Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2025239

EP2025239 - STICK SHAPED SNACK AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/08]STICK-TYPE CAKE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME
[2011/29]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.05.2018Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: LV
published on 13.06.2018  [2018/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ezaki Glico Co., Ltd.
6-5, Utajima 4-chome Nishiyodogawa-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 555-8502 / JP
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / DATE, Takayuki
1-10-1-708, Kamihamuro
Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-1044 / JP
02 / HONDA, Masahiro
Tiera Mukonoso 405
8-12-27, Minamimukonoso
Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 661-0033 / JP
03 / OKA, Koji
Esupowaru21 203
15-2, Chuo-cho
Kawanishi-shi, Hyogo 666-0016 / JP
04 / HAYATA, Shigeki
12593-3, Takayama-cho
Ikoma-shi, Nara 630-0101 / JP
05 / MATSUMOTO, Shinji
3-6-4, Asahigaoka
Kashiba-shi, Nara 639-0266 / JP
06 / OOTAKARA, Tatsumi
12-91, Kendachi
Kamakura
Higashibetsuin-cho
Kameoka-shi, Kyoto 621-0114 / JP
 [2011/51]
Former [2009/08]01 / DATE, Takayuki
1-10-1-708, Kamihamuro
Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-1044 / JP
02 / HONDA, Masahiro
Tiera Mukonoso 405 8-12-27, Minamimukonoso
Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 661-0033 / JP
03 / OKA, Koji
Esupowaru21 203 15-2, Chuo-cho
Kawanishi-shi, Hyogo 666-0016 / JP
04 / HAYATA, Shigeki
12593-3, Takayama-cho
Ikoma-shi, Nara 630-0101 / JP
05 / MATSUMOTO, Shinji
3-6-4, Asahigaoka
Kashiba-shi, Nara 639-0266 / JP
06 / OOTAKARA, Tatsumi
12-91, Kendachi Kamakura Higashibetsuin-cho
Kameoka-shi, Kyoto 621-0114 / JP
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[2017/40]
Former [2011/51]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Straße 2
81671 München / DE
Former [2009/08]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date07741278.109.04.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007JP57842
Priority number, dateJP2006014631126.05.2006         Original published format: JP 2006146311
[2009/08]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007138790
Date:06.12.2007
Language:JA
[2007/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2025239
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2025239
Date:21.12.2011
Language:EN
[2011/51]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP2025239
Date:04.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP06.12.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.08.2009
ClassificationInternational:A23G3/50, A21D13/22, A21D13/24, A21D13/28, A23G3/54, A21C15/04, A21D8/02, A21D10/02, A21D13/00
[2017/24]
Former International [2014/18]A23G3/50, A21D13/08, A23G3/54, A21C15/04, A21D8/02, A21D10/02, A21D13/00
Former International [2009/08]A23G3/50, A21D13/08
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/40]
Former [2009/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:STABFÖRMIGES GEBÄCK UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG[2011/29]
English:STICK SHAPED SNACK AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME[2011/29]
French:SNACK DE FORME ALLONGÉE ET SON PROCEDÉ DE FABRICATION[2011/29]
Former [2009/08]STABFÖRMIGER KUCHEN UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG
Former [2009/08]STICK-TYPE CAKE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME
Former [2009/08]GÂTEAU DE TYPE BAGUETTE ET PROCESSUS DE FABRICATION DE CELUI-CI
Entry into regional phase07.11.2008Translation filed 
13.11.2008National basic fee paid 
13.11.2008Search fee paid 
13.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
13.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.11.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
13.11.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.03.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.04.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.07.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.11.2011Fee for grant paid
03.11.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP11004452.6  / EP2368439
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.11.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  20.09.2012  28.09.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Bahlsen GmbH & Co. KG
Podbielskistrasse 11
30163 Hannover / DE
Opponent's representative
Bohmann, Armin K.
