Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2025164

EP2025164 - AMBIENT EXPERIENCE INSTRUCTION GENERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.04.2018
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.04.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.05.2018  [2018/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AMBX UK Limited
2-8 Gloucester Road Redhill
Surrey RH1 1FH / GB
[2009/08]
Former [2008/39]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / EVES, David, A.
c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
02 / COLE, Richard
c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
03 / HORSTEN, Jan, B., A., M.
c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Turner, Richard Charles , et al
Room 3, The Rufus Centre
Steppingley Road
Flitwick, Bedfordshire MK45 1AH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]Turner, Richard Charles , et al
29 Southcourt Avenue Leighton Buzzard
Bedforshire LU7 2QD / GB
Application number, filing date07735796.008.05.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007IB51712
Priority number, dateEP2006011423419.05.2006         Original published format: EP 06114234
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007135585
Date:29.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2025164
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/16
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
TitleGerman:UMGEBUNGSERLEBNIS-INSTRUKTIONSERZEUGUNG[2009/08]
English:AMBIENT EXPERIENCE INSTRUCTION GENERATION[2009/08]
French:GENERATION D'INSTRUCTIONS D'EXPERIENCE AMBIANTE[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase19.12.2008National basic fee paid 
19.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
19.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
01.12.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/19]
04.01.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
27.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
29.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
22.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
20.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
27.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
30.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201206   M06   Fee paid on   29.11.2012
31.05.201408   M06   Fee paid on   20.11.2014
31.05.201509   M06   Fee paid on   27.11.2015
31.05.201610   M06   Fee paid on   30.11.2016
31.05.201711   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO2004059615  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-3,5-11,13-19,21-23 * page 4, line 28 - page 5, line 28 * * page 6, line 12 - page 7, line 2; figure 3 * [Y] 4,12,20;
 [Y]WO2004082275  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 4,12,20 * page 4, line 3 - line 10 * * page 4, line 30 - page 5, line 6 * * page 7, line 12 - line 28; figure 3 *;
 [A]WO03101045  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1,9,17 * page 4, line 1 - line 16 * * page 8, line 24 - page 9, line 11 *;
 [A]WO03089100  (INTELLOCITY USA INC [US], et al) [A] 1,9,17 * page 9, line 8 - line 24 * * page 12, line 5 - line 15 *