Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2006361

EP2006361 - GAS OIL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.07.2013
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
22.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JX Nippon Oil & Energy Corporation
6-3, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8162 / JP
[2013/31]
Former [2008/52]For all designated states
Nippon Oil Corporation
3-12, Nishi-shimbashi 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8412 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / SUGANO, Hideaki
NIPPON OIL CORPORATION
8, Chidori-cho
Naka-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 231-0815 / JP
 [2013/33]
Former [2008/52]01 / SUGANO, Hideaki
NIPPON OIL CORPORATION 8, Chidori-cho Naka-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 231-0815 / JP
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/33]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Former [2008/52]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date07738756.109.03.2007
[2008/52]
WO2007JP55309
Priority number, dateJP2006010123231.03.2006         Original published format: JP 2006101232
JP2006010123331.03.2006         Original published format: JP 2006101233
JP2006010123431.03.2006         Original published format: JP 2006101234
JP2006010123531.03.2006         Original published format: JP 2006101235
[2008/52]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007114028
Date:11.10.2007
Language:JA
[2007/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2006361
Date:24.12.2008
Language:EN
[2008/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2006361
Date:14.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP11.10.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.06.2011
ClassificationInternational:C10L1/08, C10G47/02
[2013/11]
Former International [2011/29]C10L1/08, C10L1/10, C10G47/02, C10G49/02
Former International [2008/52]C10L1/08, C10G2/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/52]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:GASÖLZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2008/52]
English:GAS OIL COMPOSITION[2008/52]
French:COMPOSITION DE GAZOLE[2008/52]
Entry into regional phase30.09.2008Translation filed 
30.09.2008National basic fee paid 
30.09.2008Search fee paid 
30.09.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
30.09.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.09.2008Examination requested  [2008/52]
20.01.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.04.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.08.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.09.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.03.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.06.2013Fee for grant paid
28.06.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.04.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  14.05.2014  27.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Sasol South Africa (Proprietary) Limited
50 Katherine Street
Sandton
2090 South Africa / ZA
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
 [2019/02]
Former [2018/31]
Opponent(s)01  14.05.2014  27.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Sasol Technology (Pty) Ltd
1 Sturdee Avenue, Rosebank
2196 Johannesburg / ZA
Opponent's representative
Kador & Partner PartG mbB
Corneliusstraße 15
80469 München / DE
Former [2014/26]
Opponent(s)01  14.05.2014   
Sasol Technology (Pty) Ltd
1 Sturdee Avenue, Rosebank
2196 Johannesburg / ZA
Opponent's representative
Schindele, Claus
Kador & Partner
Corneliusstraße 15
80469 München / DE
24.06.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.05.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
29.02.2016Date of oral proceedings
01.04.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
01.04.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition09.06.2016Appeal received No.  T1423/16
10.08.2016Statement of grounds filed
24.09.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
24.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU09.03.2007
AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
BG14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
ES14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
MC14.08.2013
MT14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
TR14.08.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
IE09.03.2014
LU09.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU09.03.2007
AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
BG14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
ES14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
MC14.08.2013
MT14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
IE09.03.2014
LU09.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2016/27]AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
BG14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
ES14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
MC14.08.2013
MT14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
IE09.03.2014
LU09.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2016/25]AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
BG14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
ES14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
MT14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
IE09.03.2014
LU09.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2016/12]AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
ES14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
MT14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
IE09.03.2014
LU09.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2015/08]AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
ES14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
IE09.03.2014
LU09.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2015/07]AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
ES14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
IE09.03.2014
LU09.03.2014
Former [2014/48]AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
ES14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
LU09.03.2014
Former [2014/24]AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
ES14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/23]AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/22]AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/21]AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/18]AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/14]CY19.06.2013
AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/12]CY19.06.2013
AT14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/11]CY19.06.2013
AT14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/10]CY19.06.2013
AT14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/09]AT14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/08]LT14.08.2013
PT16.12.2013
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2005059063  (SASOL TECH PTY LTD [ZA]; DANCUART KOHLER LUIS PABLO FID [ZA]; LAMPRECH) [I] 1,6,7 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2005035695  (DANCUART KOHLER LUIS PABLO FID [ZA]; LAMPRECHT DELANIE [ZA]; MYBURGH I) [A] 1-7 * claims 1-23; table 3 *
International search[A]JP2004269682  (NIPPON OIL CORP);
 [A]JP2004002551  (NIPPON OIL CORP);
 [A]JP2004002550  (NIPPON OIL CORP);
 [A]  - SZYMKOWICZ P.G. ET AL., "Effects of Advanced Fuels on the Particulate and NOx Emissions from an Optimized Light-Duty CIDI Engine", SAE TECHNICAL PAPER SERIES, 2001-01-0148, (2001), XP003018048
 [A]  - RYAN T.W. ET AL., "HCCI in a Variable Compression Ratio Engine-Effects of Engine Variables", SAE TECHNICAL PAPER SERIES, 2004-01-1971, (2004), XP003018049
 [A]  - SUGANO H. ET AL., "27 Chokufun Diesel-kikan no Kikan Seino o Kojo saseru Nensho Inshi to Nenryo Inshi tono Kumiawase ni Kansuru Kenkyu (Dai 2 Ho)", SOCIETY OF AUTOMOTIVE ENGINEERS OF JAPAN GAKUJUTSU KOENKAI MAESURISHU, (2005), no. 91-05, pages 1 - 6, XP003018050
 [A]  - MIZUNO S., "Keiyu no Cetane-ka Suisan Hoho", IDEMITSU GIHO, (1992), vol. 35, no. 1, pages 87 - 92, XP003018051
ExaminationEP2006359
by applicantJP2006028493
 JP2005343917
 JP2005343918
 JP2005343919
    - KONISHI SEIICHI, Nenryo Kogaku Gairon, SHOKABO PUBLISHING CO., LTD., (199103), pages 136 - 144
    - "Petroleum Products-Determination of Hydrocarbon Types-High Performance Liquid Chromatography", JPI Standard and Manuals Testing Method for Petroleum Products, JAPAN PETROLEUM INST.
    - "JPI-5S-46-96", JPI Standard and Manuals Testing Method for Petroleum Products, JAPAN PETROLEUM INST
    - "Gas oil -Testing Method for Lubricity", JPI Standard and Manuals Testing Method for Petroleum Products, JAPAN PETROLEUM INST.