 - 1414, XP002395438 [X] 1,8,13 * page 1411, column 1, line 2 - page 1412, column 2 * [A] 2-7,9-12

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1103/PhysRevLett.84.6046
 [XA]  - RASCHKE M B ET AL, "Doubly-resonant sum-frequency generation spectroscopy for surface studies", CHEMICAL PHYSICS LETTERS, NORTH-HOLLAND, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20020627), vol. 359, no. 5-6, ISSN 0009-2614, pages 367 - 372, XP002395434 [X] 1,8,13 * page 367, column 1 - page 368, column 1, line 7 * * page 369, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 3 * * page 372, column 1, paragraph 2 * [A] 3-7,10-12

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0009-2614(02)00560-2
 [Y]  - BONN M ET AL, "Novel surface vibrational spectroscopy: Infrared-infrared-visible sum-frequency generation", PHYSICAL REVIEW LETTERS, NEW YORK,NY, US, (20010219), vol. 86, no. 8, ISSN 0031-9007, pages 1566 - 1569, XP002395435 [Y] 1,8,13 * page 1566, column 1 - page 1567, column 2, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1103/PhysRevLett.86.1566
 [Y]  - ISHIBASHI T ET AL, "MULTIPLEX SUM-FREQUENCY SPECTROSCOPY WITH ELECTRONIC RESONANCE ENHANCEMENT", CHEMISTRY LETTERS, NIPPON KAGAKUKAI, TOKYO, JP, (2004), vol. 33, no. 11, ISSN 0366-7022, pages 1404 - 1407, XP008067944 [Y] 1,8,13 * page 1404, column 1 * * page 1406, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1246/cl.2004.1404