Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2021520

EP2021520 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING STABILISED METAL NANOPARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.04.2012
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.04.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.05.2012  [2012/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Johnson Matthey Public Limited Company
5th Floor 25 Farringdon Street
London EC4A 4AB / GB
[2011/45]
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
Johnson Matthey Public Limited Company
40-42 Hatton Garden
London EC1N 8EE / GB
Inventor(s)01 / BISHOP, Peter Trenton
16 Baskerville Road Sonning Common
Reading Berkshire RG4 9LS / GB
02 / BOARDMAN, Alan
3 Larch Court Balmore Park
Reading Berkshire RG4 8PY / GB
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Whitcombe, Nicole Jane , et al
Johnson Matthey PLC
Gate 20
Orchard Road
Royston
Hertfordshire SG8 5HE / GB
[2011/45]
Former [2009/07]Whitcombe, Nicole Jane
Johnson Matthey Technology Centre Blount's Court Sonning Common
Reading RG4 9NH / GB
Application number, filing date07733702.022.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007GB50281
Priority number, dateGB2006001040926.05.2006         Original published format: GB 0610409
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007138345
Date:06.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2021520
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:C22B11/00, C22B15/00, B22F9/16, B22F9/24, C07F1/12, C07F1/00
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT,   TR [2009/27]
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON STABILISIERTEN METALLNANOTEILCHEN[2009/07]
English:PROCESS FOR PRODUCING STABILISED METAL NANOPARTICLES[2009/07]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE NANOPARTICULES MÉTALLIQUES STABILISÉES[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase24.11.2008National basic fee paid 
24.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
24.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
30.12.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
03.02.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK
20.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.09.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.04.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.05.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.11.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/20]
03.01.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2012/20]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.03.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
24.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[YX]WO03031323  (KOREA NANO TECHNOLOGY CO LTD [KR], et al) [Y] 1,3,5 * figures 1-4; claims 1,3,4,6,8-10 * * example 7 * [X] 13,14;
 [YX]WO2005118184  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1,3,5 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0039]; claims 41,49-54 * * paragraph [0064]; figure 1 * [X] 14,15;
 [Y]EP0977212  (IBM [US]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0019]; figures 15,16; claims 1,10,11 *;
 [Y]JP2001154215  ;
 [Y]US2005040535  (KAWATA KEN [JP], et al) [Y] 1-9 * page 9, paragraph 111 - paragraph 115; claims 1,4,6 *;
 [Y]EP0969006  (DAIKEN CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-3,5,8,9 * page 6, line 22 - line 30; examples 1-3; claims 3-5 *;
 [YX]JP2005281781  (SUMIYAMA KENJI, et al) [Y] 7 * abstract * [X] 14,15;
 [YX]WO02087749  (POSTECH FOUNDATION [KR], et al) [Y] 4,10 * claims 1,6-10 * * page 14, line 7 - line 11; figures 1-9; examples 3,4 * [X] 11-15;
 [YX]US6391818  (BOENSEL HARALD [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,5,9 * column 5, line 30 - line 40 * * column 6, line 43 - line 64; claims 8-12,21 * * column 5, line 23 - line 28 * [X] 14,15
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 72, Database accession no. 2001-619888, XP002450724 & JP2001154215 A 20010608 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [Y] 1 * abstract *