Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2027760

EP2027760 - INTERCONNECTION ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR INTERCONNECTING A HIGH-CUURENT CARRYING CABLE WITH A METAL THIN-FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Refusal of applicationpublished on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OLEDWorks GmbH
Philipsstraße 8
52068 Aachen / DE
[2016/14]
Former [2016/13]For:DE 
OLEDWorks GmbH
Philipsstraße 8
52068 Aachen / DE
Former [2013/39]For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Lübeckertordamm 5
20099 Hamburg / DE
For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MT  NL  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  TR 
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Former [2009/09]For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Lübeckertordamm 5
20099 Hamburg / DE
For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MT  NL  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  TR 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / VERJANS, Conrad WilhelmusAdriaan
c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG
Philipsstrasse 8
52068 Aachen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]Bekkers, Joost J.J
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date07735860.411.05.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007IB51785
Priority number, dateEP2006011431822.05.2006         Original published format: EP 06114318
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007135604
Date:29.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/48]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2027760
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.05.2008
ClassificationInternational:H05K3/36
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBINDUNGSANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBINDUNG EINES HOCHSTROMKABELS MIT EINEM METALLDÜNNFILM[2009/09]
English:INTERCONNECTION ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR INTERCONNECTING A HIGH-CUURENT CARRYING CABLE WITH A METAL THIN-FILM[2009/09]
French:STRUCTURE D'INTERCONNEXION ET PROCÉDÉ D'INTERCONNEXION D'UN CÂBLE TRANSPORTANT UN COURANT D'INTENSITÉ ÉLEVÉE AVEC UN MINCE FILM MÉTALLIQUE[2009/09]
Entry into regional phase22.12.2008National basic fee paid 
22.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
22.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.10.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/10]
17.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.03.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.09.2018
06.07.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/47]
16.07.2018Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/47]
04.09.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.11.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
31.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
31.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
01.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
10.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
11.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
Cited inInternational search[Y]USRE38053E  (KANEZAWA TATSUO [JP]) [Y] 1,4,7,9,10 * column 5, line 36 - line 37 * * column 6, line 41 - line 43 * * column 8, line 11 - line 12 * * column 8, line 44 - line 53 *;
 [Y]US2005190333  (WU CHIA-JUNG [TW], et al) [Y] 1,4,7,9,10 * paragraphs [0009] , [0019] - [0022] - [0030] *;
 [Y]US4640581  (NAKANOWATARI JUN [JP], et al) [Y] 1,4,7,9 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 25 *;
 [Y]EP0232127  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [Y] 1,7 * page 4, line 13 - line 21; figure 4 *;
 [Y]EP0911678  (SEIKO INSTR INC [JP]) [Y] 1,7 * paragraphs [0020] , [0025]; figure 1 *;
 [X]FR2515917  (HEWLETT PACKARD FRANCE SA [FR]) [X] 14 * page 1, line 20 - line 24 * * page 2, line 1 - line 6 * * page 3, line 24 - line 32 *;
 [X]  - STOFEL E J ET AL, "LONG-LIFE, LIGHTWEIGHT SOLAR ARRAY TESTING", PHOTOVOLTAIC SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE. KISSIMMEE, MAY 1 - 4, 1984, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19840501), VOL. 3 CONF. 17, pages 173 - 178, XP000043889 [X] 14 * page 174, column 1 - column 2; figures 2,3; table 2 *