blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2010385 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2010385



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1396
20.12.2018 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
20.12.2018 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
20.12.2018 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
14.12.2018 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
10.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
10.12.2018 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
10.12.2018 French translation of claims Opposition 2
10.12.2018 German translation of the claims Opposition 3
10.12.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
26.09.2018 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
20.09.2018 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
07.09.2018 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
07.06.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.06.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
31.05.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.05.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.05.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.05.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.05.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.05.2018 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
28.05.2018 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
28.05.2018 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 11
28.05.2018 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 13
28.05.2018 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
28.05.2018 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
28.05.2018 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
28.05.2018 Letter which had not been notified Opposition 2
28.05.2018 Means of redress Opposition 2
28.05.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
28.05.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
28.05.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
28.05.2018 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
04.05.2018 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.04.2018 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
30.04.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.04.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.04.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.04.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.04.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.04.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.04.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
24.04.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
24.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
24.04.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
20.04.2018 Amended description with annotations Opposition 7
20.04.2018 Description Opposition 7
20.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
20.04.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
12.04.2018 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
12.04.2018 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.04.2018 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.04.2018 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.04.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.04.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
04.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
04.04.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.04.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.03.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.03.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
15.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
15.03.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.03.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.03.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
02.03.2018 Amended description with annotations Opposition 7
02.03.2018 Description Opposition 7
02.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
02.03.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
27.10.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.10.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.10.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.10.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.10.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.10.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.10.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.10.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.10.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
17.10.2017 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
17.10.2017 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
17.10.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.10.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.10.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
23.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
23.06.2017 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.03.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 13
13.03.2017 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
13.03.2017 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
13.03.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
17.01.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.01.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
13.01.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.01.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.01.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.01.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 27
10.01.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
10.01.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
10.01.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
16.11.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
16.11.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
16.11.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
16.11.2016 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 6
03.11.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
03.11.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
27.10.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
24.10.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
21.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.10.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
14.10.2016 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
14.10.2016 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
14.10.2016 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
11.10.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.10.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
10.10.2016 Claims Appeal 2
10.10.2016 Claims Appeal 2
10.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
10.10.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
23.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.09.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
15.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
15.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
15.09.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
12.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
07.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
07.09.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.08.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.08.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
04.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
04.08.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
19.03.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
18.03.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
17.03.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.03.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
15.03.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.03.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
14.03.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
14.03.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
14.03.2016 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 9
09.03.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
19.02.2016 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
27.06.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.06.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
23.06.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
23.06.2014 Reply to appeal Appeal 9
11.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
11.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
11.06.2014 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
19.05.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.05.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.05.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.05.2014 Reply to appeal Appeal 28
26.03.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
20.03.2014 Document concerning representation Opposition 8
19.03.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
19.03.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
19.03.2014 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
05.03.2014 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
27.02.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 7
27.02.2014 Claims Appeal 2
27.02.2014 Claims Appeal 2
27.02.2014 Claims Appeal 2
27.02.2014 Claims Appeal 2
27.02.2014 Claims Appeal 2
27.02.2014 Claims Appeal 2
27.02.2014 Claims Appeal 2
27.02.2014 Claims Appeal 2
27.02.2014 Claims Appeal 2
27.02.2014 Claims Appeal 2
27.02.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
27.02.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
27.02.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
27.02.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
27.02.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 24
24.02.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 51
06.02.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
30.01.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
07.01.2014 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 1
03.01.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 3
21.12.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.12.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
21.12.2013 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
19.12.2013 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
18.12.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.12.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
18.12.2013 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
18.12.2013 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
21.10.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.10.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
18.10.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.10.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.10.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.10.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.10.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.10.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.10.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
14.10.2013 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
14.10.2013 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
14.10.2013 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 12
14.10.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
14.10.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
14.10.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
14.10.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
14.10.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
14.10.2013 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.10.2013 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 6
14.10.2013 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 6
27.09.2013 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.09.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 7
18.09.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.09.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 8
30.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.08.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
26.08.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 8
26.08.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
26.08.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
26.08.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
26.08.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
26.08.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
26.08.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
26.08.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
26.08.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
26.08.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
26.08.2013 Main request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
26.08.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
26.08.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 12
19.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.08.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.07.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.07.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.07.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
27.07.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
27.07.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 16
26.07.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
26.07.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
26.07.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
26.07.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
26.07.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 16
24.07.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
24.07.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
24.07.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.04.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
04.04.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.04.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.04.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.04.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.03.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.03.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.03.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.03.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
28.03.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 4
28.03.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 4
28.03.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 4
21.03.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
24.08.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.08.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.08.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 13
20.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
20.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
20.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
20.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
14.01.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.01.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.01.2011 Claims Opposition 2
13.01.2011 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 15
10.01.2011 Claims Opposition 2
10.01.2011 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 15
02.11.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
02.11.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
02.11.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
29.10.2010 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
27.10.2010 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
30.06.2010 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
30.06.2010 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
30.06.2010 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
29.05.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
29.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
26.05.2010 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
26.05.2010 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
26.05.2010 Request for documents Opposition 1
19.05.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
19.05.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 17
19.05.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
19.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 36
19.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
19.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
19.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
19.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
19.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
19.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
19.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
17.05.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
17.05.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 19
17.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
17.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
17.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 53
17.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
17.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
17.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
17.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
17.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 53
17.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
17.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
17.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 35
23.07.2009 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
06.07.2009 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
06.07.2009 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
06.07.2009 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
23.04.2009 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
23.04.2009 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
23.04.2009 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
23.04.2009 Text intended for grant Search / examination 11
03.03.2009 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
25.02.2009 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 3
10.12.2008 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
04.12.2008 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
29.10.2008 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 10
15.10.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.10.2008 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
05.09.2008 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
21.04.2008 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
21.04.2008 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
21.04.2008 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
21.04.2008 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
21.04.2008 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
21.04.2008 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
21.04.2008 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
21.04.2008 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
21.04.2008 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
02.04.2008 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
27.02.2008 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.02.2008 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
23.02.2008 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
23.02.2008 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
23.02.2008 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
23.02.2008 Reply to International Search Opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
19.02.2008 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
19.02.2008 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
19.02.2008 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
19.02.2008 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
19.02.2008 Reply to International Search Opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
21.11.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 16
01.11.2007 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
01.11.2007 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 12
20.04.2007 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
20.04.2007 Claims International Searching Authority 2
20.04.2007 Description International Searching Authority 7
20.04.2007 Drawings International Searching Authority 2