Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2020883

EP2020883 - DEVICE FOR MAKING HAIR STREAKS, NUANCES AND LUMINOSITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.07.2011
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
De Lurdes Martins Carvalho De Pinho, Célia Moreira
Rôge
3730-371 Vale de Cambra / PT
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Pelayo de Sousa Henriques, Rui
Rua de Sà da Bandeira, 706-6.o-D.to
P-4000-432 Porto / PT
[2009/07]
Application number, filing date07735898.414.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007IB51827
Priority number, datePT2006010347812.05.2006         Original published format: PT 10347806
[2009/07]
Filing languagePT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007132426
Date:22.11.2007
Language:PT
[2007/47]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2020883
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2020883
Date:08.09.2010
Language:EN
[2010/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.01.2008
ClassificationInternational:A45D19/00
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HAARSTRÄHNEN, TÖNUNGEN UND HIGHLIGHTS[2009/07]
English:DEVICE FOR MAKING HAIR STREAKS, NUANCES AND LUMINOSITIES[2009/07]
French:DISPOSITIFS POUR PRODUIRE DES STRIES, DES NUANCES ET DES LUMINOSITÉS SUR LES CHEVEUX[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase22.11.2007Translation filed 
12.12.2008National basic fee paid 
12.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.03.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
25.02.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.11.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.05.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
15.07.2010Fee for grant paid
15.07.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.06.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/33]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
15.07.2010Request for further processing filed
15.07.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.09.2010
BE08.09.2010
CY08.09.2010
CZ08.09.2010
DK08.09.2010
EE08.09.2010
FI08.09.2010
HU08.09.2010
IT08.09.2010
LT08.09.2010
LV08.09.2010
MT08.09.2010
NL08.09.2010
PL08.09.2010
RO08.09.2010
SE08.09.2010
SI08.09.2010
SK08.09.2010
TR08.09.2010
BG08.12.2010
GR09.12.2010
ES19.12.2010
IS08.01.2011
PT10.01.2011
GB14.05.2011
IE14.05.2011
LU14.05.2011
CH31.05.2011
FR31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT08.09.2010
BE08.09.2010
CY08.09.2010
CZ08.09.2010
DK08.09.2010
EE08.09.2010
FI08.09.2010
IT08.09.2010
LT08.09.2010
LV08.09.2010
MT08.09.2010
NL08.09.2010
PL08.09.2010
RO08.09.2010
SE08.09.2010
SI08.09.2010
SK08.09.2010
TR08.09.2010
BG08.12.2010
GR09.12.2010
ES19.12.2010
IS08.01.2011
PT10.01.2011
GB14.05.2011
IE14.05.2011
LU14.05.2011
CH31.05.2011
FR31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
Former [2013/42]AT08.09.2010
BE08.09.2010
CY08.09.2010
CZ08.09.2010
DK08.09.2010
EE08.09.2010
FI08.09.2010
IT08.09.2010
LT08.09.2010
LV08.09.2010
MT08.09.2010
NL08.09.2010
PL08.09.2010
RO08.09.2010
SE08.09.2010
SI08.09.2010
SK08.09.2010
BG08.12.2010
GR09.12.2010
ES19.12.2010
IS08.01.2011
PT10.01.2011
GB14.05.2011
IE14.05.2011
LU14.05.2011
CH31.05.2011
FR31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
Former [2013/25]AT08.09.2010
BE08.09.2010
CY08.09.2010
CZ08.09.2010
DK08.09.2010
EE08.09.2010
FI08.09.2010
