Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2006836

EP2006836 - SPEAKER MODEL REGISTRATION DEVICE AND METHOD IN SPEAKER RECOGNITION SYSTEM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  09.09.2011
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.09.2011Refusal of applicationpublished on 12.10.2011  [2011/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pioneer Corporation
1-1, Shin-ogura
Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 212-0031 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2011/01]For all designated states
Pioneer Corporation
1-1, Shin-ogura Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 212-0031 / JP
Former [2008/52]For all designated states
Pioneer Corporation
4-1, Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku
Tokyo 153-8654 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TOYAMA, Soichi
c/o PIONEER CORPORATION Sougou Kenkyusho. 1-1, Fujimi 6-chome
Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama 3502288 / JP
02 / FUJITA, Ikuo, c/o PIONEER CORP., Kawagoe Plant
25-1, Aza-Nishicho, Yamada
Kawagoe-shi, Saitama 350-8555 / JP
03 / SHIODA, Takehiko
c/o PIONEER CORPORATION Sougou Kenkyusho. 1-1, Fujimi 6-chome
Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama 3502288 / JP
 [2008/52]
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Grillparzerstraße 14
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/36]Viering, Jentschura & Partner
Postfach 22 14 43
80504 München / DE
Former [2008/52]Viering, Jentschura & Partner
Grillparzerstrasse 14
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date07739119.120.03.2007
[2008/52]
WO2007JP55676
Priority number, dateJP2006008427624.03.2006         Original published format: JP 2006084276
[2008/52]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007111197
Date:04.10.2007
Language:JA
[2007/40]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2006836
Date:24.12.2008
Language:EN
[2009/04]
Type: A9 Corrected patent application 
No.:EP2006836
Date:25.02.2009
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP04.10.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.04.2010
ClassificationInternational:G10L17/00, G10L15/06
[2008/52]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2009/17]
Former [2008/52]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SPRECHERMODELL-REGISTRATIONSEINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN IN EINEM SPRECHERERKENNUNGSSYSTEM UND COMPUTERPROGRRAMM[2008/52]
English:SPEAKER MODEL REGISTRATION DEVICE AND METHOD IN SPEAKER RECOGNITION SYSTEM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM[2008/52]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE D'ENREGISTREMENT DE MODELE DE HAUT-PARLEUR DANS UN SYSTEME DE RECONNAISSANCE DE HAUT-PARLEUR ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE[2008/52]
Entry into regional phase09.10.2008Translation filed 
09.10.2008National basic fee paid 
09.10.2008Search fee paid 
09.10.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
09.10.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.01.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
09.10.2008Examination requested  [2008/52]
25.10.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
02.12.2008Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
24.06.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.08.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.12.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.05.2011Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.05.2011
24.05.2011Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
27.05.2011Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/41]
06.06.2011Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/41]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.08.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[I]US2005036589  (BOSSEMEYER ROBERT WESLEY [US]) [I] 1-9 * figures 7,9a-b *;
 [I]EP1001407  (CANON KK [JP]) [I] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0065] , [0068] *;
 [I]EP0424071  (LOGICA UK LTD [GB]) [I] 1-9 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0429233  (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * column 5, lines 9-21 *
International search[Y]JPH02127697  (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD);
 [Y]JPH02210500  (RICOH KK);
 [A]JPS584198  (HITACHI LTD);
 [A]JPS6060697  (FUJITSU LTD);
 [A]JPH0273398  (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD);
 [A]JPH02298996  (TOSHIBA CORP);
 [A]JP2000305589  (KOBE STEEL LTD)
by applicantJP2004294755