EP2010993 - ELECTRONIC APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SYMBOL INPUT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2015 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Core Wireless Licensing S.à.r.l. 16, avenue Pasteur 2310 Luxembourg / LU | [2014/34] |
Former [2012/23] | For all designated states Core Wireless Licensing S.à.r.l. 16, avenue Pasteur 2310 Luxembourg / LU | ||
Former [2012/02] | For all designated states 2011 Intellectual Property Asset Trust Wells Fargo Delaware Trust Company National Association 919 North Market Street, Suite 1600 Wilmington DE 19801 / US | ||
Former [2009/02] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JACOBSEN, Niels Sdr. Strandvej 113 DK-2791 Dragør / DK | [2009/02] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/34] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham, NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2013/37] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2012/33] | Khan, Mohammed Saiful Azam, et al Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2012/28] | Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 407 00045 Nokia Group / FI | ||
Former [2010/34] | Coyle-Gilchrist, Matthew John Toby Nokia Corporation IPR Department 2-6 Boundary Row Southwark London SE1 8HP / GB | ||
Former [2009/02] | Milanov, Nina Vendela Maria Awapatent AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 07734145.1 | 26.03.2007 | [2009/02] | WO2007IB00823 | Priority number, date | US20060406490 | 19.04.2006 Original published format: US 406490 | [2009/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007119136 | Date: | 25.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2010993 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2010993 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0488, G06F3/0354, G06F3/023 | [2014/09] | CPC: |
G06F3/04886 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/041 (KR);
G06F1/1626 (EP,KR,US);
G06F1/1643 (KR);
G06F3/0237 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/03547 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/02] | G06F3/041, G06F3/023 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR SYMBOLEINGABE | [2009/02] | English: | ELECTRONIC APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SYMBOL INPUT | [2009/02] | French: | APPAREIL ÉLECTRONIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE SAISIE DE SYMBOLES | [2009/02] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2008 | Examination requested [2009/02] | 15.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.01.2014 | 16.01.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP12159501.1 / EP2485134 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 21.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.03.2007 | AT | 20.08.2014 | CY | 20.08.2014 | CZ | 20.08.2014 | DK | 20.08.2014 | EE | 20.08.2014 | LT | 20.08.2014 | LV | 20.08.2014 | MC | 20.08.2014 | MT | 20.08.2014 | PL | 20.08.2014 | RO | 20.08.2014 | SI | 20.08.2014 | SK | 20.08.2014 | TR | 20.08.2014 | BG | 20.11.2014 | GR | 21.11.2014 | IS | 20.12.2014 | PT | 22.12.2014 | LU | 26.03.2015 | CH | 31.03.2015 | LI | 31.03.2015 | [2017/40] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
MT | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
LU | 26.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
LU | 26.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
LU | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
LU | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | LT | 20.08.2014 | |
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | LT | 20.08.2014 | |
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 20.08.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]CA1200026 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD) [X] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]US5748512 (VARGAS GARRETT R [US]) [A] 10-16 * column 1, line 49 - column 3, line 20 * * abstract ** column 4, line 40 - column 6, line 26; figures 1-4 *; | [X]WO9934574 (ERICSSON GE MOBILE INC [US]) [X] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [X]US2004160419 (PADGITT DAVID GARY [US]) [X] 1-19 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO9934574 |