Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2022569

EP2022569 - DROPLET APPLYING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  19.03.2010
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.03.2010Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 21.04.2010  [2010/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / NAKA, Masamichi
1-10-3-1, Kunimidai, Kizugawa-shi
Kyoto-fu / JP
02 / IWATA, Mitsuhiro
28-1-A110, Sanjo-hinoki-machi, Nara-shi
Nara-ken / JP
03 / TAMURA, Toshihiro
352-5, Miyako, Tawaramoto-cho, Shiki-gun
Nara-ken / JP
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Brown, Kenneth Richard , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Brown, Kenneth Richard , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date07742731.801.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007JP59296
Priority number, dateJP2006012922908.05.2006         Original published format: JP 2006129229
[2009/07]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007129634
Date:15.11.2007
Language:JA
[2007/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2022569
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP15.11.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.01.2010
ClassificationInternational:B41J3/28, B41J3/54, G02F1/1335
[2010/05]
Former International [2009/07]B05C5/00, B05C11/10
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2009/23]
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFBRINGEN VON TRÖPFCHEN[2009/07]
English:DROPLET APPLYING APPARATUS[2009/07]
French:APPAREIL D'APPLICATION DE GOUTTELETTES[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase05.12.2008Translation filed 
05.12.2008National basic fee paid 
05.12.2008Search fee paid 
05.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
05.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
09.12.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
14.01.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
12.03.2010Application withdrawn by applicant  [2010/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[I]US2005051071  (CODOS RICHARD N [US], et al) [I] 1-5 * paragraphs [0069] , [0072]; figures 1,1A *
International search[Y]JP2006011244  (V TECHNOLOGY CO LTD);
 [Y]JPH06273154  (TOKYO SEIMITSU CO LTD);
 [Y]JP2002346452  (HITACHI IND CO LTD);
 [Y]JP2005515052
by applicantJP2003191462
 JP2003066218