Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2020907

EP2020907 - A DEVICE FOR DRUG ADMINISTRATION AND/OR MONITORING THE STATUS OF A PATIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.12.2011
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / KRIJNSEN, Hendrika Cecilia
Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
02 / LANGEREIS, Geert
Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
03 / VAN BRUGGEN, Michel Paul Barbara
Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
04 / IORDANOV, Ventzeslav Petrov
Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date07735733.302.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007IB51633
Priority number, dateEP2006011378611.05.2006         Original published format: EP 06113786
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007132379
Date:22.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/47]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2020907
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007
[2009/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2020907
Date:23.02.2011
Language:EN
[2011/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.08.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/00
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR ARZNEIMITTELVERABREICHUNG UND/ODER ÜBERWACHUNG DES ZUSTANDES EINES PATIENTEN[2009/07]
English:A DEVICE FOR DRUG ADMINISTRATION AND/OR MONITORING THE STATUS OF A PATIENT[2009/07]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ADMINISTRATION DE MEDICAMENTS ET/OU DE SURVEILLANCE DE L'ETAT D'UN PATIENT[2010/42]
Former [2009/07]DISPOSITIF D'ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENTS ET/OU DE SURVEILLANCE DE L'ÉTAT D'UN PATIENT
Entry into regional phase11.12.2008National basic fee paid 
02.03.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
02.03.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.09.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.03.2009Examination requested  [2009/16]
26.11.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.03.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.09.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.01.2011Fee for grant paid
05.01.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.11.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2012/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.02.2011
BE23.02.2011
CY23.02.2011
CZ23.02.2011
DK23.02.2011
EE23.02.2011
FI23.02.2011
HU23.02.2011
IS23.02.2011
IT23.02.2011
LT23.02.2011
LV23.02.2011
MT23.02.2011
NL23.02.2011
PL23.02.2011
RO23.02.2011
SE23.02.2011
SI23.02.2011
SK23.02.2011
TR23.02.2011
IE02.05.2011
LU02.05.2011
BG23.05.2011
GR24.05.2011
CH31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
ES03.06.2011
PT23.06.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT23.02.2011
BE23.02.2011
CY23.02.2011
CZ23.02.2011
DK23.02.2011
EE23.02.2011
FI23.02.2011
IS23.02.2011
IT23.02.2011
LT23.02.2011
LV23.02.2011
MT23.02.2011
NL23.02.2011
PL23.02.2011
RO23.02.2011
SE23.02.2011
SI23.02.2011
SK23.02.2011
TR23.02.2011
IE02.05.2011
LU02.05.2011
BG23.05.2011
GR24.05.2011
CH31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
ES03.06.2011
PT23.06.2011
Former [2013/33]AT23.02.2011
BE23.02.2011
CY23.02.2011
CZ23.02.2011
DK23.02.2011
EE23.02.2011
FI23.02.2011
IS23.02.2011
IT23.02.2011
LT23.02.2011
LV23.02.2011
MT23.02.2011
NL23.02.2011
PL23.02.2011
RO23.02.2011
SE23.02.2011
SI23.02.2011
SK23.02.2011
IE02.05.2011
LU02.05.2011
BG23.05.2011
GR24.05.2011
CH31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
ES03.06.2011
PT23.06.2011
Former [2013/25]AT23.02.2011
BE23.02.2011
CY23.02.2011
CZ23.02.2011
DK23.02.2011
