Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2001239

EP2001239 - PICTURE CODING APPARATUS AND PICTURE DECODING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.07.2018
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.08.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.07.2018No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.08.2018  [2018/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sun Patent Trust
450 Lexington Avenue, 38th Floor
New York, NY 10017 / US
[2017/37]
Former [2016/33]For all designated states
Sun Patent Trust
450 Lexington Avenue, 38th Floor
New York NY 10017 / US
Former [2014/30]For all designated states
Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America
20000 Mariner Avenue
Suite 200
Torrance CA 90503 / US
Former [2008/50]For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / WITTMANN, Steffen
c/o Panasonic R&D Center Germany GmbH
Monzastrasse 4c
63225 Langen / DE
02 / WEDI, Thomas
c/o Panasonic R&D Center Germany GmbH
Monzastrasse 4c
63225 Langen / DE
 [2017/37]
Former [2008/50]01 / WITTMANN, Steffen
c/o Panasonic R&D Center Germany GmbH Monzastrasse 4c
63225 Langen / DE
02 / WEDI, Thomas
c/o Panasonic R&D Center Germany GmbH Monzastrasse 4c
63225 Langen / DE
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2017/37]
Former [2008/50]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date07739618.226.03.2007
[2008/50]
WO2007JP56180
Priority number, dateEP2006000630227.03.2006         Original published format: EP 06006302
EP2006000774012.04.2006         Original published format: EP 06007740
[2008/50]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007111292
Date:04.10.2007
Language:JA
[2007/40]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2001239
Date:10.12.2008
Language:EN
[2009/04]
Type: A9 Corrected patent application 
No.:EP2001239
Date:25.03.2009
[2009/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2001239
Date:13.09.2017
Language:EN
[2017/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP04.10.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.11.2012
ClassificationInternational:H04N19/50, H04N19/176, H04N19/172, H04N19/46, H04N19/61, H04N19/117, H04N19/14, H04N19/154, H04N19/177, H04N19/174, H04N19/82, H04N19/86
[2017/17]
Former International [2012/50]H04N7/26, H04N7/32, H04N7/50
Former International [2008/50]H04N7/32
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2017/37]
Former [2009/19]DE,  FR,  GB 
Former [2008/50]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:BILDCODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND BILDDECODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2008/50]
English:PICTURE CODING APPARATUS AND PICTURE DECODING APPARATUS[2008/50]
French:APPAREIL DE CODAGE D'IMAGE ET APPAREIL DE DECODAGE D'IMAGE[2008/50]
Entry into regional phase26.09.2008Translation filed 
26.09.2008National basic fee paid 
26.09.2008Search fee paid 
26.09.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
26.09.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.08.2007Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
26.09.2008Examination requested  [2008/50]
28.10.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
04.12.2008Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
21.06.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.04.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.08.2017Fee for grant paid
03.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.04.2017
Opposition(s)14.06.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
24.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
21.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
24.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
25.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
24.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP1453319  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,3-9,11,17,19-26 * paragraph [0157] - paragraph [0162]; figures 1, 11, 12 *;
 [Y]US5796875  (READ CHRISTOPHER JENSEN [US]) [Y] 1,3-9,11,17,19-26 * column 4 *;
 [A]  - SONI T ET AL, "Enhancement of images using the 2-D LMS adaptive algorithm", SPEECH PROCESSING 1. TORONTO, MAY 14 - 17, 1991; [INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH & SIGNAL PROCESSING. ICASSP], NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19910414), vol. CONF. 16, doi:10.1109/ICASSP.1991.151041, ISBN 978-0-7803-0003-3, pages 3029 - 3032, XP010043645 [A] 1,3-9,11,17,19-26 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1991.151041
 [XP]  - WITTMANN S, "SEI on post-filter hints for high-fidelity", 20. JVT MEETING; 77. MPEG MEETING; 15-07-2006 - 21-07-2006;KLAGENFURT, AT; (JOINT VIDEO TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-TSG.16 ),, (20060715), no. JVT-T039, ISSN 0000-0408, XP030006526 [XP] 1,3-9,11,17,19-26 * Sections 1-3 *
International search[X]JPH10150663  (SONY ELECTRONICS INC);
 [A]JP2005514872
by applicantUS2005105627