Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2021417

EP2021417 - HEAT-CURABLE POWDER COATING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.04.2012
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.05.2012  [2012/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Coatings Japan Ltd.
Totsuka Plant, 296, Shimokurata-cho Totsuka-ku
Yokohama 244-0815 / JP
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / UMEHARA, Takafumi
1167-1 Shimokurata-cho
Totsuka-ku Yokohama 244-0815 / JP
02 / TAKAHASHI, Atsushi
c/o BASF Coatings Japan Ltd. 296, Shimokurata-cho
Totsuka-ku, Yokohama 244-0815 / JP
03 / NABESHIMA, Rijun
c/o BASF Coatings Japan Ltd. 296 Shimokurata-cho
Totsuka-ku, Yokohama 244-0815 / JP
 [2009/20]
Former [2009/07]01 / UMEHARA, Takafumi
1167-1 Shimokurata-cho
Totsuka-ku Yokohama 244-0815 / JP
02 / TAKAHASHI, Atsushi
1167-1 Shimokurata-cho
Totsuka-ku Yokohama 244-0815 / JP
03 / NABESHIMA, Rijun
1167-1 Shimokurata-cho
Totsuka-ku Yokohama 244-0815 / JP
Representative(s)Leifert & Steffan Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Patentanwälte
Burgplatz 21-22
40213 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/39]Leifert & Steffan
Patentanwälte Burgplatz 21-22
40213 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2009/07]Hüsener, Susanne
BASF Coatings AG, Patente/Lizenzen/Dokumentation, Postfach 61 23
48136 Münster / DE
Application number, filing date07734498.426.04.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007IB01183
Priority number, dateJP2006014792629.05.2006         Original published format: JP 2006147926
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007138399
Date:06.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/49]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2021417
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.05.2008
ClassificationInternational:C09D5/03, C09D5/08
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:HEISSHÄRTBARER PULVERLACK[2009/07]
English:HEAT-CURABLE POWDER COATING COMPOSITION[2009/07]
French:COMPOSITION DE REVÊTEMENT EN POUDRE THERMODURCISSABLE[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase03.11.2008National basic fee paid 
03.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
03.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
15.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.11.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/19]
20.12.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2012/19]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.05.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
03.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201105   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5399189  (GLORIEUX HUGO A M [BE]) [Y] 1-4 * column 1, lines 11,12 * * column 2, lines 19-31 * * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 8 * * claims 1,2 *;
 [Y]DE19806837  (POLYPLASTICS CO [JP]) [Y] 1-4 * page 1, lines 3,4 * * page 4, lines 22-35 *;
 [A]EP0939111  (TSUBAKIMOTO CHAIN CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0001] , [0012] - [0015] - [0019] - [0022] - [0028] , [0040] * * claims 1,3,4 *