blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2007433

EP2007433 - DEVICE, SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR IN-VIVO ANALYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.08.2012
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Given Imaging Ltd.
2 Hacarmel Street New Industrial Park
20692 Yoqneam / IL
[2009/01]
Inventor(s)01 / RABINOVITZ, Elisha
4 Anda Amir Street
34992 Haifa / IL
02 / KATZ, Emil-Israel
22 Hashalva St.
56548 Savyon / IL
 [2009/01]
Representative(s)Dr. Graf & Partner AG
Intellectual Property
Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / SG / CH
[N/P]
Former [2011/43]Dr. Graf & Partner AG
Intellectual Property Herrenacker 15 Postfach 518
8201 Schaffhausen / CH
Former [2009/39]Dr. Graf & Partner
Intellectual Property Herrenacker 15 Postfach 518
8201 Schaffhausen / CH
Former [2009/19]Dr. Graf & Partner
Intellectual Property Herrenacker 15 Postfach 518
8200 Schaffhausen / CH
Former [2009/01]Dr. Graf & Partner
Intellectual Property, Postfach 518
8200 Schaffhausen / CH
Application number, filing date07736198.810.04.2007
[2009/01]
WO2007IL00458
Priority number, dateUS20060788114P03.04.2006         Original published format: US 788114 P
[2009/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2007113839
Date:11.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/41]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2007433
Date:31.12.2008
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2009/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2007433
Date:26.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US26.03.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.03.2010
ClassificationIPC:H04N7/18, A61B5/07
[2010/13]
CPC:
A61B5/0084 (EP,US); A61B1/041 (EP,US); A61B1/043 (EP,US);
A61B5/073 (EP,US); A61B1/00016 (EP,US); A61B1/00029 (EP,US);
A61B5/0071 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2009/19]H04N7/18
Former IPC [2009/01]A61K49/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/01]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR IN-VIVO-ANALYSE[2009/01]
English:DEVICE, SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR IN-VIVO ANALYSIS[2009/01]
French:DISPOSITIF, SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR UNE ANALYSE IN VIVO[2009/01]
Entry into regional phase31.10.2008National basic fee paid 
31.10.2008Search fee paid 
31.10.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
31.10.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.10.2008Examination requested  [2009/01]
20.05.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.07.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.11.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
08.03.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
23.03.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.04.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.08.2011Fee for grant paid
31.08.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.07.2010
Opposition(s)27.07.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
28.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
29.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.04.2007
AT26.10.2011
BE26.10.2011
CY26.10.2011
CZ26.10.2011
DK26.10.2011
EE26.10.2011
FI26.10.2011
IT26.10.2011
LT26.10.2011
LV26.10.2011
MT26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
PL26.10.2011
RO26.10.2011
SE26.10.2011
SI26.10.2011
SK26.10.2011
TR26.10.2011
BG26.01.2012
GR27.01.2012
ES06.02.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
GB10.04.2012
IE10.04.2012
LU10.04.2012
CH30.04.2012
FR30.04.2012
LI30.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT26.10.2011
BE26.10.2011
CY26.10.2011
CZ26.10.2011
DK26.10.2011
EE26.10.2011
FI26.10.2011
IT26.10.2011
LT26.10.2011
LV26.10.2011
MT26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
PL26.10.2011
RO26.10.2011
SE26.10.2011
SI26.10.2011
SK26.10.2011
TR26.10.2011
BG26.01.2012
GR27.01.2012
ES06.02.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
GB10.04.2012
IE10.04.2012
LU10.04.2012
CH30.04.2012
FR30.04.2012
LI30.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
Former [2014/21]AT26.10.2011
BE26.10.2011
CY26.10.2011
CZ26.10.2011
DK26.10.2011
EE26.10.2011
FI26.10.2011
IT26.10.2011
LT26.10.2011
LV26.10.2011
MT26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
PL26.10.2011
RO26.10.2011
SE26.10.2011
SI26.10.2011
SK26.10.2011
TR26.10.2011
BG26.01.2012
GR27.01.2012
ES06.02.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
GB10.04.2012
IE10.04.2012
CH30.04.2012
FR30.04.2012
LI30.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
Former [2013/35]AT26.10.2011
BE26.10.2011
CY26.10.2011
CZ26.10.2011
DK26.10.2011
EE26.10.2011
FI26.10.2011
IT26.10.2011
LT26.10.2011
LV26.10.2011
MT26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
PL26.10.2011
RO26.10.2011
SE26.10.2011
SI26.10.2011
SK26.10.2011
BG26.01.2012
GR27.01.2012
ES06.02.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
GB10.04.2012
IE10.04.2012
CH30.04.2012
FR30.04.2012
LI30.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
Former [2013/29]AT26.10.2011
BE26.10.2011
CY26.10.2011
CZ26.10.2011
DK26.10.2011
EE26.10.2011
FI26.10.2011
