Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2021741

EP2021741 - METHOD OF INTERROGATION OF A STATIC AND/OR DYNAMIC STRAIN SENSOR MAKING USE OF A LASER-FREQUENCY LOCKING METHOD, AND RELEVANT APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/07]METHOD FOR LASER-FREQUENCY LOCKING TO A FIBRE RESONATOR WITH INDUCE BIREFRINGENCE, METHOD OF INTERROGATION OF A STATIC AND/OR DYNAMIC STRAIN SENSOR MAKING USE OF SUCH A LOCKING METHOD, AND RELEVANT APPARATUSES
[2012/07]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.06.2013
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Consiglio Nazionale delle Ricerche
P. le Aldo Moro, 7
00185 Roma / IT
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / GAGLIARDI, Gianluca
Consiglio Nazionale delle Ricerche
P.le Aldo Moro 7
I-00185 Roma / IT
02 / FERRARO, Pietro
Consiglio Nazionale delle Ricerche
P.le Aldo Moro 7
I-00185 Roma / IT
03 / DE NATALE, Paolo
Consiglio Nazionale delle Ricerche
P.le Aldo Moro 7
I-00185 Roma / IT
04 / DE NICOLA, Sergio
Consiglio Nazionale delle Ricerche
P.le Aldo Moro 7
I-00185 Roma / IT
 [2012/34]
Former [2009/07]01 / GAGLIARDI, Gianluca
Consiglio Nazionale delle Ricerche P.le Aldo Moro 7
I-00185 Roma / IT
02 / FERRARO, Pietro
Consiglio Nazionale delle Ricerche P.le Aldo Moro 7
I-00185 Roma / IT
03 / DE NATALE, Paolo
Consiglio Nazionale delle Ricerche P.le Aldo Moro 7
I-00185 Roma / IT
04 / DE NICOLA, Sergio
Consiglio Nazionale delle Ricerche P.le Aldo Moro 7
I-00185 Roma / IT
Representative(s)Iannone, Carlo Luigi , et al
Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A.
Via Piemonte 26
00187 Roma / IT
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Iannone, Carlo Luigi , et al
Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26
00187 Roma / IT
Application number, filing date07736868.625.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007IT00365
Priority number, dateIT2006RM0027926.05.2006         Original published format: IT RM20060279
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007138632
Date:06.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2021741
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007
[2009/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2021741
Date:22.08.2012
Language:EN
[2012/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:G01D5/353, G01L1/24, H01S3/13, H01S5/0687
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ABFRAGE EINES STATISCHEN UND/ODER DYNAMISCHEN DEHNUNGSSENSORS UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES LASERFREQUENZVERRIEGELUNGSVERFAHRENS UND RELEVANTE VORRICHTUNG[2012/14]
English:METHOD OF INTERROGATION OF A STATIC AND/OR DYNAMIC STRAIN SENSOR MAKING USE OF A LASER-FREQUENCY LOCKING METHOD, AND RELEVANT APPARATUS[2012/07]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'INTERROGATION D'UN CAPTEUR DE CONTRAINTE STATIQUE ET/OU DYNAMIQUE AU MOYEN D'UN PROCÉDÉ DE VERROUILLAGE DE FRÉQUENCE LASER ET APPAREIL CORRESPONDANT[2012/07]
Former [2009/07]VERFAHREN ZUR LASERFREQUENZVERRIEGELUNG AUF EINEM FASERRESONATOR MIT INDUZIER-DOPPELBRECHUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR ABFRAGE EINES STATISCHEN UND/ODER DYNAMISCHEN ANSPANNUNGSSENSORS UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES SOLCHEN VERRIEGELUNGSVERFAHRENS UND RELEVANTE VORRICHTUNGEN
Former [2009/07]METHOD FOR LASER-FREQUENCY LOCKING TO A FIBRE RESONATOR WITH INDUCE BIREFRINGENCE, METHOD OF INTERROGATION OF A STATIC AND/OR DYNAMIC STRAIN SENSOR MAKING USE OF SUCH A LOCKING METHOD, AND RELEVANT APPARATUSES
Former [2009/07]PROCÉDÉ DE VERROUILLAGE DE FRÉQUENCE LASER SUR UN RÉSONATEUR À FIBRE À BIRÉFRINGENCE INDUITE, PROCÉDÉ D'INTERROGATION D'UN CAPTEUR DE CONTRAINTE STATIQUE ET/OU DYNAMIQUE AU MOYEN D'UN TEL PROCÉDÉ DE VERROUILLAGE ET APPAREILS CORRESPONDANTS
Entry into regional phase16.10.2008National basic fee paid 
16.10.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
16.10.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.03.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.10.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
17.01.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.04.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.04.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.07.2012Fee for grant paid
12.07.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.01.2011
Opposition(s)23.05.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
