Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2026809

EP2026809 - REVERSION OF MALIGNANT PHENOTYPE WITH 9-HYDROXY ELLIPTICINE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.01.2013
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.01.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.02.2013  [2013/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BioAlliance Pharma
49, boulevard du Général Martial Valin
75015 Paris / FR
For all designated states
ECOLE NORMALE SUPERIEURE DE CACHAN
61, Avenue du Président Wilson
94235 Cachan / FR
For all designated states
Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (C.N.R.S.)
3 rue Michel-Ange
75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
BioAlliance Pharma
49, boulevard du Général Martial Valin
75015 Paris / FR
For all designated states
ECOLE NORMALE SUPERIEURE DE CACHAN
61, Avenue du Président Wilson
94235 Cachan / FR
For all designated states
Centre National De La Recherche Scientifique-CNRS
3, rue Michel-Ange
75794 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / AUCLAIR, Christian
3 avenue Bourdon
F-75016 Paris / FR
02 / POLARD, Valérie
26 rue Beethoven
F-91700 Sainte Genevieve Des Bois / FR
03 / MAKSIMENKO, Andréi
4 rue Philis Bourg
F-91800 Brunoy / FR
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Jacobson, Claude
Cabinet Lavoix
2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]Jacobson, Claude
Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date07734615.321.05.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007IB01307
Priority number, dateEP2006029082222.05.2006         Original published format: EP 06290822
US20060838860P21.08.2006         Original published format: US 838860 P
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007135538
Date:29.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/48]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2026809
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.03.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/475, C07D471/04, A61P35/00
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:UMWANDLUNG VON MALIGNEN PHENOTYPEN DURCH 9-HYDROXY ELLIPTICINE DERIVATES[2009/09]
English:REVERSION OF MALIGNANT PHENOTYPE WITH 9-HYDROXY ELLIPTICINE DERIVATIVES[2009/09]
French:RÉVERSION DU PHÉNOTYPE MALIN À L'AIDE DES DÉRIVÉS DE LA 9-HYDROXY ELLIPTICINE[2009/09]
Entry into regional phase14.11.2008National basic fee paid 
14.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
14.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
03.06.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.12.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.08.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.02.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.08.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/08]
27.09.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2013/08]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.06.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
30.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
28.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XD]US4310667  (LE PECQ JEAN-BERNARD, et al) [XD] 1-27 * column 2, lines 65-68 * * column 3, line 1 * * column 11; table II * * column 23; table VI *;
 [X]EP0209511  (SANOFI SA [FR], et al) [X] 1-27 * claims 1-7 * * examples 4-6 * * page 5, lines 6-16 * * page 8 *
 [X]  - ACTON E M ET AL, "Anticancer specificity of some ellipticinium salts against human brain tumors in vitro.", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY. 8 JUL 1994, (19940708), vol. 37, no. 14, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 2185 - 2189, XP002403414 [X] 1-27 * page 2185; compounds 13,16,17 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00040a010
 [X]  - MUZARD G ET AL, "High-performance liquid chromatographic separation and trace determination of the antitumour derivatives of ellipticine and related quaternary ammonium compounds.", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY. 1 FEB 1979, (19790201), vol. 169, ISSN 0021-9673, pages 446 - 452, XP002403415 [X] 21,22 * page 450; table III *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0021-9673(75)85079-5
 [X]  - PALLARDY M ET AL, "Antibody recognition of substituted ammonium ions. Modulation by the counterion.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS. 20 MAY 1987, (19870520), vol. 99, no. 2, ISSN 0022-1759, pages 179 - 183, XP002403416 [X] 21-23,27 * page 181; figure 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-1759(87)90124-4
 [XD]  - AUCLAIR C ET AL, "Physicochemical and pharmacological properties of the antitumor ellipticine derivative 2-(diethylamino-2-ethyl)9-hydroxy ellipticinium-chloride, HCl.", CANCER RESEARCH. 1 DEC 1987, (19871201), vol. 47, no. 23, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 6254 - 6261, XP009073659 [XD] 1-27 * page 6255; figure 1 *