IT26.10.2011
LT26.10.2011
LV26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
PL26.10.2011
RO26.10.2011
SE26.10.2011
SI26.10.2011
SK26.10.2011
BG26.01.2012
GR27.01.2012
ES06.02.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
GB10.04.2012
IE10.04.2012
CH30.04.2012
FR30.04.2012
LI30.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
Former [2013/22]AT26.10.2011
BE26.10.2011
CY26.10.2011
CZ26.10.2011
DK26.10.2011
EE26.10.2011
IT26.10.2011
LT26.10.2011
LV26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
PL26.10.2011
RO26.10.2011
SE26.10.2011
SI26.10.2011
SK26.10.2011
BG26.01.2012
GR27.01.2012
ES06.02.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
GB10.04.2012
IE10.04.2012
CH30.04.2012
FR30.04.2012
LI30.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
Former [2013/13]AT26.10.2011
BE26.10.2011
CY26.10.2011
CZ26.10.2011
DK26.10.2011
EE26.10.2011
IT26.10.2011
LT26.10.2011
LV26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
PL26.10.2011
RO26.10.2011
SE26.10.2011
SI26.10.2011
SK26.10.2011
BG26.01.2012
GR27.01.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
GB10.04.2012
IE10.04.2012
CH30.04.2012
FR30.04.2012
LI30.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
Former [2013/10]AT26.10.2011
BE26.10.2011
CY26.10.2011
CZ26.10.2011
DK26.10.2011
EE26.10.2011
IT26.10.2011
LT26.10.2011
LV26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
PL26.10.2011
RO26.10.2011
SE26.10.2011
SI26.10.2011
SK26.10.2011
BG26.01.2012
GR27.01.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
GB10.04.2012
IE10.04.2012
CH30.04.2012
LI30.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
Former [2013/08]AT26.10.2011
BE26.10.2011
CY26.10.2011
CZ26.10.2011
DK26.10.2011
EE26.10.2011
IT26.10.2011
LT26.10.2011
LV26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
PL26.10.2011
RO26.10.2011
SE26.10.2011
SI26.10.2011
SK26.10.2011
BG26.01.2012
GR27.01.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
IE10.04.2012
CH30.04.2012
LI30.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
Former [2013/07]AT26.10.2011
BE26.10.2011
CY26.10.2011
CZ26.10.2011
DK26.10.2011
EE26.10.2011
IT26.10.2011
LT26.10.2011
LV26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
PL26.10.2011
RO26.10.2011
SE26.10.2011
SI26.10.2011
SK26.10.2011
BG26.01.2012
GR27.01.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
CH30.04.2012
LI30.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
Former [2012/50]BE26.10.2011
CY26.10.2011
CZ26.10.2011
DK26.10.2011
EE26.10.2011
IT26.10.2011
LT26.10.2011
LV26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
PL26.10.2011
RO26.10.2011
SE26.10.2011
SI26.10.2011
SK26.10.2011
BG26.01.2012
GR27.01.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
MC30.04.2012
Former [2012/37]BE26.10.2011
CY26.10.2011
CZ26.10.2011
DK26.10.2011
EE26.10.2011
IT26.10.2011
LT26.10.2011
LV26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
PL26.10.2011
RO26.10.2011
SE26.10.2011
SI26.10.2011
SK26.10.2011
BG26.01.2012
GR27.01.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
Former [2012/36]BE26.10.2011
CY26.10.2011
CZ26.10.2011
DK26.10.2011
EE26.10.2011
LT26.10.2011
LV26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
PL26.10.2011
RO26.10.2011
SE26.10.2011
SI26.10.2011
SK26.10.2011
BG26.01.2012
GR27.01.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
Former [2012/35]BE26.10.2011
CY26.10.2011
CZ26.10.2011
DK26.10.2011
EE26.10.2011
LT26.10.2011
LV26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
PL26.10.2011
SE26.10.2011
SI26.10.2011
BG26.01.2012
GR27.01.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
Former [2012/34]BE26.10.2011
CY26.10.2011
CZ26.10.2011
LT26.10.2011
LV26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
PL26.10.2011
SE26.10.2011
SI26.10.2011
GR27.01.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
Former [2012/28]BE26.10.2011
CY26.10.2011
LT26.10.2011
LV26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
PL26.10.2011
SE26.10.2011
SI26.10.2011
GR27.01.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
Former [2012/26]BE26.10.2011
LT26.10.2011
LV26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
PL26.10.2011
SE26.10.2011
SI26.10.2011
GR27.01.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
Former [2012/24]BE26.10.2011
LT26.10.2011
LV26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
SE26.10.2011
SI26.10.2011
GR27.01.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
Former [2012/23]BE26.10.2011
LT26.10.2011
NL26.10.2011
GR27.01.2012
IS26.02.2012
PT27.02.2012
Former [2012/21]BE26.10.2011
LT26.10.2011
IS26.02.2012
Former [2012/20]LT26.10.2011
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9623524  (NYCOMED IMAGING AS [NO], et al) [A] 1,5-6,9 * page 22, paragraph 2 *;
 [IY]US2002146368  (MERON GAVRIEL [IL], et al) [I] 1-5,8-9 * figure 7 * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0010] * [Y] 6-7;
 [Y]WO2004103351  (UNIV MANCHESTER [GB], et al) [Y] 6-7* page 17, line 27 - page 18, line 5 *
International search[Y]US5604531  (IDDAN GAVRIEL J [IL], et al);
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 2003-109809, XP008130035
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.