EE23.02.2011
FI23.02.2011
IT23.02.2011
LT23.02.2011
LV23.02.2011
MT23.02.2011
NL23.02.2011
PL23.02.2011
RO23.02.2011
SE23.02.2011
SI23.02.2011
SK23.02.2011
IE02.05.2011
LU02.05.2011
BG23.05.2011
GR24.05.2011
CH31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
ES03.06.2011
PT23.06.2011
Former [2012/24]AT23.02.2011
BE23.02.2011
CY23.02.2011
CZ23.02.2011
DK23.02.2011
EE23.02.2011
FI23.02.2011
IT23.02.2011
LT23.02.2011
LV23.02.2011
MT23.02.2011
NL23.02.2011
PL23.02.2011
RO23.02.2011
SE23.02.2011
SI23.02.2011
SK23.02.2011
IE02.05.2011
BG23.05.2011
GR24.05.2011
CH31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
ES03.06.2011
PT23.06.2011
Former [2012/20]AT23.02.2011
BE23.02.2011
CY23.02.2011
CZ23.02.2011
DK23.02.2011
EE23.02.2011
FI23.02.2011
LT23.02.2011
LV23.02.2011
MT23.02.2011
NL23.02.2011
PL23.02.2011
RO23.02.2011
SE23.02.2011
SI23.02.2011
SK23.02.2011
IE02.05.2011
BG23.05.2011
GR24.05.2011
CH31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
ES03.06.2011
PT23.06.2011
Former [2012/12]AT23.02.2011
BE23.02.2011
CY23.02.2011
CZ23.02.2011
DK23.02.2011
EE23.02.2011
FI23.02.2011
LT23.02.2011
LV23.02.2011
MT23.02.2011
NL23.02.2011
PL23.02.2011
RO23.02.2011
SE23.02.2011
SI23.02.2011
SK23.02.2011
BG23.05.2011
GR24.05.2011
CH31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
ES03.06.2011
PT23.06.2011
Former [2012/07]AT23.02.2011
BE23.02.2011
CY23.02.2011
CZ23.02.2011
DK23.02.2011
EE23.02.2011
FI23.02.2011
LT23.02.2011
LV23.02.2011
MT23.02.2011
NL23.02.2011
RO23.02.2011
SE23.02.2011
SI23.02.2011
SK23.02.2011
BG23.05.2011
GR24.05.2011
CH31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
ES03.06.2011
PT23.06.2011
PL20.07.2011
Former [2012/05]AT23.02.2011
BE23.02.2011
CY23.02.2011
CZ23.02.2011
DK23.02.2011
EE23.02.2011
FI23.02.2011
LT23.02.2011
LV23.02.2011
MT23.02.2011
NL23.02.2011
RO23.02.2011
SE23.02.2011
SI23.02.2011
SK23.02.2011
BG23.05.2011
GR24.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
ES03.06.2011
PT23.06.2011
PL20.07.2011
Former [2011/50]AT23.02.2011
BE23.02.2011
CY23.02.2011
CZ23.02.2011
DK23.02.2011
EE23.02.2011
FI23.02.2011
LT23.02.2011
LV23.02.2011
NL23.02.2011
RO23.02.2011
SE23.02.2011
SI23.02.2011
SK23.02.2011
BG23.05.2011
GR24.05.2011
ES03.06.2011
PT23.06.2011
PL20.07.2011
Former [2011/49]AT23.02.2011
BE23.02.2011
CY23.02.2011
CZ23.02.2011
DK23.02.2011
EE23.02.2011
FI23.02.2011
LT23.02.2011
LV23.02.2011
NL23.02.2011
RO23.02.2011
SE23.02.2011
SI23.02.2011
SK23.02.2011
BG23.05.2011
GR24.05.2011
ES03.06.2011
PT23.06.2011
Former [2011/47]AT23.02.2011
BE23.02.2011
CY23.02.2011
DK23.02.2011
EE23.02.2011
FI23.02.2011
LT23.02.2011
LV23.02.2011
NL23.02.2011
SE23.02.2011
SI23.02.2011
BG23.05.2011
GR24.05.2011
ES03.06.2011
PT23.06.2011
Former [2011/38]AT23.02.2011
BE23.02.2011
CY23.02.2011
FI23.02.2011
LT23.02.2011
LV23.02.2011
NL23.02.2011
SE23.02.2011
SI23.02.2011
BG23.05.2011
GR24.05.2011
ES03.06.2011
PT23.06.2011
Former [2011/37]BE23.02.2011
CY23.02.2011
FI23.02.2011
LT23.02.2011
LV23.02.2011
SE23.02.2011
SI23.02.2011
BG23.05.2011
GR24.05.2011
ES03.06.2011
PT23.06.2011
Former [2011/36]LT23.02.2011
LV23.02.2011
SE23.02.2011
GR24.05.2011
ES03.06.2011
PT23.06.2011
Cited inInternational search[X]US5743857  (SHINODA MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,9 * column 8, line 64 - column 10, line 35; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0721764  (JOHNSON & JOHNSON MEDICAL [US]) [A] 1,3,9 * column 6, line 48 - column 7, line 10; figures 3,4 *;
 [A]US2003208154  (CLOSE BENJAMIN W [US], et al) [A] 1,9,10 * paragraphs [0028] - [0036] - [0082] , [0091] *;
 [A]WO03079894  (BAKER MED RES INST [AU], et al) [A] 1,8,9 * the whole document *
by applicantUS5743857