Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2024372

EP2024372 - THIENO[3,2-D]PYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVE USEFUL AS PI3K INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/08]THIENO [3,2-D] PYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVE USEFUL AS PI3K INHIBITOR
[2009/36]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.04.2011
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.12.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 01.02.2012  [2012/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
F.HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / CHUCKOWREE, Irina
957 Buckingham Avenue
Slough Berks SL1 4NL / GB
02 / FOLKES, Adrian
957 Buckingham Avenue
Slough Berks SL1 4NL / GB
03 / HANCOX, Tim
957 Buckingham Avenue
Slough Berks SL1 4NL / GB
04 / SHUTTLEWORTH, Stephen
957 Buckingham Avenue
Slough Berks SL1 4NL / GB
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Keen, Celia Mary
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]Keen, Celia Mary
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date07734376.224.04.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007IB01058
Priority number, dateUS20060794966P26.04.2006         Original published format: US 794966 P
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007129161
Date:15.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/46]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2024372
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2007
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2024372
Date:23.06.2010
Language:EN
[2010/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.01.2008
ClassificationInternational:C07D495/04, A61K31/519, A61P35/00
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HR26.11.2008
MKNot yet paid
RS26.11.2008
TitleGerman:THIENO[3,2-D]PYRIMIDIN-DERIVAT GEEIGNET ALS PI3K INHIBITOR[2009/08]
English:THIENO[3,2-D]PYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVE USEFUL AS PI3K INHIBITOR[2009/36]
French:DERIVE DE THIENO[3,2-D]PYRIMIDINE UTILE EN TANT QU'INHIBITEUR DE PI3K[2009/08]
Former [2009/08]THIENO [3,2-D] PYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVE USEFUL AS PI3K INHIBITOR
Entry into regional phase26.11.2008National basic fee paid 
26.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
26.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
24.02.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.08.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.12.2009Fee for grant paid
23.12.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10006309.8  / EP2246354
Opposition(s)24.03.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
15.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipMT23.06.2010
IS23.10.2010
[2012/05]
Former [2011/28]IS23.10.2010
Cited inInternational search[PX]WO2006046031  (PIRAMED LTD [GB], et al) [PX] 1-34 * the whole document * * In particular compounds 80, 82, 129, 137, 151-153 and 174-175 *;
 [A]US2005014771  (HAYAKAWA MASAHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-34 * abstract * * paragraphs [0153] - [0176] * * paragraph [0107] * * table 24; compound 190 * * table 26; compounds B7,B10,B13 *;
 [A]WO2005007083  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-34 * abstract *;
 [A]WO03034997  (ICONIX PHARM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-34 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2005046678  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-34 * page 1 - page 4 * * In particular page 2, lines 7-21 *