IT08.09.2010
LT08.09.2010
LV08.09.2010
MT08.09.2010
NL08.09.2010
PL08.09.2010
RO08.09.2010
SE08.09.2010
SI08.09.2010
SK08.09.2010
GR09.12.2010
ES19.12.2010
IS08.01.2011
PT10.01.2011
GB14.05.2011
IE14.05.2011
LU14.05.2011
CH31.05.2011
FR31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
Former [2012/30]AT08.09.2010
BE08.09.2010
CY08.09.2010
CZ08.09.2010
DK08.09.2010
EE08.09.2010
FI08.09.2010
IT08.09.2010
LT08.09.2010
LV08.09.2010
MT08.09.2010
NL08.09.2010
PL08.09.2010
RO08.09.2010
SE08.09.2010
SI08.09.2010
SK08.09.2010
GR09.12.2010
ES19.12.2010
IS08.01.2011
PT10.01.2011
GB14.05.2011
IE14.05.2011
CH31.05.2011
FR31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
Former [2012/22]AT08.09.2010
BE08.09.2010
CY08.09.2010
CZ08.09.2010
DK08.09.2010
EE08.09.2010
FI08.09.2010
IT08.09.2010
LT08.09.2010
LV08.09.2010
MT08.09.2010
NL08.09.2010
PL08.09.2010
RO08.09.2010
SE08.09.2010
SI08.09.2010
SK08.09.2010
GR09.12.2010
ES19.12.2010
IS08.01.2011
PT10.01.2011
IE14.05.2011
CH31.05.2011
FR31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
Former [2012/20]AT08.09.2010
BE08.09.2010
CY08.09.2010
CZ08.09.2010
DK08.09.2010
EE08.09.2010
FI08.09.2010
IT08.09.2010
LT08.09.2010
LV08.09.2010
MT08.09.2010
NL08.09.2010
PL08.09.2010
RO08.09.2010
SE08.09.2010
SI08.09.2010
SK08.09.2010
GR09.12.2010
ES19.12.2010
IS08.01.2011
PT10.01.2011
IE14.05.2011
CH31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
Former [2012/07]AT08.09.2010
BE08.09.2010
CY08.09.2010
CZ08.09.2010
DK08.09.2010
EE08.09.2010
FI08.09.2010
IT08.09.2010
LT08.09.2010
LV08.09.2010
MT08.09.2010
NL08.09.2010
PL08.09.2010
RO08.09.2010
SE08.09.2010
SI08.09.2010
SK08.09.2010
GR09.12.2010
ES19.12.2010
IS08.01.2011
PT10.01.2011
CH31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
Former [2012/05]AT08.09.2010
BE08.09.2010
CY08.09.2010
CZ08.09.2010
DK08.09.2010
EE08.09.2010
FI08.09.2010
IT08.09.2010
LT08.09.2010
LV08.09.2010
MT08.09.2010
NL08.09.2010
PL08.09.2010
RO08.09.2010
SE08.09.2010
SI08.09.2010
SK08.09.2010
GR09.12.2010
ES19.12.2010
IS08.01.2011
PT10.01.2011
MC31.05.2011
Former [2011/40]AT08.09.2010
BE08.09.2010
CY08.09.2010
CZ08.09.2010
DK08.09.2010
EE08.09.2010
FI08.09.2010
IT08.09.2010
LT08.09.2010
LV08.09.2010
NL08.09.2010
PL08.09.2010
RO08.09.2010
SE08.09.2010
SI08.09.2010
SK08.09.2010
GR09.12.2010
ES19.12.2010
IS08.01.2011
PT10.01.2011
Former [2011/29]AT08.09.2010
BE08.09.2010
CY08.09.2010
CZ08.09.2010
EE08.09.2010
FI08.09.2010
IT08.09.2010
LT08.09.2010
LV08.09.2010
NL08.09.2010
PL08.09.2010
RO08.09.2010
SE08.09.2010
SI08.09.2010
SK08.09.2010
GR09.12.2010
ES19.12.2010
IS08.01.2011
PT10.01.2011
Former [2011/27]AT08.09.2010
BE08.09.2010
CY08.09.2010
CZ08.09.2010
EE08.09.2010
FI08.09.2010
IT08.09.2010
LT08.09.2010
LV08.09.2010
NL08.09.2010
PL08.09.2010
RO08.09.2010
SE08.09.2010
SI08.09.2010
SK08.09.2010
GR09.12.2010
IS08.01.2011
PT10.01.2011
Former [2011/26]AT08.09.2010
CY08.09.2010
CZ08.09.2010
EE08.09.2010
FI08.09.2010
IT08.09.2010
LT08.09.2010
LV08.09.2010
NL08.09.2010
PL08.09.2010
RO08.09.2010
SE08.09.2010
SI08.09.2010
SK08.09.2010
GR09.12.2010
IS08.01.2011
PT10.01.2011
Cited inInternational search[X]US5626153  (PETRARCA EDWARD [US]) [X] 1,5-7 * figure 7 *;
 [AD]US4325393  (THOMAS LOUIS N) [AD] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4732170  (THOMAS LOUIS N [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2238239  (STEPHAN CARL WILFRED BENJAMIN) [A] 1 * figure 3 *