Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2024464

EP2024464 - IMPROVED ACIDIC TREATMENT FLUIDS AND ASSOCIATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.08.2012
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.08.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.09.2012  [2012/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC.
P.O. Box 1431
Duncan, OK 73536 / US
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / CASSIDY, Juanita, M.
930 Woodside Drive
Duncan, OK 73533 / US
02 / LANE, Jim, L.
511 N. 11th Street
Duncan, OK 73533 / US
03 / KISER, Chad, E.
RR32, Box 229
Comanche, OK 73529 / US
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Curtis, Philip Anthony
A.A. Thornton & Co.
10 Old Bailey
London EC4M 7NG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/52]Curtis, Philip Anthony
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London
WC1V 7LE / GB
Former [2009/08]Curtis, Philip Anthony
A A Thornton & Co Chemical 235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Application number, filing date07733094.206.06.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007GB02082
Priority number, dateUS2006044894507.06.2006         Original published format: US 448945
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007141524
Date:13.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2024464
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:C09K8/54, C09K8/62, C09K8/66, C09K8/74, C09K8/72
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2009/28]
Former [2009/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTE SAUERBEHANDLUNGSFLUIDE UND DAZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN[2009/08]
English:IMPROVED ACIDIC TREATMENT FLUIDS AND ASSOCIATED METHODS[2009/08]
French:FLUIDES DE TRAITEMENT ACIDE AMÉLIORÉS ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase30.10.2008National basic fee paid 
30.10.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
30.10.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.10.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
08.01.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
19.02.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
08.07.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.02.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.03.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/37]
26.04.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2012/37]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.07.2009
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
07.02.2011Request for further processing filed
07.02.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.02.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
07.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201206   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US2004211562  (BROTHERS LANCE E [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0029] *;
 [A]US2004152602  (BOLES JOEL LYNN [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5753596  (MARTIN RICHARD L [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * claim 1 * * column 1, line 44 - line 56 *;
 [A]US3885630  (RICHARDSON EDWIN A) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *