EP2022988 - MOVING BLADE OF TURBOFAN ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IHI Corporation 1-1, Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/07] | For all designated states IHI Corporation 1-1, Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUROOKA, Takeshi IHI Corporation 1-1, Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | 02 /
MIZUTA, Ikuhisa IHI Corporation 1-1, Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | [2009/07] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/07] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07739607.5 | 26.03.2007 | [2009/07] | WO2007JP56169 | Priority number, date | JP20060146319 | 26.05.2006 Original published format: JP 2006146319 | [2009/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007138779 | Date: | 06.12.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2022988 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/14, F04D29/32, F04D29/38 | [2014/10] | CPC: |
F04D29/384 (EP,US);
F01D5/141 (EP,US);
F04D29/324 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/07] | F04D29/38, F02K3/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/26] |
Former [2009/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEWEGLICHE SCHAUFEL FÜR EIN MANTELSTROMTRIEBWERK | [2009/07] | English: | MOVING BLADE OF TURBOFAN ENGINE | [2009/07] | French: | AUBE MOBILE DE RÉACTEUR À DOUBLE FLUX | [2009/07] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2008 | Translation filed | 05.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2008 | Search fee paid | 05.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 30.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 06.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/41] | 06.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2019 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2160467 (WARD EDGAR T) [I] 1-4 * page 1, column 1, line 1 - line 43; figure 2 *; | [A]EP1557530 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JP2005315138 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND); | [Y]JP2001214893 (GEN ELECTRIC) | by applicant | US6328533 | US6071077 | USRE38040E | US5167489 | US5725354 | US6358003 |