Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2023012

EP2023012 - SCREW DEVICE AND METHOD OF PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.04.2018
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.05.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.04.2018No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.05.2018  [2018/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THK CO., LTD.
11-6, Nishigotanda 3-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-8503 / JP
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / NIWA, Hiroshi
THK Co., Ltd.
11-6, Nishi Gotanda 3-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-8503 / JP
02 / YOSHIDA, Akimasa
THK Co., Ltd.
11-6, Nishi Gotanda 3-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-8503 / JP
03 / MIYAHARA, Soshi
THK Co., Ltd.
11-6, Nishi Gotanda 3-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-8503 / JP
04 / CHIKAMOTO, Noriaki
THK Co., Ltd.
11-6, Nishi Gotanda 3-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-8503 / JP
05 / KUBOTA, Yasuhiro
THK Co., Ltd.
11-6, Nishi Gotanda 3-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-8503 / JP
 [2017/23]
Former [2009/07]01 / NIWA, Hiroshi
THK Co., Ltd. 11-6, Nishi Gotanda 3-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-8503 / JP
02 / YOSHIDA, Akimasa
THK Co., Ltd. 11-6, Nishi Gotanda 3-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-8503 / JP
03 / MIYAHARA, Soshi
THK Co., Ltd. 11-6, Nishi Gotanda 3-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-8503 / JP
04 / CHIKAMOTO, Noriaki
THK Co., Ltd. 11-6, Nishi Gotanda 3-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-8503 / JP
05 / KUBOTA, Yasuhiro
THK Co., Ltd. 11-6, Nishi Gotanda 3-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-8503 / JP
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2017/23]
Former [2009/07]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date07742691.427.04.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007JP59256
Priority number, dateJP2006012495328.04.2006         Original published format: JP 2006124953
JP2007009116130.03.2007         Original published format: JP 2007091161
[2009/07]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007126084
Date:08.11.2007
Language:JA
[2007/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2023012
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2023012
Date:07.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP08.11.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.2009
ClassificationInternational:B29L31/04, B29C45/26, F16H25/22, // F16H25/24
[2016/52]
Former International [2009/07]F16H25/24, B29C33/12, B29C45/14, B29C45/26, F16H25/22
Designated contracting statesDE,   IT [2017/23]
Former [2009/22]DE,  IT 
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHRAUBVORRICHTUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2009/07]
English:SCREW DEVICE AND METHOD OF PRODUCING SAME[2009/07]
French:DISPOSITIF DE VIS ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase27.11.2008Translation filed 
27.11.2008National basic fee paid 
27.11.2008Search fee paid 
27.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
27.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
29.11.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
13.01.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
31.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.10.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.02.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.01.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.04.2017Fee for grant paid
21.04.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.04.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.03.2010
Opposition(s)08.03.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
28.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
26.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
27.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
26.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[XYI]JPH06147290  (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD) [X] 1-3,8-10,14 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0017]; figures 3a-3c * [Y] 11-12 [I] 5;
 [YA]GB897008  (CAM GEARS LTD) [Y] 11 * page 1, line 77 - page 2, line 13 * [A] 1;
 [YA]EP1375938  (THK CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 12 * paragraph [0036]; figures 3a,3b * [A] 1
International search[X]JPH06147290  (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD);
 [Y]JPH0386237U  ;
 [X]JP2003113921  (KOYO SEIKO CO);
 [Y]JP2004353697  (NSK LTD);
 [Y]JP2002021967  (NSK LTD)
by applicantJP2002106672
 JP2006124953
 JP2007091161