05.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
28.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201004   M06   Fee paid on   05.08.2010
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.05.2007
AT22.08.2012
BE22.08.2012
CY22.08.2012
CZ22.08.2012
DK22.08.2012
EE22.08.2012
FI22.08.2012
LT22.08.2012
LV22.08.2012
MC22.08.2012
MT22.08.2012
NL22.08.2012
PL22.08.2012
RO22.08.2012
SE22.08.2012
SI22.08.2012
SK22.08.2012
TR22.08.2012
BG22.11.2012
GR23.11.2012
ES03.12.2012
IS22.12.2012
PT24.12.2012
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT22.08.2012
BE22.08.2012
CY22.08.2012
CZ22.08.2012
DK22.08.2012
EE22.08.2012
FI22.08.2012
LT22.08.2012
LV22.08.2012
MC22.08.2012
MT22.08.2012
NL22.08.2012
PL22.08.2012
RO22.08.2012
SE22.08.2012
SI22.08.2012
SK22.08.2012
TR22.08.2012
BG22.11.2012
GR23.11.2012
ES03.12.2012
IS22.12.2012
PT24.12.2012
Former [2015/13]AT22.08.2012
BE22.08.2012
CY22.08.2012
CZ22.08.2012
DK22.08.2012
EE22.08.2012
FI22.08.2012
LT22.08.2012
LV22.08.2012
MC22.08.2012
MT22.08.2012
NL22.08.2012
PL22.08.2012
RO22.08.2012
SE22.08.2012
SI22.08.2012
SK22.08.2012
BG22.11.2012
GR23.11.2012
ES03.12.2012
IS22.12.2012
PT24.12.2012
Former [2014/03]AT22.08.2012
BE22.08.2012
CY22.08.2012
CZ22.08.2012
DK22.08.2012
EE22.08.2012
FI22.08.2012
LT22.08.2012
LV22.08.2012
MC22.08.2012
NL22.08.2012
PL22.08.2012
RO22.08.2012
SE22.08.2012
SI22.08.2012
SK22.08.2012
BG22.11.2012
GR23.11.2012
ES03.12.2012
IS22.12.2012
PT24.12.2012
Former [2013/34]AT22.08.2012
BE22.08.2012
CY22.08.2012
CZ22.08.2012
DK22.08.2012
EE22.08.2012
FI22.08.2012
LT22.08.2012
LV22.08.2012
NL22.08.2012
PL22.08.2012
RO22.08.2012
SE22.08.2012
SI22.08.2012
SK22.08.2012
BG22.11.2012
GR23.11.2012
ES03.12.2012
IS22.12.2012
PT24.12.2012
Former [2013/23]AT22.08.2012
BE22.08.2012
CY22.08.2012
CZ22.08.2012
DK22.08.2012
EE22.08.2012
FI22.08.2012
LT22.08.2012
LV22.08.2012
NL22.08.2012
PL22.08.2012
RO22.08.2012
SE22.08.2012
SI22.08.2012
SK22.08.2012
GR23.11.2012
ES03.12.2012
IS22.12.2012
PT24.12.2012
Former [2013/22]AT22.08.2012
BE22.08.2012
CY22.08.2012
CZ22.08.2012
DK22.08.2012
EE22.08.2012
FI22.08.2012
LT22.08.2012
LV22.08.2012
NL22.08.2012
SE22.08.2012
SI22.08.2012
GR23.11.2012
ES03.12.2012
IS22.12.2012
PT24.12.2012
Former [2013/21]AT22.08.2012
BE22.08.2012
CY22.08.2012
DK22.08.2012
FI22.08.2012
LT22.08.2012
LV22.08.2012
NL22.08.2012
SE22.08.2012
SI22.08.2012
GR23.11.2012
IS22.12.2012
PT24.12.2012
Former [2013/15]AT22.08.2012
BE22.08.2012
CY22.08.2012
FI22.08.2012
LT22.08.2012
LV22.08.2012
NL22.08.2012
SE22.08.2012
SI22.08.2012
GR23.11.2012
IS22.12.2012
PT24.12.2012
Former [2013/13]AT22.08.2012
BE22.08.2012
CY22.08.2012
FI22.08.2012
LT22.08.2012
LV22.08.2012
SE22.08.2012
SI22.08.2012
GR23.11.2012
IS22.12.2012
PT24.12.2012
Former [2013/12]AT22.08.2012
BE22.08.2012
CY22.08.2012
FI22.08.2012
LT22.08.2012
LV22.08.2012
SE22.08.2012
SI22.08.2012
GR23.11.2012
IS22.12.2012
Former [2013/11]AT22.08.2012
CY22.08.2012
FI22.08.2012
LT22.08.2012
LV22.08.2012
SI22.08.2012
GR23.11.2012
IS22.12.2012
Former [2013/10]AT22.08.2012
CY22.08.2012
FI22.08.2012
LT22.08.2012
IS22.12.2012
Former [2013/09]AT22.08.2012
FI22.08.2012
LT22.08.2012
Former [2013/08]AT22.08.2012
LT22.08.2012
Former [2013/07]AT22.08.2012
Cited inInternational search[XY]US6661941  (YAO XIAOTIAN STEVE [US]) [X] 1,3,5,6,9-11 * figures 1,4 * [Y] 2,4,7,8;
 [Y]US4451923  (HANSCH THEODOR W [US], et al) [Y] 2,4,7,8 * column A; figure 3 *;
 [DPX]  - GAGLIARDI G ET AL, "Interrogation of fiber Bragg-grating resonators by polarization- spectroscopy laser-frequency locking", OPT. EXPRESS; OPTICS EXPRESS APR 2 2007, (20070402), vol. 15, no. 7, pages 3715 - 3728, XP002453608 [DPX] 1-13 * section 3,;; figure 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.15.003715
 [A]  - CHOW J H ET AL, "Interrogation of a Passive Fiber Bragg Grating Resonator Sensor by Current Modulation of a Diode Laser", LEOS, 2005 IEEE ANNUAL MEETING CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS SYDNEY, AUSTRALIA 23-27 OCT. 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20051023), ISBN 0-7803-9217-5, pages 802 - 803, XP010886804 [A] 1-13 * page 803, paragraph 1; figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LEOS.2005.1548251
 [A]  - BALL G A ET AL, "POLARIMETRIC HETERODYNING BRAGG-GRATING FIBER-LASER SENSOR", OPTICS LETTERS, OSA, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19931115), vol. 18, no. 22, ISSN 0146-9592, pages 1976 - 1978, XP000403408 [A] 12,13 * abstract *