Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2027489

EP2027489 - IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO TARGET TRACKING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.06.2015
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.10.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, HU, TR
published on 15.11.2017  [2017/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAE Systems PLC
6 Carlton Gardens
London SW1Y 5AD / GB
[2014/34]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
BAE Systems PLC
6 Carlton Gardens
London SW1Y 5AD / GB
Inventor(s)01 / NETTLETON, Eric William
Bae Systems plc
ATC Sowerby
PO Box 5
Filton Bristol BS34 7QW / GB
02 / LLOYD, Christopher Mark
Bae Systems plc
ATC Sowerby
PO Box 5
Filton Bristol BS34 7QW / GB
 [2014/34]
Former [2009/09]01 / NETTLETON, Eric William
Bae Systems plc ATC Sowerby PO Box 5
Filton Bristol BS34 7QW / GB
02 / LLOYD, Christopher Mark
Bae Systems plc ATC Sowerby PO Box 5
Filton Bristol BS34 7QW / GB
Representative(s)BAE SYSTEMS plc Group IP Department
P.O. Box 87
Warwick House
Farnborough Aerospace Centre
Farnborough
Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB
[2014/34]
Former [2009/09]BAE SYSTEMS plc Group IP Department
Lancaster House P.O. Box 87 Farnborough Aerospace Centre
Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB
Application number, filing date07733105.608.06.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007GB02093
Priority number, dateGB2006001157213.06.2006         Original published format: GB 0611572
EP2006027005813.06.2006         Original published format: EP 06270058
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007144570
Date:21.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2027489
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007
[2009/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2027489
Date:20.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:G01S13/87, G01S13/72
[2014/18]
Former International [2009/09]G01S13/72
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBESSERUNGEN IN BEZUG AUF DIE ZIELVERFOLGUNG[2009/09]
English:IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO TARGET TRACKING[2009/09]
French:AMÉLIORATIONS CONCERNANT LA POURSUITE D'UNE CIBLE[2009/09]
Entry into regional phase26.11.2008National basic fee paid 
26.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
26.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.11.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
27.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.01.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.02.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.07.2014Fee for grant paid
11.07.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.07.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.10.2009
Opposition(s)21.05.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
22.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
27.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
20.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
25.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU08.06.2007
AT20.08.2014
BE20.08.2014
CY20.08.2014
CZ20.08.2014
DK20.08.2014
EE20.08.2014
FI20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
LV20.08.2014
MC20.08.2014
MT20.08.2014
NL20.08.2014
PL20.08.2014
RO20.08.2014
SI20.08.2014
SK20.08.2014
TR20.08.2014
BG20.11.2014
GR21.11.2014
IS20.12.2014
PT22.12.2014
[2017/39]
Former [2017/03]AT20.08.2014
BE20.08.2014
CZ20.08.2014
DK20.08.2014
EE20.08.2014
FI20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
LV20.08.2014
MC20.08.2014
MT20.08.2014
NL20.08.2014
PL20.08.2014
RO20.08.2014
SI20.08.2014
SK20.08.2014
BG20.11.2014
GR21.11.2014
IS20.12.2014
PT22.12.2014
Former [2016/33]AT20.08.2014
BE20.08.2014
CZ20.08.2014
DK20.08.2014
EE20.08.2014
FI20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
LV20.08.2014
MC20.08.2014
NL20.08.2014
PL20.08.2014
