Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2022404

EP2022404 - ULTRASONOGRAPH, MEDICAL IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, AND MEDICAL IMAGE PROCESSING PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.07.2012
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.07.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.08.2012  [2012/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
1-1, Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
For all designated states
Toshiba Medical Systems Corporation
1385 Shimoishigami
Otawara-shi
Tochigi 324-8550 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
For all designated states
Toshiba Medical Systems Corporation
1385 Shimoishigami Otawara-shi Tochigi
324-8550 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KAWAGISHI, Tetsuya
Intellectual Property Department
Toshiba Medical Systems Corporation
1385, Shimoishigami
Otawara-shi, Tochigi 324-8550 / JP
02 / ABE, Yasuhiko
Intellectual Property Department
Toshiba Medical Systems Corporation
1385, Shimoishigami
Otawara-shi, Tochigi 324-8550 / JP
 [2011/36]
Former [2009/07]01 / KAWAGISHI, Tetsuya
Intellectual Property Department, Toshiba Medical Systems Corporation 1385, Shimoishigami
Otawara-shi, Tochigi 324-8550 / JP
02 / ABE, Yasuhiko
Intellectual Property Department, Toshiba Medical Systems Corporation 1385, Shimoishigami
Otawara-shi, Tochigi 324-8550 / JP
Representative(s)Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB
European Patent Attorneys
Landsberger Strasse 300
80687 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/36]Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen
Landsberger Strasse 300
80687 München / DE
Former [2009/26]Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen
European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300
80687 München / DE
Former [2009/07]Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen
European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300
80687 München / DE
Application number, filing date07737243.130.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007JP00587
Priority number, dateJP2006014941430.05.2006         Original published format: JP 2006149414
[2009/07]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007138751
Date:06.12.2007
Language:JA
[2007/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2022404
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2022404
Date:07.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP06.12.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.07.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61B8/08
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   NL [2009/30]
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:ULTRASCHALLGERÄT, MEDIZINISCHES BILDBEARBEITUNGSGERÄT UND MEDIZINISCHES BILDBEARBEITUNGSPROGRAMM[2009/07]
English:ULTRASONOGRAPH, MEDICAL IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, AND MEDICAL IMAGE PROCESSING PROGRAM[2009/07]
French:ULTRASONOGRAPHE, DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE MÉDICALE ET PROGRAMME DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE MÉDICALE[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase21.11.2008Translation filed 
21.11.2008National basic fee paid 
21.11.2008Search fee paid 
21.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
21.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
31.12.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
06.02.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
09.02.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.04.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.07.2011Fee for grant paid
15.07.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.04.2011
Opposition(s)11.06.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]US6193660  (JACKSON JOHN I [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,10,12,14-17 * the whole document * [I] 2,5-9,11,13;
 [A]US2005096543  (JACKSON JOHN I [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0035] - [0048] * * figures 2,3 *;
 [A]US2004064036  (MAO ZUHUA [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract *
International search[X]JP2004313291  (TOSHIBA CORP);
 [Y]JP2006006933  (GEN ELECTRIC);
 [A]JP2002140690  (TOSHIBA CORP);
 [A]JPH04270983  (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP);
 [A]JP2006061581  (TOSHIBA CORP)
by applicantJP2004313291