EP2014485 - PNEUMATIC TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2014 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/12] | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | ||
Former [2009/03] | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Fumio c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION Technical Center 3-1-1, Ogawahigashi-cho Kodaira-shi Tokyo 187-8531 / JP | 02 /
ISHIKAWA, Seiji c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION Technical Center 3-1-1, Ogawahigashi-cho Kodaira-shi Tokyo 187-8531 / JP | [2013/12] |
Former [2009/03] | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Fumio c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION Technical Center 3-1-1, Ogawahigashi-cho Kodaira-shi Tokyo 187-8531 / JP | ||
02 /
ISHIKAWA, Seiji c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION Technical Center 3-1-1, Ogawahigashi-cho Kodaira-shi Tokyo 187-8531 / JP | Representative(s) | Waldren, Robin Michael, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [2012/46] |
Former [2012/17] | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2009/03] | Whalley, Kevin Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07740696.5 | 30.03.2007 | [2009/03] | WO2007JP57260 | Priority number, date | JP20060098317 | 31.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006098317 | [2009/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007114383 | Date: | 11.10.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2014485 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2014485 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.10.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60C11/04, B60C11/13 | [2009/03] | CPC: |
B60C11/0306 (EP,KR,US);
B60C11/03 (KR);
B60C11/0318 (EP,KR,US);
B60C11/0332 (KR,US);
B60C11/04 (EP,KR,US);
B60C11/13 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2009/19] |
Former [2009/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | LUFTREIFEN | [2009/03] | English: | PNEUMATIC TIRE | [2009/03] | French: | PNEUMATIQUE | [2009/03] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2008 | Translation filed | 29.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 29.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 01.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.12.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2005032855 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,9 * figure 2; claim 1; table 1 * [Y] 7,8; | EP1676725 [ ] (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]EP1216853 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [Y] 7,8 * paragraph [0001]; figures 1-5; claim 1; table 1 *; | [Y]JP2002293109 (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO) [Y] 7,8 * abstract *; | [A]WO02057617 (BOMBARDIER MOTOR CORP OF US [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * figure 2 *; | [A]EP1637356 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5 * figures 1-6; claims 1,8 * | International search | [X]JPH04163214 (BRIDGESTONE CORP); | [Y]JPS6154928B ; | [Y]JP2003063212 (BRIDGESTONE CORP); | [X]JPH0776203 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND); | [X]JP2004523422 ; | [A]JPS6160306 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) | by applicant | JPH05338411 | JP2001191734 | WO2004103737 |