Bohmann
Anwaltssozietät
Nymphenburger Straße 1
80335 München / DE
 [2015/46]
Former [2012/44]
Opponent(s)01  20.09.2012   
Bahlsen GmbH & Co. KG
Podbielskistrasse 11
30163 Hannover / DE
Opponent's representative
Hoefer & Partner
Pilgersheimer Straße 20
81543 München / DE
06.11.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.04.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
25.03.2014Date of oral proceedings
19.05.2014Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
19.05.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.01.2017Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
23.05.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
24.08.2017Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition28.07.2014Appeal received No.  T1649/14
24.09.2014Statement of grounds filed
20.01.2017Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
20.01.2017Date of oral proceedings
27.01.2017Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
27.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU09.04.2007
AT21.12.2011
CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
DK21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
FI21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
MT21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
PL21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
TR21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
GR22.03.2012
IE09.04.2012
LU09.04.2012
IS21.04.2012
PT23.04.2012
CH30.04.2012
LI30.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
[2018/24]
Former [2014/34]HU09.04.2007
AT21.12.2011
CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
DK21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
FI21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
MT21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
PL21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
TR21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
GR22.03.2012
IE09.04.2012
LU09.04.2012
IS21.04.2012
PT23.04.2012
CH30.04.2012
LI30.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
Former [2014/27]AT21.12.2011
CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
DK21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
FI21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
MT21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
PL21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
TR21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
GR22.03.2012
IE09.04.2012
LU09.04.2012
IS21.04.2012
PT23.04.2012
CH30.04.2012
LI30.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
Former [2014/21]AT21.12.2011
CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
DK21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
FI21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
MT21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
PL21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
TR21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
GR22.03.2012
IE09.04.2012
IS21.04.2012
PT23.04.2012
CH30.04.2012
LI30.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
Former [2013/35]AT21.12.2011
CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
DK21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
FI21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
MT21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
PL21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
GR22.03.2012
IE09.04.2012
IS21.04.2012
PT23.04.2012
CH30.04.2012
LI30.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
Former [2013/29]AT21.12.2011
CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
DK21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
FI21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
PL21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
GR22.03.2012
IE09.04.2012
IS21.04.2012
PT23.04.2012
CH30.04.2012
LI30.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
Former [2012/37]CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
PL21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
GR22.03.2012
IS21.04.2012
PT23.04.2012
Former [2012/36]CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
RO21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
SK21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
GR22.03.2012
IS21.04.2012
Former [2012/35]CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
EE21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
BG21.03.2012
GR22.03.2012
IS21.04.2012
Former [2012/34]CY21.12.2011
CZ21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
GR22.03.2012
IS21.04.2012
Former [2012/28]CY21.12.2011
LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
GR22.03.2012
Former [2012/24]LT21.12.2011
LV21.12.2011
NL21.12.2011
SE21.12.2011
SI21.12.2011
GR22.03.2012
Former [2012/20]LT21.12.2011
Documents cited:Search[X]US2002098267  (CONRAD HEISEY JACQUELINE [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0002] , [0132] , [0142] , [0149] , [0154] - [0157] - [0159] *;
 [A]US5681605  (TAKEMORI TOSHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * example 1 *;
 [A]EP0956782  (SOREMARTEC SA [BE], et al) [A] 1-3 * paragraphs [0009] , [0042] *
 [X]  - ANONYMOUS, "Lu Mikado", NiceCupofTeaandASitDown.com, (20030603), pages 1 - 1, URL: http://www.nicecupofteaandasitdown.com/biscuits/previous.php3?item=60, (20090706), XP002535472 [X] 3 * paragraph [0002] *
International search[Y]JP2004057143  (EZAKI GLICO CO);
 [Y]JPH1014480  (MORINAGA & CO);
 [XP]JP2006314236  (EZAKI GLICO CO)
by applicantJPH1014480
Opposition   - Betriebsanleitung zu einer Sticksauspressmaschine des Unternehmers Werner & Pfleiderer, 1956 und 1958 (8 pages),
    - Prospekt "Komplette Sticks- und Brezelanlagen. Complete Sticks and Pretzel Plants. Werner & Pfleiderer, Stuttgart, 1977 (8 pages),