RO20.08.2014
SI20.08.2014
SK20.08.2014
BG20.11.2014
GR21.11.2014
IS20.12.2014
PT22.12.2014
Former [2016/09]AT20.08.2014
CZ20.08.2014
DK20.08.2014
EE20.08.2014
FI20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
LV20.08.2014
MC20.08.2014
NL20.08.2014
PL20.08.2014
RO20.08.2014
SI20.08.2014
SK20.08.2014
BG20.11.2014
GR21.11.2014
IS20.12.2014
PT22.12.2014
Former [2015/50]AT20.08.2014
CZ20.08.2014
DK20.08.2014
EE20.08.2014
FI20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
LV20.08.2014
NL20.08.2014
PL20.08.2014
RO20.08.2014
SI20.08.2014
SK20.08.2014
BG20.11.2014
GR21.11.2014
IS20.12.2014
PT22.12.2014
Former [2015/24]AT20.08.2014
CZ20.08.2014
DK20.08.2014
EE20.08.2014
FI20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
LV20.08.2014
NL20.08.2014
PL20.08.2014
RO20.08.2014
SK20.08.2014
BG20.11.2014
GR21.11.2014
IS20.12.2014
PT22.12.2014
Former [2015/23]AT20.08.2014
CZ20.08.2014
DK20.08.2014
EE20.08.2014
FI20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
LV20.08.2014
NL20.08.2014
RO20.08.2014
SK20.08.2014
BG20.11.2014
GR21.11.2014
IS20.12.2014
PT22.12.2014
Former [2015/22]AT20.08.2014
DK20.08.2014
FI20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
LV20.08.2014
NL20.08.2014
RO20.08.2014
BG20.11.2014
GR21.11.2014
IS20.12.2014
PT22.12.2014
Former [2015/16]AT20.08.2014
FI20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
LV20.08.2014
NL20.08.2014
BG20.11.2014
GR21.11.2014
IS20.12.2014
PT22.12.2014
Former [2015/12]AT20.08.2014
FI20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
LV20.08.2014
BG20.11.2014
GR21.11.2014
IS20.12.2014
PT22.12.2014
Former [2015/11]FI20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
BG20.11.2014
GR21.11.2014
PT22.12.2014
Former [2015/10]FI20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
BG20.11.2014
Former [2015/09]FI20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
Former [2015/08]LT20.08.2014
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5325098  (BLAIR WILLIAM D [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,4,5,7,9,13-17 * column 2, line 13 - column 4, line 28; figure 1 *;
 [Y]  - RIDLEY M ET AL, "Decentralised ground target tracking with heterogeneous sensing nodes on multiple UAVs", INFORMATION PROCESSING IN SENSOR NETWORKS. SECOND INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP, IPSN 2003. PROCEEDINGS (LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE VOL.2634) SPRINGER-VERLAG BERLIN, GERMANY, (2003), ISBN 3-540-02111-6, pages 545 - 565, XP002407864 [Y] 1,2,4,5,7,9,13-17 * Section 2 "Decentralised Data Fusion", page 546 * * page 548, paragraph below figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-36978-3_37
 [A]  - PUCAR P ET AL, "Decentralized sensor fusion and support using multiple models", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING SPIE-INT. SOC. OPT. ENG USA, (1997), vol. 3068, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 20 - 31, XP002407865 [A] 1,13-17 * Section 3 "Tracking a single target", page 21 - page 26 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.280813
 [A]  - SINHA A ET AL, "Autonomous surveillance by multiple cooperative UAVs", PROC SPIE INT SOC OPT ENG; PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING; SIGNAL AND DATA PROCESSING OF SMALL TARGETS 2005 2005, (2005), vol. 5913, pages 1 - 12, XP002407869 [A] 1,13-17 * Page 6, paragraphs below Eq(26), "After scanning .... "*

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.619266
Examination   - LANG RONG ET AL: "Multiplatform multisensor fusion with adaptive-rate data communication", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON AEROSPACE AND ELECTRONIC SYSTEMS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, vol. 33, no. 1, 1 January 1997 (1997-01-01), pages 274-281, XP011201095, ISSN: 0018-9251
by applicant   - T. ITO; M. FAROQ, PROCEEDINGS OF THE WORKSHOP ON ESTIMATION, TRACKING AND FUSION: A TRIBUTE TO YAAKOB BAR-SHALOM, (2001),