Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2021739

EP2021739 - CAPACITIVE MEMS SENSOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.08.2018
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
III Holdings 6, LLC
2711 Centerville Road
Suite 400
Wilmington, DE 19808 / US
[2015/36]
Former [2009/50]For all designated states
NXP B.V.
High Tech Campus 60
5656 AG Eindhoven / NL
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
NXP B.V.
High Tech Campus 60
5656 AG Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / VAN DEN BOOM, Jeroen
c/o NXP Semiconductors Austria GmbH
Intellectual Property Department
Gutheil-Schoder-Gasse 8-12
A-1102 Vienna / AT
 [2017/41]
Former [2009/07]01 / VAN DEN BOOM, Jeroen
c/o NXP Semiconductors Austria GmbH Intellectual Property Department Gutheil-Schoder-Gasse 8-12
A-1102 Vienna / AT
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2017/41]
Former [2009/42]Schouten, Marcus Maria , et al
NXP B.V. IP & L Department High Tech Campus 32
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Former [2009/42]Röggla, Harald , et al
NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department Gutheil-Schoder-Gasse 8-12
1101 Vienna / AT
Former [2009/07]Röggla, Harald , et al
NXP Semiconductors Austria GmbH IP Department Gutheil-Schoder-Gasse 8-12
1101 Vienna / AT
Application number, filing date07735891.914.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007IB51820
Priority number, dateEP2006011407417.05.2006         Original published format: EP 06114074
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007132422
Date:22.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2021739
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007
[2009/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2021739
Date:11.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:G01D5/241, H04R3/00, G01D3/08, G01D5/24, H04R19/00
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/41]
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesAL17.12.2008
BA17.12.2008
HR17.12.2008
MK17.12.2008
RS17.12.2008
TitleGerman:KAPAZITIVE MEMS-SENSORANORDNUNG[2009/07]
English:CAPACITIVE MEMS SENSOR DEVICE[2009/07]
French:DISPOSITIF CAPTEUR MEMS CAPACITIF[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase17.12.2008National basic fee paid 
17.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
17.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
11.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.06.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.02.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.09.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.01.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.04.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.08.2017Fee for grant paid
29.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.03.2009
Opposition(s)12.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
31.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
31.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
02.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
01.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
05.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.10.2017
CZ11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
IT11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
MC11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
PL11.10.2017
RO11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
SI11.10.2017
SK11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
IE14.05.2018
LU14.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
[2019/24]
Former [2019/19]AT11.10.2017
CZ11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
IT11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
MC11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
PL11.10.2017
RO11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
SI11.10.2017
SK11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
IE14.05.2018
LU14.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/17]AT11.10.2017
CZ11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
IT11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
MC11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
PL11.10.2017
RO11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
SI11.10.2017
SK11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
LU14.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/12]AT11.10.2017
CZ11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
IT11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
MC11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
PL11.10.2017
RO11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
SI11.10.2017
SK11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/06]AT11.10.2017
CZ11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
IT11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
MC11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
PL11.10.2017
RO11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
SI11.10.2017
SK11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/52]AT11.10.2017
CZ11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
IT11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
PL11.10.2017
RO11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
SI11.10.2017
SK11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/41]AT11.10.2017
CZ11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
IT11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
PL11.10.2017
RO11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
SK11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/39]AT11.10.2017
CZ11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
IT11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
PL11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
SK11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT11.10.2017
CZ11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
PL11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
SK11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT11.10.2017
CZ11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
SK11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT11.10.2017
ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/23]AT11.10.2017
ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
Former [2018/17]NL11.10.2017
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP1106981  (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0021] - [0024] *;
 [YD]US2006008097  (STENBERG LARS J [US], et al) [YD] 1-12 * figures 1,3,4 * * paragraphs [0023] , [0028] , [0057] - [0064] *
by applicantUS2006008097
 EP1106981