Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2019870

EP2019870 - SAMPLE CONTROL FOR CORRECTION OF SAMPLE MATRIX EFFECTS IN ANALYTICAL DETECTION METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  24.07.2009
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.07.2009Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 26.08.2009  [2009/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[2009/06]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHMIDT, Kristiane, A.
c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
02 / LUCASSEN, Gerhardus, W.
c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
03 / NEERKEN, Sieglinde
c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
 [2009/06]
Representative(s)van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2009/06]Van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date07735808.308.05.2007
[2009/06]
WO2007IB51725
Priority number, dateEP2006011401816.05.2006         Original published format: EP 06114018
[2009/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007135591
Date:29.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2019870
Date:04.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007
[2009/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68, G01N27/00
[2009/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/06]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PROBENKONTROLLE ZUR KORREKTUR VON PROBENMATRIXEFFEKTEN BEI ANALYTISCHEN NACHWEISVERFAHREN[2009/06]
English:SAMPLE CONTROL FOR CORRECTION OF SAMPLE MATRIX EFFECTS IN ANALYTICAL DETECTION METHODS[2009/06]
French:CONTROLE D'ECHANTILLONS POUR LA CORRECTION DES EFFETS DE MATRICE D'ECHANTILLONS DANS DES PROCEDES DE DETECTION ANALYTIQUES[2009/06]
Entry into regional phase16.12.2008National basic fee paid 
16.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
16.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/06]
17.07.2009Application withdrawn by applicant  [2009/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]US2004189311  (GLEZER ELI N [US], et al) [X] 22 * abstract * * paragraph [0100] *;
 [X]  - SOLIMAN A-G M, "COMPARISON OF MANUAL AND BENZENESULFONYL CHLORIDE SEMI AUTOMATED THIOCHROME METHODS FOR DETERMINATION OF THIAMINE IN FOODS", JOURNAL OF THE ASSOCIATION OF OFFICIAL ANALYTICAL CHEMISTS, THE ASSOCIATION, ARLINGTON, VA, US, (1981), vol. 64, no. 3, ISSN 0004-5756, pages 616 - 622, XP009089282 [X] 1-4,6,7,16,17 * abstract * * page 618 - page 619 *
 [X]  - MAHROUS M S ET AL, "Quantitation of indomethacin, naproxen, and ibuprofen in pharmaceutical dosage forms by first and second derivative ultraviolet spectrometry", JOURNAL OF THE ASSOCIATION OF OFFICIAL ANALYTICAL CHEMISTS, THE ASSOCIATION, ARLINGTON, VA, US, (198505), vol. 68, no. 3, ISSN 0004-5756, pages 535 - 539, XP009089563 [X] 1-4,6,7,16,17 * abstract * * page 535 - page 538 *
 [X]  - ZHONG ZHI-GUANG ET AL, "Study on the method for the determination of Fe, Si, Cu, Mg, Mn, Ni, Zn, Ti,Cr, Sr in aluminium alloy by ICP-AES", GUANGPUXUE YU GUANGPU FENXI - SPECTROSCOPY AND SPECTRAL ANALYSIS, BEIJING, CN, (200202), vol. 22, no. 1, ISSN 1000-0593, pages 83 - 85, XP009089549 [X] 1-4,6,7,16,17 * abstract *
 [XY]  - FAULDS KAREN ET AL, "Evaluation of surface-enhanced resonance Raman scattering for quantitative DNA analysis.", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY 15 JAN 2004, (20040115), vol. 76, no. 2, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 412 - 417, XP002418075 [X] 1,3-13,15,16,18-21 * abstract * * page 414 - page 417 * [Y] 2,14,17,22

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac035060c
 [XY]  - DIETZEN DENNIS J ET AL, "Matrix-dependent bias in total thyroxine measurement on the Beckman Access.", CLINICA CHIMICA ACTA; INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CLINICAL CHEMISTRY FEB 2002, (200202), vol. 316, no. 1-2, ISSN 0009-8981, pages 171 - 174, XP002451686 [X] 1,3-16,18-21 * abstract * * pages 172 and 174 * [Y] 2,17,22

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0009-8981(01)00723-9
 [XY]  - MAZUREK ET AL, "Quantitative determination of captopril and prednisolone in tablets by FT-Raman spectroscopy", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL AND BIOMEDICAL ANALYSIS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20060318), vol. 40, no. 5, ISSN 0731-7085, pages 1225 - 1230, XP005296985 [X] 1-7,16,17 * abstract * [Y] 8-15,18-22

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jpba.2005.03.047
 [XY]  - MAZUREK ET AL, "Quantitative determination of diclofenac sodium and aminophylline in injection solutions by FT-Raman spectroscopy", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL AND BIOMEDICAL ANALYSIS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20060318), vol. 40, no. 5, ISSN 0731-7085, pages 1235 - 1242, XP005296987 [X] 1-7,16,17 * abstract * [Y] 8-15,18-22

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jpba.2005.09.019
 [A]  - FAULDS KAREN ET AL, "DNA DETECTION BY SURFACE ENHANCED RESONANCE RAMAN SCATTERING (SERRS)", ANALYST, ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY, LONDON, GB, (200508), vol. 130, no. 8, ISSN 0003-2654, pages 1125 - 1131, XP009073094 [A] 1-27 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b500248f
 [A]  - ZHANG DONGMAO ET AL, "Isotope edited internal standard method for quantitative surface-enhanced Raman spectroscopy.", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY 1 JUN 2005, (20050601), vol. 77, no. 11, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 3563 - 3569, XP002451687 [A] 1-22 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac050338h
 [A]  - LOREN A ET AL, "INTERNAL STANDARD IN SURFACE-ENHANCED RAMAN SPECTROSCOPY", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. COLUMBUS, US, (20041215), vol. 76, no. 24, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 7391 - 7395, XP001226135 [A] 1-22 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac0491298